HEYMAN et al v. CITIMORTGAGE, INC.
Plaintiff: ABRAHAM S. HEYMAN and GEILA HEYMAN
Defendant: CITIMORTGAGE, INC.
Case Number: 2:2014cv01680
Filed: March 19, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Passaic
Presiding Judge: Michael A. Hammer
Presiding Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 132 OPINION & ORDER; denying 130 Plaintiff's motion for Reconsideration; the clerk shall reclose the file; etc. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 10/25/2019. (sms)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 OPINION. etc. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 6/27/2019. (dam, )
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 36 Motion for leave to file a Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs are directed to sign and file the proposed Second Amended Complaint that is now, unsigned, at ECF nos. 36-2,3 & 4. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 9/22/16. (sr, )
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 OPINION fld. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 10/9/15. (sr, )
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 OPINION fld. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 9/15/14. (sr, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HEYMAN et al v. CITIMORTGAGE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABRAHAM S. HEYMAN
Represented By: DAVID M. SCHLACHTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEILA HEYMAN
Represented By: DAVID M. SCHLACHTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITIMORTGAGE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?