DANIEL BOCK, JR. v. PRESSLER AND PRESSLER, LLP
Plaintiff: DANIEL BOCK, JR.
Defendant: PRESSLER AND PRESSLER, LLP
Case Number: 2:2011cv07593
Filed: December 30, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Morris
Presiding Judge: Esther Salas
Presiding Judge: Cathy L. Waldor
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 OPINION. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 10/19/17. (sr, )
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 OPINION. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 5/25/17. (DD, )
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 OPINION. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 6/30/14. (gmd, )
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 OPINION that Defendant's 43 Motion to Seal Document is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 3/24/14. (gmd, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DANIEL BOCK, JR. v. PRESSLER AND PRESSLER, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL BOCK, JR.
Represented By: PHILIP D. STERN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRESSLER AND PRESSLER, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?