INTERNATIONAL UNION OF BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFT WORKERS LOCAL 1 HEALTH FUND v. CELGENE CORPORATION
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers Stationary Engineers Local 39 Health and Welfare Trust Fund, THE DETECTIVES' ENDOWMENT ASSOCIATION, INC., David Mitchell and INTERNATIONAL UNION OF BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFT WORKERS LOCAL 1 HEALTH FUND
Defendant: PHV STANLEY E. FISHER and CELGENE CORPORATION
Consolidated Plaintiff: NEW ENGLAND CARPENTERS HEALTH BENEFITS FUND and CITY OF PROVIDENCE
In Re: Thalomid and Revlimid Antitrust Litigation
Case Number: 2:2014cv06997
Filed: November 7, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Union
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Michael A Hammer
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2021 Filing 329 NOTICE by CELGENE CORPORATION re #103 Discovery Confidentiality Order of Obligations Under Amended Stipulated Discovery Confidentiality Order (FISCHETTI, JOSEPH)
October 20, 2020 Filing 328 FINAL JUDGMENT of dismissal with prejudice as to the Released Parties re #327 Plaintiffs' Letter with Proposed Final Judgment. etc. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 10/20/2020. (dam)
October 15, 2020 Filing 327 Letter from Plaintiffs enclosing proposed final judgment order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BERAN, KATIE)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER granting #319 Plaintiffs' Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Payment of Service Awards to the Class Representatives. etc. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 10/2/2020. (dam)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER granting #320 Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement. etc. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 10/2/2020. (dam)
October 2, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated. See #325 Order. (dam)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 324 TEXT ORDER - the Final Approval Hearing scheduled for 10/1/20 at 3:00 p.m. is ADJOURNED. New date to be set. SO ORDERED by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 10/1/2020. (jl, )
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 323 TEXT ORDER, rescheduling the FINAL APPROVAL HEARING to 10/1/20 at 3:00 p.m. via videoconference. So Ordered by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 9/29/20. (aa, )
September 25, 2020 Filing 322 Letter from Joseph A. Fischetti, Esq. to Hon. Madeline Cox Arleo, U.S.D.J. re #320 MOTION for Settlement (Final Approval), #319 MOTION for Attorney Fees Reimbursement of Expenses, and Payment of Service Awards To The Class Representatives. (FISCHETTI, JOSEPH)
September 23, 2020 Filing 321 BRIEF in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #320 MOTION for Settlement (Final Approval), #319 MOTION for Attorney Fees Reimbursement of Expenses, and Payment of Service Awards To The Class Representatives (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BERAN, KATIE)
August 10, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #319 MOTION for Attorney Fees Reimbursement of Expenses, and Payment of Service Awards To The Class Representatives, #320 MOTION for Settlement (Final Approval). Motion set for 9/8/2020 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
August 7, 2020 Filing 320 MOTION for Settlement (Final Approval) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, #2 Declaration of Carla Peak and accompanying exhibits, #3 Declaration of of Ritesh Patel and accompanying attachments, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(BERAN, KATIE)
August 7, 2020 Filing 319 MOTION for Attorney Fees Reimbursement of Expenses, and Payment of Service Awards To The Class Representatives by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support of Plaintiffs Motion For an Award of Attorneys Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Payment of Service Awards To The Class Representatives, #2 Declaration of Co-Lead Counsel Melinda R. Coolidge and accompanying exhibits (August 2020), #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Text of Proposed Order, #10 Certificate of Service)(BERAN, KATIE)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 318 CORRECTED ORDER granting #312 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement. etc. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 5/26/2020. (dam)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER granting #315 CELGENE's Application. Pro Hac Vice Counsel KEVIN HARDY is hereby withdrawn. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/21/2020. (dam, )
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER granting #312 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement. etc. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 5/20/2020. (dam, )
May 20, 2020 Filing 315 Letter from Joseph A. Fischetti Esq., to Hon. Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re #96 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear. (FISCHETTI, JOSEPH)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER granting #313 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Distribute Notice to the Settlement Class, Appoint Notice and Claims Administrator, and for Approval of the Plan of Allocation. etc. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 5/20/2020. (dam, )
April 28, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #313 MOTION (Unopposed) to Distribute Notice to the Settlement Class, Appoint Notice and Claims Administrator, and For Approval of the Plan of Allocation . Motion set for 6/1/2020 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
April 27, 2020 Filing 313 MOTION (Unopposed) to Distribute Notice to the Settlement Class, Appoint Notice and Claims Administrator, and For Approval of the Plan of Allocation by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion, #2 Declaration of Carla Peak and accompanying exhibits, #3 Declaration of Dr. Jeffrey J. Leitzinger and accompanying exhibit, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(BERAN, KATIE)
April 6, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #312 MOTION for Settlement (Preliminary Approval). Motion set for 5/4/2020 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
April 3, 2020 Filing 312 MOTION for Settlement (Preliminary Approval) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion, #2 Declaration of Melinda R. Coolidge, #3 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Melinda R. Coolidge, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(BERAN, KATIE) Modified on 5/26/2020 (dam, ).
March 24, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo: Status Conference held on 3/24/2020. (aa, )
March 20, 2020 Filing 311 Letter from Joseph A. Fischetti re 309 Order,, Set Hearings,. (FISCHETTI, JOSEPH)
March 20, 2020 Filing 310 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CELGENE CORPORATION identifying Bristol-Myers Squibb Company as Corporate Parent.. (FISCHETTI, JOSEPH)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 309 TEXT ORDER, the status conference scheduled for 3/23/20 is rescheduled for 3/24/2020 at 03:15 PM in before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Conference will be by phone. Parties are directed to set up a call in number and file a letter with the call in information. So Ordered by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 3/18/20. (aa, )
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 308 TEXT ORDER, the Status Conference currently scheduled for 2/24/20 is rescheduled for 3/23/2020 at 2:00 PM in Newark - Courtroom 4A before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. So Ordered by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 2/24/20. (aa, )
February 21, 2020 Filing 307 Letter from Joseph A. Fischetti, Esq. to Hon. Madeline Cox Arleo, U.S.D.J. re 304 Order, Set Hearings. (FISCHETTI, JOSEPH)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER granting #305 Defendant's Letter. PHV Attorney Taylor G. Weaver terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/21/2020. (dam, )
February 19, 2020 Filing 305 Letter from Joseph A. Fischetti, Esq. to Hon. Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J.. (FISCHETTI, JOSEPH)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 304 TEXT ORDER, the Status Conference is rescheduled for 2/24/2020 at 2:00 PM in Newark - Courtroom 4A before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. So Ordered by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 2/5/20. (aa, )
February 4, 2020 Filing 303 Letter from Joseph A. Fischetti, Esq. to Madeline Cox Arleo, U.S.D.J. re #302 Status Conference,, Set Hearings,. (FISCHETTI, JOSEPH)
January 6, 2020 Filing 302 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo: Status Conference held on 1/6/2020. Status Conference set for 2/6/2020 at 2:00 PM in Newark - Courtroom 4A before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. (Court Reporter/Recorder Charles McGuire.) (aa, )
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 301 TEXT ORDER, the fairness hearing scheduled for 1/6/20 at 2:00 p.m. is converted into a status conference. So Ordered by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 1/3/20. (aa, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 300 Letter from F. Schirripa to Judge Arleo re January 6 Hearing re #293 MOTION for Attorney Fees Reimbursement of Expenses, and Payment of Service Awards To The Class Representatives, #294 MOTION for Settlement (Final Approval). (SCHIRRIPA, FRANK)
December 12, 2019 Filing 299 Transcript of Telephone Conference held on December 10, 2019, before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Transcriber: King Transcription Services (973-237-6080). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 1/2/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2020. (mfr)
December 12, 2019 Filing 298 Transcript of Telephone Conference held on December 9, 2019, before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Transcriber: King Transcription Services (973-237-6080). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 1/2/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2020. (mfr)
December 10, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Telephone Status Conference held on 12/10/2019. (ECR) (jqb, )
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 297 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 12/10/2019 at 12:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Counsel shall be prepared to discuss letter #295 . Counsel for the Non-Party/Potential Opt Out Parties must be on the call. Please dial 1-888-684-8852 and access code 1456817# to join the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/9/2019. (jqb, )
December 9, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Telephone Conference held on 12/9/2019. (ECR) (jqb, )
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 296 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 12/9/2019 at 4:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/5/2019. (jqb, )
November 27, 2019 Filing 295 Letter from Counsel for Non-Party MSP Opt-Outs re: Opt-Out Form. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Consumer Opt - Out Form, #2 Exhibit 2 Third-party Opt-Out Form)(STOCKWELL, MATTHEW)
