PREZIOSO v. BAYER CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: ALEXANDER N. PREZIOSO
Defendant: BAYER CORPORATION and MATRIX ABSENCE MANAGEMENT
Case Number: 2:2014cv03140
Filed: May 16, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Morris
Presiding Judge: Stanley R. Chesler
Presiding Judge: Cathy L. Waldor
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 OPINION. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 06/20/2018. (ek)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 OPINION & ORDER granting in part and denying in part 45 Application/Motion to Compel. The Court will hold a teleconference, to be initiated by Defendants and with in-house counsel for Defendant Bayer to be on the call, on December 19, 2016 at 4:30 PM to discuss scheduling of disclosures and remand consistent with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 12/8/16. (sr, )(N/M via cert. mail Pltf. #7011 2000 0002 0927 1453)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 OPINION & ORDER granting in part and denying in part 28 Motion to Remand. This case is REMANDED to the plan committee to complete the recordand to review Plaintiffs claim for benefits based upon the completed record. Defendants shall complete this review within 45 calendar days of the date of entry of this Order; and this case is STAYED pending completion of this review. The parties shall report to the Court in writing with the result of the appeal review within 50 calendar days of the date of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 1/21/16. (sr, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PREZIOSO v. BAYER CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEXANDER N. PREZIOSO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAYER CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATRIX ABSENCE MANAGEMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?