BOROUGH OF EDGEWATER v. WATERSIDE CONSTRUCTION, LLC et al
Plaintiff: BOROUGH OF EDGEWATER
Defendant: WATERSIDE CONSTRUCTION, LLC, 38 COACH, LLC, DAIBES BROTHERS, INC., NORTH RIVER MEWS ASSOCIATES, LLC., FRED A. DAIBES, TERMS ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC., ALUMINUM COMPANY OF AMERICA, A.P. NEW JERSEY, INC., JOHN DOES 1-100 and ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100
Case Number: 2:2014cv05060
Filed: August 12, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Bergen
Presiding Judge: Michael A. Hammer
Presiding Judge: Esther Salas
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 9613
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 420 OPINION. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 8/18/2021. (bt, )
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 418 OPINION. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 8/17/2021. (bt, )
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 415 OPINION. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 7/19/2021. (bt, )
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 413 OPINION. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 6/30/2021. (bt, )
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 231 OPINION. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 5/3/17. (sr, )
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 186 OPINION/ORDER granting 140 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Cmp.; that Plaintiffs shall file the proposed Third Amended Complaint within fourteen (14) days of this Order; that all of the Defendants shall file a response to the Third Amended Complaint within fourteen (14) days of the filing of the new Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 12/16/16. (DD, )
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 184 OPINION. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 12/14/16. (sr, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BOROUGH OF EDGEWATER v. WATERSIDE CONSTRUCTION, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOROUGH OF EDGEWATER
Represented By: TIMOTHY E. CORRISTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WATERSIDE CONSTRUCTION, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 38 COACH, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAIBES BROTHERS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTH RIVER MEWS ASSOCIATES, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRED A. DAIBES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERMS ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALUMINUM COMPANY OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.P. NEW JERSEY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?