MAZZETTI v. THE NEW JERSEY DIVISION OF CHILD PROTECTION AND PERMANENCY et al
Plaintiff: DENNIS MAZZETTI
Defendant: MARGARET FOTI, ERICA ZAPATA, ALLISON BLAKE, BONNIE J. MIZDOL, JOHN L. MOLINELLI, JOHN DOES 1-15, CHRISTOPHER JAMES "CHRIS" CHRISTIE, KIMBERLY ROBERTS, LISA VON PIER, VIRGINIA A. LONG, ELLEN BUCKWALTER and THE NEW JERSEY DIVISION OF CHILD PROTECTION AND PERMANENCY
Case Number: 2:2014cv08134
Filed: December 31, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Bergen
Presiding Judge: Michael A Hammer
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 67 USCA Case Number 19-3300 for #66 Notice of Appeal (USCA), filed by DENNIS MAZZETTI. USCA Case Manager Tina (TMK) (Document Restricted - Court Only). (ca3cjg)
October 7, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #65 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, #23 Order on Motion to Dismiss, #64 Opinion, #22 Opinion by DENNIS MAZZETTI. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0312-10019372. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (ROSELLINI, KENNETH)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #42 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. The clerk shall close the file. etc. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 9/4/2019. (dam, )
September 4, 2019 Filing 64 OPINION. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 9/4/2019. (dam, )
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #61 Defendant's Motion to Seal Document. etc. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 9/4/2019. (dam, )
September 3, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #61 Defendant's Third MOTION to Seal Document #60 Exhibit. Motion set for 10/7/2019 before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 62 Exhibit to #61 Motion to Seal Document, Notice of Motion by KIMBERLY ROBERTS, ERICA ZAPATA. (JANNETTI, JESSICA)
September 3, 2019 Filing 61 Third MOTION to Seal Document #60 Exhibit (to Document),, A-E by KIMBERLY ROBERTS, ERICA ZAPATA. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Certification Certification of Counsel, #3 Appendix Appendix U- Mazzetti Motion to Seal, #4 Text of Proposed Order Mazzetti Proposed order and finding of facts)(JANNETTI, JESSICA)
August 22, 2019 Filing 60 Exhibit to #42 Motion for Summary Judgment, Exhibits A-E by KIMBERLY ROBERTS, ERICA ZAPATA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(JANNETTI, JESSICA)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 TEXT ORDER: Parties shall submit a motion to seal pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3 within 14 days. The parties shall also submit revised briefing that complies with Local Rule 5.2 (17)(3) (mandating use of minor's initials). So Ordered by Judge Kevin McNulty on 8/19/19. (nic, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 58 CERTIFICATION in Opposition filed by DENNIS MAZZETTI re #42 First MOTION for Summary Judgment (ROSELLINI, KENNETH)
August 16, 2019 Filing 57 BRIEF in Opposition filed by DENNIS MAZZETTI re #42 First MOTION for Summary Judgment (ROSELLINI, KENNETH)
August 16, 2019 Filing 56 STATEMENT of Material Facts in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #42 First MOTION for Summary Judgment (ROSELLINI, KENNETH)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 TEXT ORDER: Defendants' motion for summary judgment (DE 42) as to the remaining counts in the case is pending. The court has granted four requests by plaintiff's counsel to adjourn the return date and due date for papers in opposition. (DE 45, 48, 52, 54). The last adjourned return date was May 6, 2019. No papers in opposition have been filed. PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL SHALL, WITHIN 14 DAYS, FILE EITHER (A) A STATEMENT THAT THE MOTION IS UNOPPOSED OR (B) A SUBMISSION IN OPPOSITION. So Ordered by Judge Kevin McNulty on 8/2/19. (nic, )
