ASTA FUNDING, INC. v. NEAL et al

Petitioner: ASTA FUNDING, INC.
Respondent: DAVID SHAUN NEAL, ROBERT F. COYNE, ESQ. and NEW WORLD SOLUTIONS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2014cv02495
Filed: April 17, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Bergen
Presiding Judge: Michael A. Hammer
Presiding Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 9:9 Motion to Confirm Arbitration Loan
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER; affirming for the reasons expressed therein, and adopted by the Court, the Magistrate Judge's report and recommendation and order D.E. 83 and 84 . Defendant may submit a form or judgment within 7 days; etc. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 11/9/2018. (sms)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/29/17. (cm, )
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 12/14/2016. (ld, )
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 OPINION. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 6/30/16. (nic, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ASTA FUNDING, INC. v. NEAL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ASTA FUNDING, INC.
Represented By: STEVEN I ADLER
Represented By: LAUREN TOPELSOHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DAVID SHAUN NEAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ROBERT F. COYNE, ESQ.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: NEW WORLD SOLUTIONS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?