November 12, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #294 MOTION for Settlement (Final Approval), #293 MOTION for Attorney Fees Reimbursement of Expenses, and Payment of Service Awards To The Class Representatives. Motion set for 1/6/2020 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
November 11, 2019 Filing 294 MOTION for Settlement (Final Approval) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs Motion For Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, #2 Declaration of Carla Peak in Support of Settlement Notice Plan, #3 Declaration of Stephanie J. Fiereck, Esq. on Implementation of CAFA Notice, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(BERAN, KATIE)
November 11, 2019 Filing 293 MOTION for Attorney Fees Reimbursement of Expenses, and Payment of Service Awards To The Class Representatives by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law In Support of Plaintiffs Motion For an Award of Attorneys Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Payment of Service Awards To The Class Representatives, #2 Declaration Supporting Declaration of Co-Lead Counsel Melinda R. Coolidge, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Text of Proposed Order, #11 Certificate of Service)(BERAN, KATIE)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION #291 TO DISTRIBUTE NOTICE TO THE SETTLEMENT CLASS, APPOINT NOTICE AND CLAIMS ADMINISTRATOR AND FOR APPROVAL OF THE PLAN OF ALLOCATION; A Fairness Hearing shall take place before the Court on 1/6/2020 at 2:00 p.m. before the Honorable Madeline Cox Arleo, U.S.D.J.; etc. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 8/22/2019. (sm)
August 16, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #291 MOTION (Unopposed) to Distribute Notice to the Settlement Class, Appoint Notice and Claims Administrator, and for Approval of the Plan of Allocation . Motion set for 9/16/2019 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 291 MOTION (Unopposed) to Distribute Notice to the Settlement Class, Appoint Notice and Claims Administrator, and for Approval of the Plan of Allocation by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion, #2 Declaration of Carla Peak in Support of Settlement Notice Plan, #3 Exhibit A to Peak Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Peak Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to Peak Declaration, #6 Exhibit D to Peak Declaration, #7 Exhibit E to Peak Declaration, #8 Exhibit F to Peak Declaration, #9 Exhibit G to Peak Declaration, #10 Exhibit H to Peak Declaration, #11 Declaration of Jeffrey J. Leitzinger, Ph.D Related to Proposed Allocation Plan and Net Settlement Fund Allocation, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(SCHIRRIPA, FRANK)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER granting #289 Motion for Settlement (Preliminary Approval). Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 8/1/2019. (ld, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 289 MOTION for Settlement (Preliminary Approval) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion, #2 Declaration of Melinda R. Coolidge, #3 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Melinda R. Coolidge, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(SCHIRRIPA, FRANK)
July 24, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #289 MOTION for Settlement (Preliminary Approval). Motion set for 8/19/2019 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
May 21, 2019 Filing 288 Letter from Gavin J. Rooney to Hon. Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re 285 Order,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
May 9, 2019 Filing 287 Transcript of Teleconference held on May 7, 2019, before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Transcriber: King Transcription Services (973-237-6080). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 5/30/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/10/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/7/2019. (jml, )
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 286 TEXT ORDER: As also discussed during the May 7, 2019 telephone conference, within fourteen days of the District Court's ruling on Plaintiff's motion for class certification, the parties will submit a proposed briefing schedule for any motions for summary judgment. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/8/2019. (MAH)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 285 TEXT ORDER: As discussed during the May 7, 2019 telephone status conference, on or before May 21, 2019, the parties will submit a joint discovery letter submitting the parties' positions on the Plaintiffs' request for two categories of documents. Each side is strictly limited to three double-spaced pages per category. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/8/2019. (MAH)
May 7, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Telephone Status Conference held on 5/7/2019. (ECR) (jqb, )
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 284 TEXT ORDER: The Telephone Conference set for 5/7/2019 is moved from 12:30 p.m. to 3:30 p.m. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/6/2019. (jqb, )
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER granting #278 Motion to Seal; that portions of the following documents shall be sealed and maintained under seal and that the redacted versions of the filings, when applicable, shall remain publicly available, etc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 4/3/2019. (ld, )
April 3, 2019 Filing 282 NOTICE of Change of Address by JENNIFER SARNELLI (SARNELLI, JENNIFER)
April 3, 2019 Filing 281 NOTICE of Change of Address by JENNIFER SARNELLI (SARNELLI, JENNIFER)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER withdrawing Stacie M. Fahsel, Esq. as Pro Hac Vice Counsel.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/6/2019. (ld, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 279 Letter from Gavin J. Rooney to Hon. Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J.. (ROONEY, GAVIN)
March 5, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #278 Joint MOTION to Seal Materials Related to Class Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Counsel. Motion set for 4/1/2019 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 278 Joint MOTION to Seal Materials Related to Class Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Counsel by CELGENE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Redacted Documents) (part 1), #2 Exhibit A (Redacted Documents) (part 2), #3 Index, #4 Declaration of Daniel B. Rehns, #5 Declaration of Brian R. Howe, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER granting Plaintiffs request that they be allowed a 5-page extension to 20 double-spaced pages at 12 point font for their reply brief.. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 2/21/2019. (ld, )
February 21, 2019 Filing 276 STATUS REPORT JOINT by CELGENE CORPORATION. (ROONEY, GAVIN)
February 19, 2019 Filing 275 BRIEF in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #264 MOTION to Certify Class (Renewed) (Redacted Reply in Support) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BERAN, KATIE)
February 15, 2019 Filing 274 BRIEF in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #264 MOTION to Certify Class (Renewed) (Reply in Support) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Melinda R. Coolidge, #2 Exhibit 130A and 135-146, #3 Appendix A, #4 Declaration Supplemental Rebuttal Report of Jeffrey J. Leitzinger, Ph.D., #5 Certificate of Service)(BERAN, KATIE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
February 11, 2019 Filing 273 Letter from Plaintiffs to Hon. Madeline Cox Arleo. (SCHIRRIPA, FRANK)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 272 TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed the parties' February 4, 2019 letter [D.E. 271]. The telephone conference is adjourned until May 7, 2019, at 12:30 p.m. On or before February 21, 2019, the parties shall file a joint status report indicating whether all fact and expert discovery is completed, and whether any party contemplates filing any dispositive motion. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/11/2019. (MAH)
February 4, 2019 Filing 271 Letter from Gavin J. Rooney to Hon. Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J.. (ROONEY, GAVIN)
January 28, 2019 Filing 270 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by CELGENE CORPORATION re #264 MOTION to Certify Class (Renewed) REDACTED (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
January 25, 2019 Filing 269 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by CELGENE CORPORATION re #264 MOTION to Certify Class (Renewed) (Attachments: #1 Appendix A to Opposition to Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Class Certification, #2 Declaration of John Schmidtlein, #3 Exhibit 1-5 to Declaration of John Schmidtlein, #4 Certificate of Service)(ROONEY, GAVIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER granting #263 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to TAMARA FREILICH, ESQ. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/7/2019. (dam, )
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 267 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: CELGENE shall file its opposition to Plaintiffs' renewed motion for class certification no later than 1/25/2019, with any reply thereto due no later than 2/15/2019. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/19/2018. (dam, )
December 18, 2018 Filing 266 Letter from Gavin J. Rooney to Hon. Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
December 17, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #264 MOTION to Certify Class (Renewed). Motion set for 1/7/2019 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 265 BRIEF in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #264 MOTION to Certify Class (Renewed) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 128, #2 Exhibit 129, #3 Exhibit 130, #4 Exhibit 131, #5 Exhibit 132, #6 Exhibit 133, #7 Exhibit 134, #8 Supplement Expert Report of Jeffrey J. Leitzinger, Ph.D., #9 Certificate of Service)(BERAN, KATIE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
December 14, 2018 Filing 264 MOTION to Certify Class (Renewed) by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 1/11/2019 (BERAN, KATIE)
December 10, 2018 Reset Hearing: The Telephone Status Conference set for 1/14/2019 is adjourned to 2/13/2019 at 3:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jqb, )
December 10, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #263 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Tamara Freilich. Motion set for 1/7/2019 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 263 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Tamara Freilich by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Frank R. Schirripa, #2 Declaration of Tamara Freilich, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(SCHIRRIPA, FRANK)
December 4, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, ERIC STOPS, ESQ. and GABRIEL P. BRIER, ESQ., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, )
December 3, 2018 Filing 262 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Eric Stops and Gabriel P. Brier to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (FISCHETTI, JOSEPH)
November 29, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee:for the admission of Eric C. Stops and Gabriel Brier $ 300.00, receipt number NEW038055 (JB, ) Modified on 12/3/2018 (JB, ).
