SUMMERVILLE et al v. NEW JERSEY STATE POLICE et al
Plaintiff: STANLEY SUMMERVILLE and FOMBAH SIRLEAF
Defendant: NEW JERSEY STATE POLICE, NEW JERSEY STATE TROOPERS JOHN DOES 1-10, UNIVERSAL PROTECTION SERVICES and JG ELIZABETH, LLC.
Cross_claimant: UNIVERSAL PROTECTION SERVICES and JG ELIZABETH, LLC.
Cross_defendant: JG ELIZABETH, LLC., NEW JERSEY STATE POLICE, NEW JERSEY STATE TROOPERS JOHN DOES 1-10 and UNIVERSAL PROTECTION SERVICES
Case Number: 2:2014cv07653
Filed: December 9, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Union
Presiding Judge: Steven C. Mannion
Presiding Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER & OPINION that the motion (DE 132) of defendant Gregory forreconsideration of the Courts Order and Opinion (DE 129, 130) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 10/31/2019. (sm)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 129 OPINION. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 8/29/2019. (sm)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER AND ORDER denying 92 Motion for Reconsideration; that the deposition Colonel Fuentes shall be conducted on written questions pursuant to and in accordance with the dictates of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 31. The deposition shall be commenced as soon as practicable and shall be completed by March 31, 2018.. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 1/11/2018. (ld, ).
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 OPINION AND ORDER denying 75 Appeal Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court; that the Letter Order of Magistrate Judge Clark (ECF no. 73) compelling the deposition of Defendant State Police Colonel Joseph R. Fuentes is AFFIRMED as modified to limit the deposition to two hours.. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 7/27/2017. (ld, )
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 OPINION AND ORDER denying 37 Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 3/11/2016. (ld, )
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 OPINION AND ORDER granting 28 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 8/3/2015. (ld, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SUMMERVILLE et al v. NEW JERSEY STATE POLICE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STANLEY SUMMERVILLE
Represented By: GERALD GRAVES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FOMBAH SIRLEAF
Represented By: GERALD GRAVES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW JERSEY STATE POLICE
Represented By: ADAM ROBERT GIBBONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW JERSEY STATE TROOPERS JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSAL PROTECTION SERVICES
Represented By: JAMES S. MURPHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JG ELIZABETH, LLC.
Represented By: JENNIFER MARY BRUDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: UNIVERSAL PROTECTION SERVICES
Represented By: JAMES S. MURPHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: JG ELIZABETH, LLC.
Represented By: JENNIFER MARY BRUDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: JG ELIZABETH, LLC.
Represented By: JENNIFER MARY BRUDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: NEW JERSEY STATE POLICE
Represented By: ADAM ROBERT GIBBONS
Represented By: ADAM ROBERT GIBBONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: NEW JERSEY STATE TROOPERS JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: UNIVERSAL PROTECTION SERVICES
Represented By: JAMES S. MURPHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?