SPELLMAN v. EXPRESS DYNAMICS, LLC
Plaintiff: RAYMOND SPELLMAN
Defendant: EXPRESS DYNAMICS, LLC
Case Number: 2:2015cv03257
Filed: May 11, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Morris
Presiding Judge: Cathy L. Waldor
Presiding Judge: William H. Walls
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 OPINION. Signed by Judge William H. Walls on 12/15/2015. (anr)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 OPINION. Signed by Judge William H. Walls on 9/24/2015. (anr)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 OPINION. Signed by Judge William H. Walls on 7/28/15. (jr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SPELLMAN v. EXPRESS DYNAMICS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAYMOND SPELLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXPRESS DYNAMICS, LLC
Represented By: AMANDA LAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?