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER Granting #260 Letter from Gavin Rooney to Hon. Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. requesting pro hac vice admission of Eric C. Stops, Esq., and Gabriel P. Brier, Esq., etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 11/27/2018. (JB, )
November 26, 2018 Filing 260 Letter from Gavin Rooney to Hon. Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gavin J. Rooney, #2 Declaration of Eric Stops, #3 Declaration of Gabriel P. Brier, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
November 25, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, STANLEY E. FISHER, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (JB, )
November 20, 2018 Filing 259 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Stanley E. Fisher to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (FISCHETTI, JOSEPH)
November 19, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee: for the admission of Stanley E. Fisher $ 150, receipt number NEW037985 (JB, )
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER Granting #257 Letter from Gavin J. Rooney to Hon. Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J., for the pro hac vice admission of Stanley E. Fisher, Esq, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 11/15/2018. (JB, )
November 14, 2018 Filing 257 Letter from Gavin J. Rooney to Hon. Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gavin J. Rooney, #2 Declaration of Stanley E. Fisher, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 256 LETTER ORDER Granting #253 Letter from Gavin J. Rooney to Hon. Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J.. Requesting that Ms. Collogan be withdrawn as Pro Hac vice counsel for Celgene in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 11/14/2018. (JB, )
November 9, 2018 Filing 255 Transcript of Telephone Conference held on November 1, 2018, before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Transcriber: King Transcription Services (973-237-6080). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 11/30/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/10/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/7/2019. (mfr)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER, that Plaintiffs shall file a renewal motion for class certification no later than 12/14/2018 with apposition thereto being due no later than 1/11/2019, etc There shall be a Telephone Status Conference on 1/14/2019 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 11/2/2018. (JB, )
November 2, 2018 Filing 253 Letter from Gavin J. Rooney to Hon. Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J.. (ROONEY, GAVIN)
November 1, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Telephone Status Conference held on 11/1/2018. (ECR) (jqb, )
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 252 OPINION AND ORDER Denying #183 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by CELGENE CORPORATION.. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 10/31/2018. (JB, )
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER Denying #149 MOTION to Certify Class and Appoint Class Counsel by All Plaintiffs.. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 10/30/2018. (JB, )
October 30, 2018 Filing 250 OPINION. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 10/30/2019. (JB, )
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 249 TEXT ORDER: The Telephone Conference set for 11/1/2018 is moved from 11:30 a.m. to 3:30 p.m. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 11/1/2018. (jqb, )
October 26, 2018 Filing 248 Letter from Melinda R. Coolidge re #247 Letter. (BERAN, KATIE)
October 19, 2018 Filing 247 Letter from Gavin J. Rooney, Esq. to Hon. Madeline Cox Arleo, U.S.D.J.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
October 17, 2018 Filing 246 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Evangeline Shih to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (FISCHETTI, JOSEPH)
October 17, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, EVANGELINE SHIH, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (JB, )
October 16, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee: for the admission of Evangeline Shih $ 150, receipt number NEW037704 (JB, )
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER that the application for the pro hac vice admission of Evangeline Shih, Esq. #242 is granted; counsel shall make payments to the New Jersey Lawyer's Fund for Client Protection; pay $150 to the Clerk of the United States District Court, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/12/2018. (sm)
October 10, 2018 Filing 244 NOTICE of Appearance by FRANK CHARLES CALVOSA on behalf of CELGENE CORPORATION (CALVOSA, FRANK)
October 10, 2018 Filing 243 Letter from Frank Schirripa. (SCHIRRIPA, FRANK)
October 4, 2018 Filing 242 Letter from Gavin J. Rooney to Hon. Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gavin J. Rooney, #2 Declaration of Evangeline Shih, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 241 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: There is a Telephone Status Conference set for 11/1/2018 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer (ys )
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 240 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 9/13/2018 at 11:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Counsel for plaintiff will initiate the call to 973-776-7858. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/10/2018. (jqb, )
September 4, 2018 Filing 239 Letter from Gavin J. Rooney to Hon. Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
August 20, 2018 Filing 238 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by CELGENE CORPORATION. (ROONEY, GAVIN)
August 14, 2018 Filing 237 Transcript of Teleconference held on July 31, 2018, before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Transcriber: King Transcription Services (973-237-6080). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 9/4/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/14/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/12/2018. (jml, )
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 236 FINDING OF FACTS AND CONCLUSION OF LAW AND ORDER Granting #232 Consent MOTION to Seal by CELGENE CORPORATION. It is further Ordered that portions of the following documents shall be sealed and maintained under seal and that the redacted versions of filings, when applicable shall remain publicly available, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 8/9/2018. (JB, ) Modified on 8/10/2018 (JB, ).
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER, that Celgene's request to strike those portions of Plaintiff's expert Jonathan Steed's report regarding Apotex, Inc. is denied without prejudice to Celgene's right to renew the request in a Daubert motion; etc. There shall be a telephone status conference set for 10/25/2018 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Plaintiff's counsel shall kindly initiate the call; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 07/31/2018. (sms) Modified on 8/15/2018 (jqb, ).
July 31, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Telephone Conference held on 7/31/2018. (ECR) (jqb, )
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 234 TEXT ORDER: The telephone conference in this matter will proceed at 1:00 p.m. on July 31, 2018, rather than 12:00 p.m. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/27/2018. (MAH)
July 27, 2018 Reset Hearing: The Telephone Status Conference set for 7/31/2018 is moved from 1:00 p.m. to 12:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. TIME CHANGE ONLY. (jqb, )
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 233 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 7/31/2018 at 12:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Counsel for Celgene will initiate the call to 973-776-7858. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/31/2018. (jqb, )
July 24, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #232 Consent MOTION to Seal . Motion set for 8/20/2018 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, )
July 23, 2018 Filing 232 Consent MOTION to Seal by CELGENE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin Greenblum, #2 Index, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 231 Consent Order Amending Discovery Confidentiality Order, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/11/2018. (JB, )
July 11, 2018 Filing 230 Letter from Gavin Rooney to Hon. Michael A. Hammer (REDACTED) re #229 Letter,,. (ROONEY, GAVIN)
July 9, 2018 Filing 229 Letter from Gavin J. Rooney to Hon. Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re #227 Letter. (ROONEY, GAVIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
July 9, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, REW S. CHALSON and DOMINIC F. CERRRITO, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (JB, )
July 8, 2018 Filing 228 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Andrew S. Chalson and F. Dominic Cerrito to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (FISCHETTI, JOSEPH)
July 6, 2018 Filing 227 Letter from Frank R. Schirripa re #225 Letter. (SCHIRRIPA, FRANK)
July 6, 2018 Filing 226 Letter from Gavin J. Rooney enclosing proposed Consent Order Amending re #103 Discovery Confidentiality Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
July 5, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee: for the admission of F. Dominic Cerrito and Andrew A. Hammer $ 300, receipt number NEW036853 (JB, )
July 5, 2018 Filing 225 Letter from Letter from Gavin J. Rooney to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer (Redacted). (ROONEY, GAVIN)
July 3, 2018 Filing 224 Letter from Defendant, Celgene Corp. to Judge Hammer. (ROONEY, GAVIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER granting pro hac vice admission for F. Dominic Cerrito and Andrew S. Chalson #222 , and shall make payments to the New Jersey Lawyer's Fund for Client Protection, shall pay $150 to the Clerk of the United States District Court, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/28/2018. (sm)
June 26, 2018 Filing 222 Letter from Gavin J. Rooney to Hon. Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gavin Rooney, Esq., #2 Declaration of F. Dominic Cerrito, Esq., #3 Declaration of Andrew S. Chalson, Esq., #4 Text of Proposed Order)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER WITH FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW and Granting #220 Joint MOTION to Seal Materials Related to Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Counsel by CELGENE CORPORATION, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/25/2018. (JB, )
June 18, 2018 Reset Deadlines as to #220 Joint MOTION to Seal Materials Related to Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Counsel. Motion set for 7/16/2018 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, )
June 15, 2018 Filing 220 Joint MOTION to Seal Materials Related to Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Counsel by CELGENE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Index in Support of Joint Motion to Seal, #2 Exhibit A (part 1), #3 Exhibit A (part 2), #4 Exhibit A (part 3), #5 Exhibit A (part 4), #6 Exhibit A (part 5), #7 Exhibit A (part 6), #8 Exhibit A (part 7), #9 Exhibit A (part 8), #10 Exhibit A (part 9), #11 Exhibit A (part 10), #12 Exhibit A (part 11), #13 Exhibit A (part 12), #14 Exhibit A (part 13), #15 Exhibit A (part 14), #16 Exhibit A (part 15), #17 Exhibit A (part 16), #18 Exhibit A (part 17), #19 Declaration of Daniel B. Rehns, Esq. in Support of Joint Motion to Seal, #20 Declaration of Ailyn Abin in Support of Joint Motion to Seal, #21 Text of Proposed Order, #22 Certificate of Service)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 219 TEXT ORDER denying #212 Letter request to file sur-reply. So Ordered by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 6/15/18. (aa, )
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 218 STIPULATION AND ORDER granting Parties request that motions to seal portions of the existing record on Plaintiffs' motion for class certification shall be filed on June 15, 2018, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/31/18. (cm, )
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 217 TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed the parties' May 23, 2018 letters [D.E. 213-214]. To the extent any party still seeks any fact discovery, it must so state in a letter to be filed on or before June 4, 2018. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/31/2018. (MAH)
May 31, 2018 Filing 216 Letter from Gavin J. Rooney to Hon. Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
May 23, 2018 Filing 215 Letter from Plaintiffs to Hon. Madeline Cox Arleo re #212 Letter Rule 7.1. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(BERAN, KATIE)
May 23, 2018 Filing 214 Letter from Frank R. Schirripa re #209 Status Report, #213 Letter. (SCHIRRIPA, FRANK)
May 23, 2018 Filing 213 Letter from Gavin J. Rooney re #209 Status Report. (ROONEY, GAVIN)
May 23, 2018 Filing 212 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #149 MOTION to Certify Class and Appoint Class Counsel . (ROONEY, GAVIN)
May 22, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, STEPHEN J TETI, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (JB, )
May 21, 2018 Filing 211 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #152 MOTION to Certify Class [Redacted] Memorandum in Support of Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Counsel [Pursuant to Local Rule 5.3(c)(4)] (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BERAN, KATIE)
