SPY PHONE LABS LLC v. GOOGLE, INC. Featured Case
Plaintiff: SPY PHONE LABS LLC
Defendant: GOOGLE, INC.
Case Number: 2:2013cv04953
Filed: August 16, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Passaic
Presiding Judge: James B. Clark
Presiding Judge: Faith S. Hochberg
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING CASE that this action is voluntarily dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Faith S. Hochberg on 10/23/13. (gmd, )
October 22, 2013 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by SPY PHONE LABS LLC (FREEMAN, MICHAEL)
August 19, 2013 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to GOOGLE, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *LEROY DUNBAR* (ld, )
August 16, 2013 Filing 3 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: # 1 COMPLAINT) (ld, )
August 16, 2013 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SPY PHONE LABS LLC identifying NONE as Corporate Parent.. (ld, )
August 16, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GOOGLE, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 5178235) with JURY DEMAND, filed by SPY PHONE LABS LLC.(ld, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SPY PHONE LABS LLC v. GOOGLE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SPY PHONE LABS LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL ALAN FREEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOOGLE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?