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #53 Plaintiff's Letter requesting an adjournment. Reset Hearing on Motion #42 First MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion reset for 5/6/2019 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 4/2/2019. (dam, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 53 Letter from Kenneth Rosellini, Esq. Requesting Adjournment of Dispositive Motion to May 6, 2019 re #42 First MOTION for Summary Judgment , #52 Order,, Order Setting Hearing on Motion,. (ROSELLINI, KENNETH)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #51 Plaintiff's Letter. Reset Hearing on #42 First MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion reset for 4/1/2019 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 3/6/2019. (dam, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 51 Letter from Kenneth Rosellini, Esq. Requesting Adjournment of Dispositive Motion to April 1, 2019 re #48 Order Setting Hearing on Motion,,, #42 First MOTION for Summary Judgment , #43 Statement of Material Fact in Support of Motion. (ROSELLINI, KENNETH)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER denying without prejudice #49 Defendants' Motion to Seal. Any renewed motion to seal shall be filed no later than 2/28/2019. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/14/2019. (dam, )
February 13, 2019 Filing 49 Second MOTION to Seal by KIMBERLY ROBERTS, ERICA ZAPATA. (Attachments: #1 Certification Attorney Certification in Support of Renewed Motion to Seal, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order in Support of Motion to Seal)(JANNETTI, JESSICA)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #47 Plaintiff's Letter re two-cycle Extension for Response to Dispositive Motion. Reset Deadlines as to #42 First MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion reset for 3/4/2019 before Judge Kevin McNulty. etc. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 2/5/2019. (dam, )
February 4, 2019 Filing 47 Letter from Kenneth Rosellini, Esq. Requesting Adjournment of Dispositive Motion to March 4, 2019 with Consent of Counsel for Defendants re #42 First MOTION for Summary Judgment , Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,. (ROSELLINI, KENNETH)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying without prejudice #44 Defendants' Motion to Seal. Any renewed motion to seal shall be filed no later than 2/8/2019. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/23/2019. (dam, )
January 22, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #42 First MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion set for 2/4/2019 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (nic, )
January 21, 2019 Filing 45 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #42 First MOTION for Summary Judgment . (ROSELLINI, KENNETH)
December 27, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #44 First MOTION to Seal Document #42 First MOTION for Summary Judgment Seal Exhibits A-D. Motion set for 1/22/2019 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, )
December 27, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #42 First MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion set for 1/22/2019 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 44 First MOTION to Seal Document #42 First MOTION for Summary Judgment (Seal Exhibits A-D by KIMBERLY ROBERTS, ERICA ZAPATA. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(JANNETTI, JESSICA)
December 21, 2018 Filing 43 STATEMENT of Material Fact in Support filed by KIMBERLY ROBERTS, ERICA ZAPATA re #42 First MOTION for Summary Judgment (JANNETTI, JESSICA)
December 21, 2018 Filing 42 First MOTION for Summary Judgment by KIMBERLY ROBERTS, ERICA ZAPATA. Responses due by 1/8/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Certification Attorney Certification in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit REDACTED Exhibits in support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order (MSJ))(JANNETTI, JESSICA)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING #40 Defendant's Letter requesting a 14-day extension, making all motions for summary judgment due on or before 12/24/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/14/2018. (dam, )
December 7, 2018 Filing 40 Letter from DAG Jannetti requesting extension. (JANNETTI, JESSICA)
October 26, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Telephone Status Conference held on 10/26/2018. (jqb, )
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 TEXT ORDER: As discussed during the telephone conference on October 26, 2018, all fact discovery is complete and neither party intends to introduce expert testimony. Accordingly, Defendants will file any motion for summary judgment on or before December 10, 2018. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/26/2018. (MAH)
October 25, 2018 Remark - Tomorrow's conference shall proceed as scheduled via telephone at 3:30 p.m. (jqb, )
September 24, 2018 Reset Hearing: Per counsel's request #38 , today's Telephone Status Conference set is adjourned to 10/26/2018 at 3:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jqb, ) Modified on 10/25/2018 (jqb, ).