May 18, 2018 Filing 210 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #149 MOTION to Certify Class and Appoint Class Counsel (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Melinda R. Coolidge, #2 Exhibit 110-127, #3 Declaration Rebuttal Expert Report of Jeffrey J. Leitzinger, Ph.D., #4 Declaration Expert Declaration of W. Paul DeBree, #5 Certificate of Service)(BERAN, KATIE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
May 10, 2018 Filing 209 STATUS REPORT Parties' Joint Status Report concerning (1) the resolution of third-party subpoenas and (2) authentication by All Plaintiffs. (SCHIRRIPA, FRANK)
May 9, 2018 Filing 208 Letter from Plaintiffs to Hon. Madeline Cox Arleo (corrected signature) re #205 Letter. (BERAN, KATIE)
May 9, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The letter submitted by Melinda R. Coolidge on 5/7/18 contains an improper signature. Only the filing user is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (cm, )
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #205 Letter Request. Briefs to be filed by 5/18/2018. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 5/8/2018. (sm)
May 8, 2018 Filing 206 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Stephen J. Teti to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (SARNELLI, JENNIFER)
May 7, 2018 Filing 205 Letter from Plaintiffs to Hon. Madeline Cox Arleo. (BERAN, KATIE)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 204 TEXT ORDER. Given the lengthy pendency of the exiting motion for class certification and the age of the case, the reply shall be filed by Friday, May 11. 2018. So Ordered by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on May 7, 2018. (Arleo, Madeline)
April 26, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Telephone Status Conference held on 4/26/2018. (jqb, )
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 203 TEXT ORDER: On or before May 10, 2018, the parties will submit a joint status report concerning the resolution of the third-party subpoenas issued by Plaintiff as well as authentication. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 4/26/2018. (MAH)
April 13, 2018 Filing 202 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by CELGENE CORPORATION re #183 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER granting Defendant's Celgene Corporation #199 Letter requesting a one week extension of time to file the Reply, to April 16, 2018, with a Motion Date of May 7,2018, etc. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 04/11/2018. (ek)
April 13, 2018 Reset Deadlines as to #183 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . Motion set for 5/7/2018 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ek)
April 11, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee of $150 received as to Stephen J. Teti, Esq., receipt number TRE090644. (jem)
April 5, 2018 Filing 200 Transcript of an Oral Opinion placed on the record on 3/22/2018 by Judge Michael A. Hammer. Court Reporter/Transcriber King Transcription Services/Sara L. Kern (973-237-6080). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter/Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 4/26/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/7/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/4/2018. (sm, )
April 4, 2018 Filing 199 Letter from Gavin J. Rooney, Esq. enclosing proposed Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER granting #192 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Stephen J. Teti, Esq., etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 04/03/2018. (ek)
April 2, 2018 Filing 197 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #183 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SCHIRRIPA, FRANK)
March 30, 2018 Filing 196 Letter from Winston & Strawn LLP re #194 Order. (RICHTER, JAMES)
March 29, 2018 Filing 195 NOTICE by United BioSource Corporation re 193 Order, #194 Order (QUINN, TRACY)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER regarding production of certain documents re #187 to #191 , etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 03/22/2018. (ek)
March 22, 2018 Text Only Minute Entry for an oral opinion placed on the record by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/22/2018 re letters #187 and #191 . Order to follow. (ECR) (jqb)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 193 TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed non-party United BioSource Corporation's request for additional time to respond on the issue of whether UBC will consent to production of a deposition transcript of a UBC employee [D.E. 189]. UBC shall inform the Court of whether UBC consents on or before March 29, 2018. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/22/2018. (MAH)
March 22, 2018 Filing 192 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CITY OF PROVIDENCE. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Jennifer Sarnelli, #2 Declaration of Stephen J. Teti, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(SARNELLI, JENNIFER)
March 22, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #192 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 4/16/2018 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ek)
March 16, 2018 Filing 191 Letter from Winston & Strawn re #190 Letter. (RICHTER, JAMES)
March 15, 2018 Filing 190 Letter from Gavin J. Rooney to Hon. Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re #188 Letter. (ROONEY, GAVIN)
March 14, 2018 Filing 189 NOTICE by United BioSource Corporation re 185 Order,, Letter to Court re: Defendant's request for consent from non-party United BioSource Corp. to production of deposition transcript (QUINN, TRACY)
March 14, 2018 Filing 188 Letter from Winston & Strawn LLP on behalf of Third-Party Natco Parties re #187 Letter. (RICHTER, JAMES)
March 7, 2018 Filing 187 Letter from Gavin J. Rooney. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Natco-Barr Documents)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
March 5, 2018 Filing 186 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #183 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . (SCHIRRIPA, FRANK)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 185 TEXT ORDER: The next telephone conference will be on April 26, 2018, at 12:00 p.m. Counsel for the parties in this case will continue to meet and confer with counsel for Natco regarding any issues arising from production of Natco materials in this case. If counsel cannot resolve the production issue, counsel for the parties in this case shall file a letter, on notice to Natco's counsel, on or before March 7, 2018 setting forth their position on the production issue. Natco shall respond to any such letter not later than March 14, 2018. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/28/2018. (MAH)
February 28, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Telephone Status Conference held on 2/28/2018. (jqb, )
February 27, 2018 Filing 184 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by CELGENE CORPORATION re #152 MOTION to Certify Class [Redacted] Memorandum in Support of Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Counsel [Pursuant to Local Rule 5.3(c)(4)] (Redacted) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
February 27, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #183 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . Motion set for 4/2/2018 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ek)
February 26, 2018 Filing 183 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by CELGENE CORPORATION. Responses due by 3/19/2018 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Benjamin M. Greenblum, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Benjamin M. Greenblum, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Benjamin M. Greenblum, #5 Exhibit C to Declaration of Benjamin M. Greenblum, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
February 26, 2018 Filing 182 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by CELGENE CORPORATION re #149 MOTION to Certify Class and Appoint Class Counsel (Attachments: #1 Appendix A to Memorandum of Law, #2 Appendix B to Memorandum of Law, #3 Declaration of John E. Schmidtlein, #4 Exhibit s 1-6 to Declaration of John E. Schmidtlein, #5 Exhibit s 7-11 to Declaration of John E. Schmidtlein, #6 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of John E. Schmidtlein, #7 Exhibit 13 to Declaration of John E. Schmidtlein, #8 Exhibit 14 to Declaration of John E. Schmidtlein, #9 Exhibit 15 to Declaration of John E. Schmidtlein, #10 Exhibit s 16-17 to Declaration of John E. Schmidtlein, #11 Exhibit s 18-20 to Declaration of John E. Schmidtlein, #12 Exhibit 21 to Declaration of John E. Schmidtlein, #13 Exhibit 22 to Declaration of John E. Schmidtlein, #14 Exhibit 23 to Declaration of John E. Schmidtlein, #15 Exhibit s 24-33 to Declaration of John E. Schmidtlein, #16 Exhibit 34 to Declaration of John E. Schmidtlein, #17 Exhibit 35-A to Declaration of John E. Schmidtlein, #18 Exhibit 35-B to Declaration of John E. Schmidtlein, #19 Exhibit s 36-38 to Declaration of John E. Schmidtlein, #20 Certificate of Service)(ROONEY, GAVIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
February 22, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, Christopher Heffelfinger, Esq., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ek)
February 21, 2018 Filing 181 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Christopher Heffelfinger to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8492698.) (SCHIRRIPA, FRANK)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER re #179 letter request permitting Celgene to file an over length brief, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/20/2018. (sm, )
February 16, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee as to Christopher T. Heffelfinger: $ 150, receipt number CAM009461 (dmr)
February 14, 2018 Filing 179 Letter from Gavin J. Rooney to Hon. Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 178 LETTER ORDER: A Telephone Scheduling Conference is set for 4/27/2018 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the call. The deadline for expert discovery in this matter is April 30, 2018, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 2/14/18. (cm, )
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER FOR PRODUCTION OF CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS, etc. re #176 Letter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/13/18. (cm, )
February 14, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note the LETTER ORDER attached to docket entry #178 filed by the Clerk's office on 2/14/2018 was docketed in error. Please disregard. (cm, )
February 8, 2018 Filing 176 Letter from Gavin J. Rooney to Hon. Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER granting #167 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christopher T. Heffelfinger, Esq., etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/28/2017. (ek)
December 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 174 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO MERGE DOCKETS: Civil Action No. 2:17-cv-04319-MCA-LDW (the First Related Action), Civil Action No. 2:17-cv-07637-MCA-MAH (the Second Related Action), are consolidated into the Master Action 14-6997 for all purposes, etc. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 12/21/2017. (ek)
December 19, 2017 Pro Hac Vice fee of $150 received as to Jeffrey A. Barrack, Esq, receipt number TRE087164 (mps)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 173 STIPULATED AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone/Status Conference set for 2/28/2018 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Fact Discovery due by 5/17/2018; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/1/17. (DD, )
December 4, 2017 Pro Hac Vice counsel, Taylor G. Weaver, STACIE M. FAHSEL, CAROL J. PRUSKI and LAUREN K. COLLOGAN, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ek)
December 1, 2017 Filing 172 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Taylor G. Weaver, Esq.; Stacie M. Fahsel, Esq.; Carol J. Pruski, Esq.; Lauren K. Collogan, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (FISCHETTI, JOSEPH)
December 1, 2017 Set Deadlines as to #167 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher T. Heffelfinger. Motion set for 1/2/2018 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ek)
December 1, 2017 Pro Hac Vice fee for TAYLOR WEAVER, ESQ.; STACIE FAHSEL, ESQ.; CAROL J. PRUSKI, ESQ.; & LAUREN COLLOGAN, ESQ.: $600, receipt number NEW035089 (dam)
November 30, 2017 Filing 171 CERTIFICATE of Counsel (Certificate of Service) by KATIE ROSE BERAN on behalf of All Plaintiffs (BERAN, KATIE)
November 30, 2017 Filing 170 AFFIDAVIT of Jeffrey J. Leitzinger re #150 Brief,,,, #149 MOTION to Certify Class and Appoint Class Counsel Supplement to Expert Report of Jeffrey J. Leitzinger, Ph.D. by All Plaintiffs. (BERAN, KATIE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 30, 2017 Filing 169 AFFIDAVIT of Luis Molina re #150 Brief,,,, #149 MOTION to Certify Class and Appoint Class Counsel Supplement to Expert Report of Luis A. Molina by All Plaintiffs. (BERAN, KATIE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 30, 2017 Filing 168 Letter from Gavin J. Rooney, Esq. to Hon. Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J.. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and Proposed Amended Scheduling Order)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
