MHA, LLC v. SIEMENS HEALTHCARE DIAGNOSTICS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: MHA, LLC
Defendant: SIEMENS HEALTHCARE DIAGNOSTICS, INC. and JOHN DOES 1-100
Counter_claimant: SIEMENS HEALTHCARE DIAGNOSTICS, INC.
Counter_defendant: MHA, LLC
Case Number: 2:2015cv01573
Filed: March 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Hudson
Presiding Judge: Joseph A. Dickson
Presiding Judge: Jose L. Linares
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 OPINION & ORDER remanding matter to the Superior Court of New Jersey, Hudson County. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 4/7/17. (sr, )
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 OPINION. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 3/2/2017. (ld, )
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 OPINION. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 1/11/2017. (ld, )
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 OPINION. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 12/21/2015. (ld, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MHA, LLC v. SIEMENS HEALTHCARE DIAGNOSTICS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MHA, LLC
Represented By: ROBERT ANTHONY AGRESTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIEMENS HEALTHCARE DIAGNOSTICS, INC.
Represented By: CHARLES A. GRUEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: SIEMENS HEALTHCARE DIAGNOSTICS, INC.
Represented By: CHARLES A. GRUEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: MHA, LLC
Represented By: ROBERT ANTHONY AGRESTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?