September 24, 2018 Filing 38 Letter from Kenneth Rosellini, Esq. Requesting Adjournment of Case Management Teleconference re Set/Reset Hearings. (ROSELLINI, KENNETH)
September 19, 2018 Reset Hearing: The Telephone Status Conference set for 9/24/2018 is moved from 10:30 a.m. to 3:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jqb, )
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 TEXT ORDER: At the request of Plaintiff's counsel, today's telephone status conference is adjourned to September 24, 2018 at 10:30 a.m. Plaintiff shall kindly initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 8/28/18. (TAD)
August 28, 2018 Filing 36 Letter from Kenneth Rosellini, Esq. Requesting Adjournment of Telephonic Case Managment Conference re #35 Scheduling Order. (ROSELLINI, KENNETH)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 8/28/2018 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Plaintiff shall initiate the telephone call; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 06/28/2018. (sms)
June 28, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Telephone Status Conference held on 6/28/2018. (jqb, )
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 6/28/2018 at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/26/2018. (jqb, )
March 26, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Telephone Status Conference held on 3/26/2018. (jqb, )
February 28, 2018 Reset Hearing: The Telephone Status Conference set for 3/6/2018 is adjourned to 3/26/2018 at 3:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jqb, )
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone/Status Conference set for 3/6/2018 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Fact Discovery due by 5/15/2018; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/25/18. (DD, )
January 25, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Telephone Status Conference held on 1/25/2018. (jqb, )
December 18, 2017 Filing 32 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney THOMAS P. LIHAN terminated. Attorney JESSICA ANN JANNETTI for KIMBERLY ROBERTS,JESSICA ANN JANNETTI for ERICA ZAPATA added.. (JANNETTI, JESSICA)
December 5, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Telephone Status Conference held on 12/5/2017. (jqb, )
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone/Status Conference set for 1/25/2018 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Fact Discovery due by 3/31/2018; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/5/17. (DD, )
September 8, 2017 Reset Hearing: The Telephone Status Conference set for 12/5/2017 is moved from 1:00 p.m. to 2:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Please mark your calendar accordingly. (jqb, )
August 9, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Scheduling Conference held on 8/9/2017. (jqb, )
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone/Status Conference set for 12/5/2017 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Amended Pleadings due by 12/4/2017. Fact Discovery due by 2/1/2018. Joinder of Parties due by 12/4/2017; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 8/9/17. (DD, )
May 30, 2017 Reset Hearing: Per counsel's request #29 , the Scheduling Conference set for 6/2/2017 is adjourned to 8/9/2017 at 11:30 a.m. in Newark - Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jqb, )
May 25, 2017 Filing 29 Letter. (LIHAN, THOMAS)
May 25, 2017 Filing 28 Joint Discovery Plan by KIMBERLY ROBERTS, ERICA ZAPATA.(LIHAN, THOMAS)
May 25, 2017 Reset Hearing: The Scheduling Conference set for 5/30/2017 is adjourned to 6/2/2017 at 12:30 p.m. in Newark - Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jqb, )
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEXT ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 5/30/2017 at 10:30 a.m. in Newark - Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Parties shall electronically file a joint discovery plan by 5/25/2017. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/2/2017. (jqb, )