November 29, 2017 Filing 167 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher T. Heffelfinger by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Frank R. Schirripa, #2 Declaration of Christopher T. Heffelfinger, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(SCHIRRIPA, FRANK)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER granting #165 Letter/Application for a Pro Hac Vice Admission of Taylor Weaver, Esq., Stacie Fahsel, Esq., Carol J. Pruski, Esq., and Lauren Collogan,Esq., etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 11/29/2017. (ek)
November 28, 2017 Filing 165 Letter from Gavin J. Rooney, Esq. to Hon. Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gavin J. Rooney, Esq., #2 Declaration of Lauren K. Collogan, Esq., #3 Declaration of Stacie M. Fahsel, Esq., #4 Declaration of Carol J. Pruski, Esq., #5 Declaration of Taylor G. Weaver, Esq., #6 Text of Proposed Order)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER granting #161 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey A. Barrack, Esq., etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 11/27/2017. (ek)
November 14, 2017 Filing 163 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Merge Dockets by All Plaintiffs. (SCHIRRIPA, FRANK)
November 7, 2017 Filing 162 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re #161 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey A. Barrack Notice of Motion (SCHIRRIPA, FRANK)
November 7, 2017 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please review the MOTION attached to docket entry #161 submitted by FRANK SCHIRRIPA on 11/06/2017. If this document was attached in error, PLEASE RESUBMIT THE CORRECT DOCUMENT. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (ek)
November 6, 2017 Filing 161 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey A. Barrack by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Frank R. Schirripa, #2 Declaration of Jeffrey A. Barrack, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(SCHIRRIPA, FRANK)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 160 TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed the parties' letters [D.E. 157-159] concerning the order of filing any motion to seal the class certification briefing. Pursuant to L. Civ. R. 5.3(c), the parties shall file any application to seal not less than 14 days after the motion for class certification is fully and completely briefed for all parties. The parties shall not file a separate motion to seal after the filing of each brief/accompanying submissions on the class certification motion. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 11-6-2017. (MAH)
November 2, 2017 Filing 159 Letter from Gavin J. Rooney, Esq. to Hon. Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re #158 Letter. (ROONEY, GAVIN)
October 31, 2017 Filing 158 Letter from Plaintiffs re #157 Letter, #156 Order on Motion to Seal,. (SCHIRRIPA, FRANK)
October 30, 2017 Filing 157 Letter from Gavin J. Rooney, Esq. to Hon. Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re #156 Order on Motion to Seal,. (ROONEY, GAVIN)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiffs' #151 Motion to Seal to the right of any movant to file a renewed motion to seal that complies fully with all requirements and provisions of Local Civil Rules 5.3(c) and 7.1(d); Nothing herein constitutes a ruling as to whether or not the material identified [D.E. 149, 150] warrants sealing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/26/2017. (ek)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting #147 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Todd A. Seaver, Esq., etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/21/2017. (ek)
October 26, 2017 Filing 153 CERTIFICATION in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #147 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Todd A. Seaver by Frank R. Schirripa (SCHIRRIPA, FRANK)
October 26, 2017 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note the Opinion attached to docket entry #154 filed by the Clerk's office on 10/26/17 was docketed in error. Please disregard. (sr, )
October 25, 2017 Filing 154 OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 10/25/17. (sr, )
October 4, 2017 Set Deadlines as to #152 MOTION to Certify Class [Redacted] Memorandum in Support of Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Counsel [Pursuant to Local Rule 5.3(c)(4)]. Motion set for 11/6/2017 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ek)
October 3, 2017 Filing 152 MOTION to Certify Class [Redacted] Memorandum in Support of Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Counsel [Pursuant to Local Rule 5.3(c)(4)] by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 1/10/2018 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BERAN, KATIE)
October 3, 2017 Set Deadlines as to #149 MOTION to Certify Class and Appoint Class Counsel, #151 MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Law, Declarations, and Exhibits in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification Pursuant to Rule 23. Motion set for 11/6/2017 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ek)
October 2, 2017 Filing 151 MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Law, Declarations, and Exhibits in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification Pursuant to Rule 23 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BERAN, KATIE)
October 2, 2017 Filing 150 BRIEF in Support of Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Counsel (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Melinda R. Coolidge in Support of Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Counsel, #2 Exhibit 1-20, #3 Exhibit 21-33, #4 Exhibit 34-59, #5 Exhibit 60-90, #6 Exhibit 91-100, #7 Exhibit 101-104, #8 Exhibit 105-109, #9 Appendix A and Exhibits A1-A40, #10 Appendix Exhibits A41-A90, #11 Appendix Exhibits A91-A111, #12 Appendix B, #13 Appendix C, #14 Appendix D and Exhibits D1-D12, #15 Appendix E, #16 Expert Report of Luis A. Molina, #17 Expert Report of Jeffrey J. Leitzinger, Ph.D., #18 Text of Proposed Order, #19 Certificate of Service)(BERAN, KATIE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
October 2, 2017 Filing 149 MOTION to Certify Class and Appoint Class Counsel by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 1/10/2018 (BERAN, KATIE)
October 2, 2017 Filing 148 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Consolidated) by CELGENE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
October 2, 2017 Filing 147 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Todd A. Seaver by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Todd A. Seaver, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(SCHIRRIPA, FRANK)
October 2, 2017 Set Deadlines as to #147 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Todd A. Seaver. Motion set for 11/6/2017 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ek)
September 22, 2017 Filing 146 Transcript of Status Conference Proceedings held on June 26, 2017, before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Court Reporter: Charles McGuire (215-840-7030). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter Agency due, but not filed, by 10/13/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/23/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/21/2017. (mfr)
August 18, 2017 Filing 145 Letter from Frank R. Schirripa Concerning Resolution of Certain Discovery Distputes. (SCHIRRIPA, FRANK)
August 3, 2017 Filing 144 Transcript of Telephone Conference Proceedings held on July 31, 2017, before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Transcriber: King Transcription Services (973-237-6080). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 8/24/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/5/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/1/2017. (mfr)
August 1, 2017 Filing 143 AMENDED COMPLAINT Consolidated Amended Complaint against CELGENE CORPORATION, filed by CITY OF PROVIDENCE, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFT WORKERS LOCAL 1 HEALTH FUND, David Mitchell, International Union of Operating Engineers Stationary Engineers Local 39 Health and Welfare Trust Fund, THE DETECTIVES' ENDOWMENT ASSOCIATION, INC..(SCHIRRIPA, FRANK)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 142 STIPULATION AND ORDER that Plaintiffs have leave to file a Consolidated Amended Complaint; Defendant shall have 60 days to answer the Consolidated Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 08/01/2017. (ek)
July 31, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Telephone Conference held on 7/31/2017. (ak, )
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER that the parties shall meet and confer and by August 18, 2017, the parties shall submit a proposed amended discovery schedule; If the parties are unable to come to an agreement regarding the discovery issues raised in parties' July 27, 2017 letter, D.E. 139, each party shall submit a letter, not to exceed 10 double-spaced pages, outlining their position on those issues by August 18, 2017, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 07/31/2017. (ek)
July 31, 2017 Filing 140 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER ON LEAVE TO FILE CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEFENDANTS' TIME TO ANSWER CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT by CITY OF PROVIDENCE, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFT WORKERS LOCAL 1 HEALTH FUND, International Union of Operating Engineers Stationary Engineers Local 39 Health and Welfare Trust Fund, THE DETECTIVES' ENDOWMENT ASSOCIATION, INC., David Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - DRAFT Consolidated Amended Complaint)(SCHIRRIPA, FRANK)
July 27, 2017 Filing 139 Letter from Frank R. Schirripa (Joint Letter). (SCHIRRIPA, FRANK)
July 17, 2017 Filing 138 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney ERICA G. LANGSEN terminated. (SARNELLI, JENNIFER)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER ON DISCOVERY ISSUES AND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 7/31/2017 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Amended Pleadings due by 7/17/2017. Fact Discovery due by 4/2/2018, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 07/10/2017. (ek)
July 7, 2017 Filing 136 Letter from non-party Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to Magistrate Judge Hammer re #133 Letter. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
July 5, 2017 Filing 135 Letter from Gavin J. Rooney. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
June 28, 2017 Filing 133 Letter from non-party Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to Magistrate Judge Hammer. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 TEXT ORDER: On or before July 5, 2017, the parties will jointly submit a proposed form of Order embodying the Court's rulings at the June 26, 2017 conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/27/2017. (MAH)
June 27, 2017 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre no longer assigned to the case. (ak, )
June 26, 2017 Filing 134 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo: Status Conference held on 6/26/2017. (Court Reporter/Recorder Charles McGuire.) (aa, )
June 22, 2017 Filing 131 Letter from Gavin J. Rooney, Esq. re 128 Order,, Set Hearings,. (ROONEY, GAVIN)
June 22, 2017 Filing 130 Letter from Plaintiffs Regarding June 9, 2017 Order. (BERAN, KATIE)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 TEXT ORDER - The Telephone Conference set for 7/10/2017 is adjourned with no new date in light of the In Person Conference set for 6/26/2017.So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 6/14/2017. (kd)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 TEXT ORDER, setting an in person Status Conference for 6/26/2017 at 3:00 PM in Newark - Courtroom 4A before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. By or before 6/22/17, each party is to deliver to the Court a letter, not to exceed 5 pages, summarizing the relevant facts, the respective legal positions, status of the case, and the client's position on settlement. So Ordered by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 6/9/17. (aa, )
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 127 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre for all further proceedings. Judge Katharine S. Hayden, Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 6/8/17. (ak, )
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 TEXT ORDER: The telephone conference scheduled for 6/6/17 will be adjourned to 7/10/17 at 4 PM. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 6/6/17. (tjg, )
June 5, 2017 Filing 125 Letter from Gavin J. Rooney, Esq. to Hon. Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. re 124 Order. (ROONEY, GAVIN)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 TEXT ORDER: The telephone conference scheduled for 5/10/17 will be adjourned to 6/6/17 at 2:15 PM. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 5/9/17. (tjg, )
May 8, 2017 Filing 123 Letter from Gavin J. Rooney, Esq., to Hon. Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. re 116 Order. (ROONEY, GAVIN)
