DEPALMA et al v. SCOTTS MIRACLE-GRO
Plaintiff: DOMINICK DEPALMA and JOSEPH LESZCZYNSKI
Defendant: SCOTTS MIRACLE-GRO
Case Number: 2:2013cv07740
Filed: December 20, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Union
Presiding Judge: Dennis M. Cavanaugh
Presiding Judge: James B. Clark
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 222 OPINION. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 6/10/2019. (as, )
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 217 OPINION. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 5/21/2019. (sms)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 107 OPINION fld. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 8/4/16. (sr, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DEPALMA et al v. SCOTTS MIRACLE-GRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOMINICK DEPALMA
Represented By: HARRIS L. POGUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH LESZCZYNSKI
Represented By: HARRIS L. POGUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTTS MIRACLE-GRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?