April 20, 2017 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by KIMBERLY ROBERTS, ERICA ZAPATA.(LIHAN, THOMAS)
April 6, 2017 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #25 Order submitted by KIMBERLY ROBERTS, ERICA ZAPATA has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 4/20/17. (DD, )
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting Deft's re #24 Letter Request for a (10) day extension of time to file answer to Cmp. until 4/20/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 4/6/17. (DD, )
April 5, 2017 Filing 24 Letter from Thomas P. Lihan, DAG, requesting ten day extension of time in which to file an answer on behalf of defendants. (LIHAN, THOMAS)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #15 Motion to Dismiss; the only remaining claim is Count 6 (First Amendment retaliation), as to defendants Roberts and Zapata only. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 3/27/17. (DD, )
March 27, 2017 Filing 22 OPINION. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 3/27/17. (DD, )
August 25, 2016 Filing 21 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney STEPHEN RALPH TUCKER terminated. Attorney THOMAS P. LIHAN for ALLISON BLAKE,THOMAS P. LIHAN for ELLEN BUCKWALTER,THOMAS P. LIHAN for CHRISTOPHER JAMES CHRIS CHRISTIE,THOMAS P. LIHAN for MARGARET FOTI,THOMAS P . LIHAN for VIRGINIA A. LONG,THOMAS P. LIHAN for BONNIE J. MIZDOL,THOMAS P. LIHAN for JOHN L. MOLINELLI,THOMAS P. LIHAN for KIMBERLY ROBERTS,THOMAS P. LIHAN for THE NEW JERSEY DIVISION OF CHILD PROTECTION AND PERMANENCY,THOMAS P. LIHAN for LISA VON PIER,THOMAS P. LIHAN for ERICA ZAPATA added.. (LIHAN, THOMAS)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Vacate Clerk's Entry of Default as to JOHN L. MOLINELLI & CHRISTOPER JAMES "CHRIS" CHRISTIE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 8/17/15. (DD, )
May 11, 2015 Filing 19 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by ALLISON BLAKE, ELLEN BUCKWALTER, CHRISTOPHER JAMES "CHRIS" CHRISTIE, MARGARET FOTI, VIRGINIA A. LONG, BONNIE J. MIZDOL, JOHN L. MOLINELLI, KIMBERLY ROBERTS, THE NEW JERSEY DIVISION OF CHILD PROTECTION AND PERMANENCY, LISA VON PIER, ERICA ZAPATA re #15 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Cover letter)(TUCKER, STEPHEN)
May 5, 2015 Filing 18 BRIEF in Opposition filed by DENNIS MAZZETTI re #15 MOTION to Dismiss (ROSELLINI, KENNETH)
April 24, 2015 Filing 17 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney SUSAN MARIE SCOTT terminated. Attorney STEPHEN RALPH TUCKER for ALLISON BLAKE,STEPHEN RALPH TUCKER for ELLEN BUCKWALTER,STEPHEN RALPH TUCKER for CHRISTOPHER JAMES CHRIS CHRISTIE,STEPHEN RALPH TUCKER for MARGA RET FOTI,STEPHEN RALPH TUCKER for VIRGINIA A. LONG,STEPHEN RALPH TUCKER for BONNIE J. MIZDOL,STEPHEN RALPH TUCKER for JOHN L. MOLINELLI,STEPHEN RALPH TUCKER for KIMBERLY ROBERTS,STEPHEN RALPH TUCKER for THE NEW JERSEY DIVISION OF CHILD PROTECTION AND PERMANENCY,STEPHEN RALPH TUCKER for LISA VON PIER,STEPHEN RALPH TUCKER for ERICA ZAPATA added.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(TUCKER, STEPHEN)
April 20, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 5/18/2015 before Judge Kevin McNulty. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (nic, )
April 19, 2015 Filing 16 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by DENNIS MAZZETTI re #15 MOTION to Dismiss (ROSELLINI, KENNETH)
April 2, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 5/4/2015 before Judge Kevin McNulty. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, )
April 1, 2015 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by ALLISON BLAKE, ELLEN BUCKWALTER, CHRISTOPHER JAMES "CHRIS" CHRISTIE, MARGARET FOTI, VIRGINIA A. LONG, BONNIE J. MIZDOL, JOHN L. MOLINELLI, KIMBERLY ROBERTS, THE NEW JERSEY DIVISION OF CHILD PROTECTION AND PERMANENCY, LISA VON PIER, ERICA ZAPATA. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(SCOTT, SUSAN)