April 28, 2017 Filing 122 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY B. GITTLEMAN on behalf of CITY OF PROVIDENCE, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFT WORKERS LOCAL 1 HEALTH FUND (GITTLEMAN, JEFFREY)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER re #120 Letter from Daniel B. Rehns re: Joint Request by Plaintiffs and Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to Stay the February 1, 2017 Conference with Judge Waldor on Plaintiffs Request for Leave to File a Motion to Compel, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 01/31/2017. (ek)
January 30, 2017 Filing 120 Letter from Daniel B. Rehns re: Joint Request by Plaintiffs and Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to Stay the February 1, 2017 Conference with Judge Waldor on Plaintiffs Request for Leave to File a Motion to Compel. (SCHIRRIPA, FRANK)
January 25, 2017 Filing 119 Transcript of Proceedings of a Telephone Conference held on 1/17/2017, before Judge Cathy L. Waldor. Court Reporter/Transcriber King Transcription Services/Sara L. Kern (973-237-6080). NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 2/15/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/27/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/25/2017. (Miller, S)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 STIPULATION AND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery due by 2/1/2018, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 01/18/2017. (ek)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference, to be initiated by plaintiff, on 2/1/17 at 4:00 PM. Parties may contact chambers at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/18/17. (tjg, )
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference, to be initiated by plaintiff, on 5/10/17 at 1:00 PM. Parties may contact chambers at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/17/17. (tjg, )
January 17, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 1/17/2017. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (tjg, )
January 13, 2017 Filing 115 Letter from Arnold B. Calmann, Esq. on behalf of Mylan, to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. re #109 Letter. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
January 12, 2017 Filing 114 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Amended Schduling Order by CITY OF PROVIDENCE, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFT WORKERS LOCAL 1 HEALTH FUND. (SCHIRRIPA, FRANK)
January 12, 2017 Filing 113 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Amended Scheduling Order by CITY OF PROVIDENCE, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFT WORKERS LOCAL 1 HEALTH FUND. (SCHIRRIPA, FRANK)
January 12, 2017 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The document (d.e #113 ) filed by Frank Schirripa on 1/12/2017 has been filed incorrectly. PLEASE disregard. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mfg)
January 11, 2017 Filing 112 NOTICE of Appearance by KATIE ROSE BERAN on behalf of INTERNATIONAL UNION OF BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFT WORKERS LOCAL 1 HEALTH FUND (BERAN, KATIE)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 TEXT ORDER: The Court will grant counsels request to adjourn the 1/11/17 teleconference to 1/17/17 at 3:45pm. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/10/17. (tjg, )
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 NOTICE AND ORDER OF WITHDRAWAL OF PRO HAC VICE COUNSEL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/9/2017. (seb)
January 9, 2017 Filing 109 Letter from Gavin J. Rooney, Esq. to Hon. Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. re #106 Letter. (ROONEY, GAVIN)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference, to be initiated by Plaintiff, on 1/11/17 at 4:15 PM. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/9/17. (tjg, )
January 6, 2017 Filing 107 Letter from Gavin J. Rooney, Esq. to Hon. Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
January 5, 2017 Filing 106 Letter from Daniel B. Rehns requesting leave to file motion to compel non-party compliance with subpoena. (SCHIRRIPA, FRANK)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Consent Order Amending Stipulated Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/21/2016. (seb)
November 18, 2016 Filing 104 Letter from Gavin J. Rooney, Esq. to Hon. Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. re #103 Discovery Confidentiality Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Amended Stipulated Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 8/4/2016. (seb)
August 2, 2016 Filing 102 Letter from Frank R. Schirripa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Proposed Amended Stipulated Discovery Confidentiality Order, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Blackline Proposed Amended Stipulated Discovery Confidentiality Order)(REHNS, DANIEL)
June 7, 2016 Pro Hac Vice counsel, James H. Weingarten, Esq., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (seb)
June 3, 2016 Filing 101 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice James H. Weingarten, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (FISCHETTI, JOSEPH)
May 31, 2016 Pro Hac Vice fee as to James H. Weingarten received: $ 150, receipt number NEW029800 (seb)
May 31, 2016 Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL B. REHNS on behalf of INTERNATIONAL UNION OF BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFT WORKERS LOCAL 1 HEALTH FUND (REHNS, DANIEL)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting #98 Motion for James H. Weingarten to Appear Pro Hac Vice, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 5/25/2016. (seb)
May 24, 2016 Filing 98 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for James H. Weingarten, Esq. by CELGENE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gavin Rooney, Esq., #2 Declaration of James H. Weingarten, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
May 17, 2016 Pro Hac Vice counsel, Kevin Hardy, Esq., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (seb)
May 16, 2016 Filing 97 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Kevin Hardy to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (FISCHETTI, JOSEPH)
May 16, 2016 Pro Hac Vice fee as to Kevin Hardy received: $ 150, receipt number NEW029661 (seb)
May 16, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 5/16/2016. (tjg, )
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting #95 Motion for Kevin Hardy to Appear Pro Hac Vice, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 5/13/2016. (seb)
May 13, 2016 Set Deadlines as to #95 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kevin Hardy. Motion set for 6/6/2016 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (seb)
May 12, 2016 Filing 95 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kevin Hardy by CELGENE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gavin J. Rooney, Esq., #2 Declaration of Kevin Hardy, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
May 3, 2016 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES STUART NOTIS on behalf of CITY OF PROVIDENCE (NOTIS, JAMES)
April 15, 2016 Filing 93 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL RUSSO terminated. (SARNELLI, JENNIFER)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting #66 Motion to Appoint Interim Co-Lead Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 4/1/2016. (seb)
April 1, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Status Conference held on 4/1/2016. (tjg, )
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 TEXT ORDER: The Court grants the request (ECF No. 90) and the teleconference is hereby rescheduled to Monday, May 16, 2016 at 4:00 PM. The in-person status conference (ECF No. 80) will proceed as scheduled. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/14/16. (tjg, )
March 14, 2016 Filing 90 Letter from Frank R. Schirripa re #80 Scheduling Order,. (SCHIRRIPA, FRANK)
March 1, 2016 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL RUSSO on behalf of CITY OF PROVIDENCE (RUSSO, CHRISTOPHER)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER re ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION PROTOCOL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/23/2016. (seb)
February 19, 2016 Filing 87 STIPULATION and Propsed Order re ESI Protocol by INTERNATIONAL UNION OF BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFT WORKERS LOCAL 1 HEALTH FUND. (SCHIRRIPA, FRANK)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 STIPULATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER; the deadline for a joint submission of an ESI Protocol is extended until February 19, 2016. All other deadlines set forth in the Scheduling Order remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/5/2016. (ld, )
February 4, 2016 Filing 85 Letter from Gavin J. Rooney to Hon. Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Stipulation and Proposed Scheduling Order)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 STIPULATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER - The deadline for a joint submission of an ESI Protocol is extended until 2/5/2016; All other deadlines set forth in the Scheduling Order remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/20/2016. (anr)
January 19, 2016 Filing 83 Letter from Gavin J. Rooney. (ROONEY, GAVIN)
January 11, 2016 Filing 82 ANSWER to Complaint of City of Providence by CELGENE CORPORATION.(ROONEY, GAVIN)
January 11, 2016 Filing 81 ANSWER to Complaint of International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craft Workers Local 1 Health Fund by CELGENE CORPORATION.(ROONEY, GAVIN)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 3/15/2016 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. In-Person Status Conference set for 4/1/2016 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. Fact Discovery due by 8/1/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/5/2016. (ld, )
January 5, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Status Conference held on 1/5/2016. (tjg, )
December 29, 2015 Filing 79 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Scheduling Order by INTERNATIONAL UNION OF BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFT WORKERS LOCAL 1 HEALTH FUND. (BLYTH, JOHN)
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 78 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an in-person status conference on 4/1/16 at 1:00 PM. All proposed interim co-lead counsel, as defined by the October 28, 2015 motion, shall appear at the conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 12/18/15. (tjg, )
December 3, 2015 Filing 77 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. (ROONEY, GAVIN)
November 30, 2015 Filing 76 Letter from Frank R. Schirripa re #66 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Hach Rose Schirripa & Cheverie LLP, Hausfeld LLP, and Block & Leviton LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel. Attorney: Frank R. Schirripa, Melinda Coolidge, and Whitney E. Street.. (SCHIRRIPA, FRANK)
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT, Plaintiffs and Defendant hereby stipulate and agree that Defendantstime to file an Answer with respect to each Complaint should be and is extended to 1/11/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/12/2015. (anr)
November 9, 2015 Filing 74 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Dane H. Butswinkas, John E. Schmidtlein, Benjamin M. Greenblum, David S. Kurtzer-Ellenbogen to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (FISCHETTI, JOSEPH)
November 9, 2015 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 600, receipt number NEW027797 (Re: Dane H. Butswinkas, John E. Schmidtlein, Benjamin M. Greenblum, and David S. Kurtzer-Ellenbogen) (anr)
November 9, 2015 Pro Hac Vice counsel, DANE H. BUTSWINKAS, JOHN E. SCHMIDTLEIN, BENJAMIN GREENBLUM and DAVID S. KURTZER-ELLENBOGEN, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (anr)
November 6, 2015 Filing 73 STIPULATION and Proposed Order for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by CELGENE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #70 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kristen Ward. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/4//2015. (anr)
November 4, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #70 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kristen Ward. Motion set for 12/7/2015 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (anr)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting #69 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice RE: Dane H. Butswinkas, John E. Schmidtlein, Benjamin M. Greenblum, David S. Kurtzer-Ellenbogen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/3/15. (sr, )
November 3, 2015 Filing 70 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kristen Ward by INTERNATIONAL UNION OF BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFT WORKERS LOCAL 1 HEALTH FUND. (BLYTH, JOHN)
November 3, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #69 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Dane H. Butswinkas, John E. Schmidtlein, Benjamin M. Greenblum, and David S. Kurtzer-Ellenbogen. Motion set for 12/7/2015 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (sr, )
November 2, 2015 Filing 69 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Dane H. Butswinkas, John E. Schmidtlein, Benjamin M. Greenblum, and David S. Kurtzer-Ellenbogen by CELGENE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gavin J. Rooney, Esq., #2 Declaration of Dane H. Butswinkas, Esq., #3 Declaration of John E. Schmidtlein, Esq., #4 Declaration of Benjamin M. Greenblum, Esq., #5 Declaration of David S. Kurtzer-Ellenbogen, Esq., #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER, Celgene's Motions to Dismiss #35 and #20 are denied. Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 10/29/2015. (anr)
