ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC. v. ACTAVIS INC. et al
Plaintiff: ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Defendant: ACTAVIS INC. and ACTAVIS SOUTH ATLANTIC LLC
Case Number: 2:2012cv07591
Filed: December 11, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Morris
Presiding Judge: Dennis M. Cavanaugh
Presiding Judge: Mark Falk
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 12/13/16. (cm )
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 OPINION. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 03/21/2016. (JB, )
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 OPINION fld. Signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 9/3/13. (sr, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC. v. ACTAVIS INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: THOMAS P. LIHAN
Represented By: ROBERT D. RHOAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS INC.
Represented By: CHARLES A. WEISS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS SOUTH ATLANTIC LLC
Represented By: CHARLES A. WEISS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?