CEVDET AKSUT VE OGULLARI KOLL. STI v. CAVUSOGLU

Plaintiff: CEVDET AKSUT VE OGULLARI KOLL. STI
Defendant: HUSEYIN CAVUSOGLU
Case Number: 2:2012cv02899
Filed: May 14, 2012
Court: New Jersey District Court
Office: Newark Office
County: Atlantic
Referring Judge: Mark Falk
Presiding Judge: William J. Martini
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 3, 2016 131 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER denying Defendant's motion for judgment as a matter of law on the common law fraud claim. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 2/2/16. (gh, )
January 19, 2016 116 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED OPINION (to correct two clerical errors). Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 1/19/16. (gh, )
January 15, 2016 112 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 1/15/16. (gh, )
August 26, 2015 88 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER denying 87 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney.. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 8/26/15. (gh, )
July 14, 2015 77 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 7/14/15. (gh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CEVDET AKSUT VE OGULLARI KOLL. STI v. CAVUSOGLU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CEVDET AKSUT VE OGULLARI KOLL. STI
Represented By: STEVEN A. SOULIOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUSEYIN CAVUSOGLU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?