October 29, 2015 Filing 67 OPINION. Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 10/29/2015. (anr)
October 28, 2015 Filing 66 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Hach Rose Schirripa & Cheverie LLP, Hausfeld LLP, and Block & Leviton LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel. Attorney: Frank R. Schirripa, Melinda Coolidge, and Whitney E. Street. by INTERNATIONAL UNION OF BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFT WORKERS LOCAL 1 HEALTH FUND. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Frank R. Schirripa, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Melinda Coolidge, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Whitney E. Street, #5 Exhibit E - Proposed Order Appointing Co-Lead Class Counsel)(BLYTH, JOHN)
October 28, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #66 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Hach Rose Schirripa & Cheverie LLP, Hausfeld LLP, and Block & Leviton LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel. Attorney: Frank R. Schirripa, Melinda Coolidge, and Whitney E. Street.. Motion set for 12/7/2015 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (anr)
October 8, 2015 Filing 65 Letter from Frank R. Schirripa re #63 Letter. (SCHIRRIPA, FRANK)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference, to be initiated by plaintiff, on 1/5/16 at 3:00 PM. Parties may contact chambers at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 10/8/15. (tjg, )
October 8, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Status Conference held on 10/8/2015. (tjg, )
October 7, 2015 Filing 63 Letter from Gavin J. Rooney, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
September 30, 2015 Filing 62 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Extending the ESI Protocol deadline by INTERNATIONAL UNION OF BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFT WORKERS LOCAL 1 HEALTH FUND. (SCHIRRIPA, FRANK)
September 23, 2015 Filing 61 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Christopher B. Blazejewski to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (SARNELLI, JENNIFER)
September 23, 2015 Pro Hac Vice counsel, CHRISTOPHER R. BLAZEJEWSKI, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (anr)
September 21, 2015 Pro Hac Vice fee as to Christopher R. Blazejewski: $ 150, receipt number CAM007217 (dmr)
September 8, 2015 Filing 60 Letter from Gavin J. Rooney, Esq. re #59 Letter. (ROONEY, GAVIN)
September 2, 2015 Filing 59 Letter from Frank R. Schirripa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplemental Authority)(SCHIRRIPA, FRANK)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #57 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher R. Blazejewski. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/1/2015. (anr)
September 1, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #57 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 10/5/2015 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (anr)
August 31, 2015 Filing 57 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CITY OF PROVIDENCE. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Jennifer Sarnelli, #2 Affidavit of Christopher R. Blazejewski, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(SARNELLI, JENNIFER)
August 10, 2015 Filing 56 Letter from Gavin J. Rooney in response to Plaintiffs' recent letter re #55 Letter,. (ROONEY, GAVIN)
August 6, 2015 Filing 55 Letter from Frank R. Schirripa re #24 Letter, #20 MOTION to Dismiss , #35 MOTION to Dismiss City of Providence's State Law Claims, #40 Brief in Opposition to Motion, #29 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Neale vs. Volvo Cars of N. Am.)(SCHIRRIPA, FRANK)
August 5, 2015 Filing 54 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney NICOLE DENISE BEARCE terminated. (ROONEY, GAVIN)
July 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Stipulated Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/14/2015. (anr)
July 13, 2015 Filing 52 AFFIDAVIT/Certification in support of discovery confidentiality order of Jennifer Sarnelli re #50 Letter, by CITY OF PROVIDENCE. (SARNELLI, JENNIFER)
July 13, 2015 Filing 51 Certification of Gavin J. Rooney, Esq. in Support of Discovery Confidentiality Order on behalf of CELGENE CORPORATION Re #50 Letter,. (ROONEY, GAVIN)
July 13, 2015 Filing 50 Letter from John A. Blyth, Esq. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. enclosing a stipulated proposed Discovery Confidentiality Order and Certification of Frank R. Schirripa, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Discovery Confidentiality Order, #2 Certification of Frank R. Schirripa, Esq.)(BLYTH, JOHN)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER re: Discovery Schedule Through 10/1/2015; Parties are to exchange a proposed Discovery Confidentiality Order by 7/9/2015; The parties will meet and confer regarding Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents, including any requests for additional materials produced, filed, or generated in the Mylan and Natco litigations; The Court shall hold a second discovery teleconference on 10/8/2015 at 2:45 P.M., etc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/6/2015. (anr)
July 1, 2015 Filing 48 Joint Discovery Plan by INTERNATIONAL UNION OF BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFT WORKERS LOCAL 1 HEALTH FUND.(BLYTH, JOHN)
June 19, 2015 Filing 47 Transcript of Proceedings held on 6/4/2015, before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. Transcriber: King Transcription Services (973-237-6080). RULE 16 HEARING. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 7/10/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/20/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/17/2015. (mfr)
June 4, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/4/2015. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (tjg, )
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 TEXT ORDER: The request to adjourn the 6/4/15 Rule 16 conference is DENIED. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 6/2/15. (tjg, )
May 27, 2015 Filing 45 Letter from Gavin J. Rooney, Esq. to Hon. Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. re #44 Letter, #43 Letter. (ROONEY, GAVIN)
May 27, 2015 Filing 44 Letter from Frank R. Schirripa, Esq. to Hon. Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J., submitted in response to Defendant's letter dated May 22, 2015 (Dkt. 43). (BLYTH, JOHN)
May 22, 2015 Filing 43 Letter from Gavin J. Rooney, Esq. to Hon. Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J.. (ROONEY, GAVIN)
May 15, 2015 Filing 42 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Whitney E. Street to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (SARNELLI, JENNIFER)
May 15, 2015 Pro Hac Vice counsel, WHITNEY E. STREET, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (anr)
May 13, 2015 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW025793 re: Whitney E. Street, Esq. (anr)
May 11, 2015 Filing 41 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by CELGENE CORPORATION re #35 MOTION to Dismiss City of Providence's State Law Claims (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BEARCE, NICOLE)
May 4, 2015 Filing 40 BRIEF in Opposition filed by CITY OF PROVIDENCE re #35 MOTION to Dismiss City of Providence's State Law Claims (SARNELLI, JENNIFER)
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER, Plaintiffs request for an automatic extension pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(d)(5) is DENIED. The Courts prior order #32 stands. Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 4/28/2015. (anr)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #36 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to WHITNEY E. STREET, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 4/27/2015. (ld, )
April 24, 2015 Filing 37 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #35 MOTION to Dismiss City of Providence's State Law Claims . (SARNELLI, JENNIFER)
April 24, 2015 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Whitney Street by CITY OF PROVIDENCE. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Jennifer Sarnelli, #2 Affidavit of Whitney Street, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(SARNELLI, JENNIFER)
April 24, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #36 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Whitney Street. Motion set for 5/18/2015 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (sr, )
April 21, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #35 MOTION to Dismiss City of Providence's State Law Claims. Motion set for 5/18/2015 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, )
April 20, 2015 Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss City of Providence's State Law Claims by CELGENE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Providence's State Law Claims, #2 Declaration of Nicole D. Bearce, Esq., in Support of Motion to Dismiss Providence's State Law Claims, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(BEARCE, NICOLE)
April 15, 2015 Pro Hac Vice counsel, ROSANNA K. MCCALIPS and MARK R. LENTZ, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (nr, )
April 13, 2015 Pro Hac Vice counsel, KEVIN D. MCDONALD, ESQ. has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, )
April 9, 2015 Filing 34 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Kevin D. McDonald, Rosanna K. McCalips, Mark R. Lentz to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (FISCHETTI, JOSEPH)
April 8, 2015 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW024089 Re: Rosanna K. McCalips. (sr, )
April 8, 2015 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW024090 RE: Mark R. Lentz. (sr, )
April 8, 2015 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW024088 Re: Kevin D. McDonald. (sr, )
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to KEVIN D. MCDONALD, ESQ., ROSANNA K. MCCLIPS, ESQ., and MARK R. LENTZ, ESQ. ORDERED that Counsel shall pay $150.00 on each admission to the Clerk, United States District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/31/2015. (TH, )
March 31, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #30 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kevin D. McDonald, Rosanna K. McCalips, and Mark R. Lentz. Motion set for 5/4/2015 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, )
March 31, 2015 Pro Hac Vice counsel, STEPHEN NEUWIRTH, ADAM B. WOLFSON and STEIG OLSON, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (anr)
March 30, 2015 Filing 31 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by CELGENE CORPORATION re #20 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
March 30, 2015 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kevin D. McDonald, Rosanna K. McCalips, and Mark R. Lentz by CELGENE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gavin J. Rooney, #2 Declaration of Kevin D. McDonald, #3 Declaration of Rosanna K. McCalips, #4 Declaration of Mark R. Lentz, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER consolidating Civil Action Nos. 14-6997 and 15-1605 for all purposes under Civil Action No. 14-6997; that every pleading in the Consolidated Actions shall bear the following caption: In re Thalomid and Revlimid Antitrust Litigation, C.A. No. 2:14-cv-06997-KSH-CLW; that Pltfs. in the Actions will file an omnibus opposition to Celgene's motion to dismiss pursuant to the current schedule; that Celgene accepts service of the Complaint in the Providence Action effective 3/16/15, etc., Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 3/25/15. (dc, )
March 17, 2015 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by INTERNATIONAL UNION OF BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFT WORKERS LOCAL 1 HEALTH FUND re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Frank R. Schirripa, #2 Exhibit A to Schirripa Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Schirripa Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Schirripa Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Schirripa Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to Schirripa Declaration, #7 Exhibit F to Schirripa Declaration, #8 Certificate of Service)(BLYTH, JOHN)
March 17, 2015 Filing 28 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Stephen Neuwirth, Adam B. Wolfson, Steig D. Olson to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (FISCHETTI, JOSEPH)
March 17, 2015 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW023247 RE: Adam Wolfson. (sr, )
March 17, 2015 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW023248 RE: Steig Olson. (sr, )
March 17, 2015 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW023246 RE: Stephen Neuwirth. (sr, )
March 13, 2015 Filing 27 Letter from Jennifer Sarnelli re #26 Stipulation. (SARNELLI, JENNIFER)
March 13, 2015 Filing 26 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Regarding the Consolidation of Present Action With Related Action (Case No. 2:15-cv-01605-KM-SCM) by INTERNATIONAL UNION OF BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFT WORKERS LOCAL 1 HEALTH FUND. (BLYTH, JOHN)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to STEPHEN NEUWIRTH, ESQ., ADAM B. WOLFSON, ESQ. AND STEIG D. OLSON, ESQ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/3/15. (DD, ) Modified on 3/6/2015 (th).
