LEE v. PARK, MD

Plaintiff: SANG GEOUL LEE
Defendant: WON IL PARK, MD
Case Number: 2:2012cv07437
Filed: December 4, 2012
Court: New Jersey District Court
Office: Newark Office
County: Bergen
Referring Judge: Steven C. Mannion
Presiding Judge: Esther Salas
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 26, 2016 86 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 5/26/16. (cm )
March 28, 2016 79 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 3/28/2016. (seb)
April 2, 2015 47 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Pltf's 42 and 43 Motions for appeal/review. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 4/1/2015. (drw)
October 23, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER granting 10 Motion for Waiver of Affidavit of Merit Requirement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/23/13. (jd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEE v. PARK, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANG GEOUL LEE
Represented By: MICHAEL S. KIMM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WON IL PARK, MD
Represented By: WAYNE ELLIOT PAULTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?