ANDREWS v. WHITTAKER
Plaintiff: ROBERT LEE ANDREWS, JR.
Defendant: JOAN E. WHITTAKER
Case Number: 2:2013cv04812
Filed: August 12, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Essex
Presiding Judge: Steven C. Mannion
Presiding Judge: Esther Salas
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 OPINION. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 12/12/2018. (sm)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 LETTER OPINION & ORDER denying 56 Motion to Appoint Pro Bono, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/9/17. (cm, )
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 LETTER OPINION & ORDER denying application for Pro Bono Counsel for ROBERT LEE ANDREWS, JR. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/14/15. (cm )
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 9/20/13. (gmd, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ANDREWS v. WHITTAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT LEE ANDREWS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOAN E. WHITTAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?