February 25, 2015 Filing 24 Letter from Gavin Rooney enclosing Corrected Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss re #20 MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certificate of Service)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER: Defendants are to re-file their brief appropriately formatted and without footnotes on or before 2/25/15; Responses shall be due by 3/17/2015 and the return date for the #20 MOTION to Dismiss is reset for 4/6/2015 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court.). So Ordered by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 2/18/15. (rg, )
February 18, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Katharine S. Hayden: Status phone conference held on 2/18/2015. (rg, )
February 17, 2015 Filing 22 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiff's Application For Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss.. (BLYTH, JOHN)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor in courtroom 4C on 6/4/15 at 12:00 PM. Parties are to submit a Joint Discovery Plan no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/4/15. (tjg, )
February 4, 2015 Set Deadlines as to #20 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 3/2/2015 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (jd, )
February 3, 2015 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss by CELGENE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Gavin J. Rooney, Esq., #3 Exhibit 1-3 to Rooney Declaration, #4 Exhibit 4-10 to Rooney Declaration, #5 Exhibit 11-16 to Rooney Declaration, #6 Exhibit 17-20 to Rooney Declaration, #7 Exhibit 21-23 to Rooney Declaration, #8 Exhibit 24-27 to Rooney Declaration, #9 Exhibit 28-30 to Rooney Declaration, #10 Exhibit 31-35 to Rooney Declaration, #11 Exhibit 36-39 to Rooney Declaration, #12 Exhibit 40-42 to Rooney Declaration, #13 Text of Proposed Order, #14 Certificate of Service)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
February 3, 2015 Filing 19 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Melinda Coolidge to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (BLYTH, JOHN)
February 3, 2015 Filing 18 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Walter Kelley to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (BLYTH, JOHN)
February 3, 2015 Filing 17 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Brent Landau to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (BLYTH, JOHN)
February 3, 2015 Pro Hac Vice counsel, MELINDA R. COOLIDGE, WALTER D. KELLEY, JR and BRENT W. LANDAU, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jd, )
January 26, 2015 Set Deadlines as to #16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Stephen Neuwirth, Adam B. Wolfson, and Steig D. Olson. Motion set for 2/17/2015 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (sr, )
January 23, 2015 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Stephen Neuwirth, Adam B. Wolfson, and Steig D. Olson by CELGENE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gavin J. Rooney, #2 Declaration of Stephen Neuwirth, #3 Declaration of Adam B. Wolfson, #4 Declaration of Steig D. Olson, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
January 23, 2015 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW022484 RE: Melinda R. Coolidge. (sr, )
January 23, 2015 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW022483 RE: Walter D. Kelley, Jr. (sr, )
January 23, 2015 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW022482 RE: Brent W. Landau. (sr, )
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Melinda R. Coolidge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/5/15. (jd, )
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Brent W. Landau. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/5/15. (jd, )
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Walter D. Kelley, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/5/15. (jd, )
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER that Defendant's time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint should be and is extended to February 3, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 12/22/14. (jd, )
December 22, 2014 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #12 Stipulation and Order submitted by CELGENE CORPORATION has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 2/3/15. (jd, )
December 17, 2014 Filing 11 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint and Proposed Order for Extension of Time to Respond by CELGENE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(ROONEY, GAVIN)
December 11, 2014 Filing 10 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Melinda R. Coolidge by INTERNATIONAL UNION OF BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFT WORKERS LOCAL 1 HEALTH FUND. (BLYTH, JOHN)
December 11, 2014 Filing 9 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Brent W. Landau by INTERNATIONAL UNION OF BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFT WORKERS LOCAL 1 HEALTH FUND. (BLYTH, JOHN)
December 11, 2014 Filing 8 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Walter D. Kelley, Jr. by INTERNATIONAL UNION OF BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFT WORKERS LOCAL 1 HEALTH FUND. (BLYTH, JOHN)
December 11, 2014 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN ANTHONY BLYTH on behalf of All Plaintiffs (BLYTH, JOHN)
December 11, 2014 Set Deadlines as to #8 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Walter D. Kelley, Jr., #10 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Melinda R. Coolidge, #9 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Brent W. Landau. Motion set for 1/5/2015 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (jd, )
December 4, 2014 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH ALDO FISCHETTI on behalf of CELGENE CORPORATION (FISCHETTI, JOSEPH)
December 4, 2014 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by NICOLE DENISE BEARCE on behalf of CELGENE CORPORATION (BEARCE, NICOLE)
December 4, 2014 Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Celgene Corporation.. (ROONEY, GAVIN)
December 4, 2014 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by GAVIN J. ROONEY on behalf of CELGENE CORPORATION (ROONEY, GAVIN)
December 4, 2014 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by CELGENE CORPORATION has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/19/14. (jd, )
November 12, 2014 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CELGENE CORPORATION Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *LEROY DUNBAR* (ld, )
November 7, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CELGENE CORPORATION ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 6038006) with JURY DEMAND, filed by INTERNATIONAL UNION OF BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFT WORKERS LOCAL 1 HEALTH FUND. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ld, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INTERNATIONAL UNION OF BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFT WORKERS LOCAL 1 HEALTH FUND v. CELGENE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHV STANLEY E. FISHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CELGENE CORPORATION
Represented By: GAVIN J. ROONEY
Represented By: FRANK CHARLES CALVOSA
Represented By: JOSEPH ALDO FISCHETTI
Represented By: NICOLE DENISE BEARCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers Stationary Engineers Local 39 Health and Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: KATIE ROSE BERAN
Represented By: FRANK ROCCO SCHIRRIPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE DETECTIVES' ENDOWMENT ASSOCIATION, INC.
Represented By: KATIE ROSE BERAN
Represented By: FRANK ROCCO SCHIRRIPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Mitchell
Represented By: KATIE ROSE BERAN
Represented By: FRANK ROCCO SCHIRRIPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL UNION OF BRICKLAYERS AND ALLIED CRAFT WORKERS LOCAL 1 HEALTH FUND
Represented By: FRANK ROCCO SCHIRRIPA
Represented By: DANIEL B. REHNS
Represented By: JOHN ANTHONY BLYTH
Represented By: WHITNEY ERIN STREET
Represented By: KATIE ROSE BERAN
Represented By: ERICA G. LANGSEN
Represented By: JEFFREY B. GITTLEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: NEW ENGLAND CARPENTERS HEALTH BENEFITS FUND
Represented By: FRANK ROCCO SCHIRRIPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: CITY OF PROVIDENCE
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL RUSSO
Represented By: JENNIFER SARNELLI
Represented By: JAMES STUART NOTIS
Represented By: FRANK ROCCO SCHIRRIPA
Represented By: JEFFREY B. GITTLEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Thalomid and Revlimid Antitrust Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?