April 1, 2015 Filing 14 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney KRISTEN NICOLE COLLAR terminated. Attorney SUSAN MARIE SCOTT for ALLISON BLAKE,SUSAN MARIE SCOTT for ELLEN BUCKWALTER,SUSAN MARIE SCOTT for CHRISTOPHER JAMES CHRIS CHRISTIE,SUSAN MARIE SCOTT for MARGARET FOTI ,SUSAN MARIE SCOTT for VIRGINIA A. LONG,SUSAN MARIE SCOTT for BONNIE J. MIZDOL,SUSAN MARIE SCOTT for JOHN L. MOLINELLI,SUSAN MARIE SCOTT for KIMBERLY ROBERTS,SUSAN MARIE SCOTT for THE NEW JERSEY DIVISION OF CHILD PROTECTION AND PERMANENCY,SUSAN MARIE SCOTT for LISA VON PIER,SUSAN MARIE SCOTT for ERICA ZAPATA added.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SCOTT, SUSAN)
March 10, 2015 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #13 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer submitted by BONNIE J. MIZDOL, MARGARET FOTI has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 4/3/15. (DD, )
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer no later than 4/3/15. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/9/15. (DD, )
February 27, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #12 MOTION to Vacate Clerk's Entry of Default . Motion set for 4/6/2015 before Judge Kevin McNulty. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, )
February 27, 2015 Filing 12 MOTION to Vacate Clerk's Entry of Default by CHRISTOPHER JAMES "CHRIS" CHRISTIE, JOHN L. MOLINELLI. (Attachments: #1 Statement No Brief Is Necessary, #2 Certification of Counsel, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certification of Service)(COLLAR, KRISTEN)
February 24, 2015 [VACATED per D.E. 20] Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to defts., JOHN L. MOLINELLI & CHRISTOPER JAMES "CHRIS" CHRISTIE for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (DD, ) Modified on 8/18/2015 (DD).
February 23, 2015 Filing 11 Letter. (PEREIRA, CARLA)
February 23, 2015 Filing 10 MOTION for Entry of Default by DENNIS MAZZETTI. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Counsel in Support of Request for Entry of Default of the Defendant Christopher James "Chris" Christie)(ROSELLINI, KENNETH)
February 23, 2015 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DENNIS MAZZETTI. CHRISTOPHER JAMES "CHRIS" CHRISTIE served on 1/12/2015, answer due 2/2/2015. (ROSELLINI, KENNETH)
February 23, 2015 Filing 8 MOTION for Entry of Default by DENNIS MAZZETTI. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Counsel in Support of Request for Entry of Default of Defendant John L. Molinelli)(ROSELLINI, KENNETH)
February 23, 2015 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on John L Molinelli on January 13, 2015, filed by DENNIS MAZZETTI., SUMMONS Returned Executed by DENNIS MAZZETTI. JOHN L. MOLINELLI served on 1/13/2015, answer due 2/3/2015. (ROSELLINI, KENNETH)
February 13, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . Motion set for 3/16/2015 before Judge Kevin McNulty. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, )
February 12, 2015 Filing 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by MARGARET FOTI, BONNIE J. MIZDOL. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Counsel, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Statement No Brief is Necessary)(COLLAR, KRISTEN)
February 2, 2015 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The (APPL. FOR CLERK ORDER TO EXT. ANSWER - Doc. #'S 4&5) submitted by K. COLLAR & C. PEREIRA on (1/30/15) appear to be duplicates. These submissions will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. This message is for informational purposes only. (DD, )
February 2, 2015 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by BONNIE J. MIZDOL, MARGARET FOTI has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 2/13/15. (DD, )
January 30, 2015 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(PEREIRA, CARLA)
January 30, 2015 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by CARLA S. PEREIRA on behalf of MARGARET FOTI, BONNIE J. MIZDOL (PEREIRA, CARLA)
January 30, 2015 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Judge Bonnie Mizdol and Judge Margaret Foti. Attorney KRISTEN NICOLE COLLAR for MARGARET FOTI,KRISTEN NICOLE COLLAR for BONNIE J. MIZDOL added. (COLLAR, KRISTEN)
January 9, 2015 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ELLEN BUCKWALTER, CHRISTOPHER JAMES "CHRIS" CHRISTIE, MARGARET FOTI, JOHN DOES 1-15, VIRGINIA A. LONG, BONNIE J. MIZDOL, JOHN L. MOLINELLI, KIMBERLY ROBERTS, THE NEW JERSEY DIVISION OF CHILD PROTECTION AND PERMANENCY, LISA VON PIER, ERICA ZAPATA Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Christine Melillo* (cm )
December 31, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALLISON BLAKE, ELLEN BUCKWALTER, CHRISTOPHER JAMES "CHRIS" CHRISTIE, MARGARET FOTI, JOHN DOES 1-15, VIRGINIA A. LONG, BONNIE J. MIZDOL, JOHN L. MOLINELLI, KIMBERLY ROBERTS, THE NEW JERSEY DIVISION OF CHILD PROTECTION AND PERMANENCY ("DCP&P"), Lisa Von Pier, ERICA ZAPATA ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-6127641) with JURY DEMAND, filed by DENNIS MAZZETTI.(cm )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MAZZETTI v. THE NEW JERSEY DIVISION OF CHILD PROTECTION AND PERMANENCY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARGARET FOTI
Represented By: CARLA S. PEREIRA
Represented By: SUSAN MARIE SCOTT
Represented By: STEPHEN RALPH TUCKER
Represented By: KRISTEN NICOLE COLLAR
Represented By: THOMAS P. LIHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERICA ZAPATA
Represented By: SUSAN MARIE SCOTT
Represented By: STEPHEN RALPH TUCKER
Represented By: JESSICA ANN SAMPOLI
Represented By: THOMAS P. LIHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLISON BLAKE
Represented By: SUSAN MARIE SCOTT
Represented By: STEPHEN RALPH TUCKER
Represented By: THOMAS P. LIHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BONNIE J. MIZDOL
Represented By: CARLA S. PEREIRA
Represented By: SUSAN MARIE SCOTT
Represented By: STEPHEN RALPH TUCKER
Represented By: KRISTEN NICOLE COLLAR
Represented By: THOMAS P. LIHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN L. MOLINELLI
Represented By: SUSAN MARIE SCOTT
Represented By: STEPHEN RALPH TUCKER
Represented By: KRISTEN NICOLE COLLAR
Represented By: THOMAS P. LIHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-15
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER JAMES "CHRIS" CHRISTIE
Represented By: SUSAN MARIE SCOTT
Represented By: STEPHEN RALPH TUCKER
Represented By: KRISTEN NICOLE COLLAR
Represented By: THOMAS P. LIHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIMBERLY ROBERTS
Represented By: SUSAN MARIE SCOTT
Represented By: STEPHEN RALPH TUCKER
Represented By: JESSICA ANN SAMPOLI
Represented By: THOMAS P. LIHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LISA VON PIER
Represented By: SUSAN MARIE SCOTT
Represented By: STEPHEN RALPH TUCKER
Represented By: THOMAS P. LIHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIRGINIA A. LONG
Represented By: SUSAN MARIE SCOTT
Represented By: STEPHEN RALPH TUCKER
Represented By: THOMAS P. LIHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELLEN BUCKWALTER
Represented By: SUSAN MARIE SCOTT
Represented By: STEPHEN RALPH TUCKER
Represented By: THOMAS P. LIHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE NEW JERSEY DIVISION OF CHILD PROTECTION AND PERMANENCY
Represented By: SUSAN MARIE SCOTT
Represented By: STEPHEN RALPH TUCKER
Represented By: THOMAS P. LIHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS MAZZETTI
Represented By: KENNETH J. ROSELLINI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?