HORIZON PHARMA, INC. et al v. DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES INC. et al
Plaintiff: HORIZON PHARMA, INC. and POZEN INC.
Defendant: DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES INC., DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LIMITED and MYLAN INC.
Counter_claimant: DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES LTD. and DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES INC.
Counter_defendant: HORIZON PHARMA, INC. and POZEN INC.
Defendant_consolidated: LUPIN LTD. and LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Case Number: 2:2015cv03324
Filed: May 13, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Mercer
Presiding Judge: Stanley R. Chesler
Presiding Judge: Cathy L. Waldor
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 340 OPINION & ORDER that DRL's 317 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 2/17/2021. (ams, )
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 334 Federal Circuit OPINION filed for the court by Moore, Circuit Judge; O'Malley, Circuit Judge and Hughes, Circuit Judge on 1/6/2021. Non precedential Opinion. Federal Circuit Case No.'s 19-1607, 19-1609, 19-1611, 19-1612, and 19-1614. etc.(dam)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 267 OPINION and ORDER denying 255 Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration. etc. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 2/4/2020. (dam, )
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 252 OPINION. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 12/18/2019. (dam, )
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 162 OPINION. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 11/19/2018. (dam, )
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 153 OPINION AND ORDER: The Court concludes that the automatic stay does not apply to any of the presently pending affirmative defenses therefore, this Court sees no reason to stay these consolidated actions in their entirety, etc. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 10/1/18. (cm, )
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 OPINION AND ORDER denying Plaintiff's 107 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 7/25/18. (cm, )
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 OPINION/ORDER re: appl. for claim construction by Pltfs. in three patents. Horizon, DRL and Lupin seeking construction of terms in U.S. Patent No. 8,945,621 (the 621 patent); etc Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 11/14/17. (DD, )
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 56 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 8/25/17. (sr, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HORIZON PHARMA, INC. et al v. DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HORIZON PHARMA, INC.
Represented By: GUILLERMO CARLO ARTILES
Represented By: JOHN EDMUND FLAHERTY
Represented By: RAVIN R. PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: POZEN INC.
Represented By: GUILLERMO CARLO ARTILES
Represented By: JOHN EDMUND FLAHERTY
Represented By: RAVIN R. PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES INC.
Represented By: ALAN HENRY POLLACK
Represented By: STUART D. SENDER
Represented By: DMITRY V. SHELHOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES LTD.
Represented By: ALAN HENRY POLLACK
Represented By: STUART D. SENDER
Represented By: DMITRY V. SHELHOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: GREGORY D. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN LABORATORIES LIMITED
Represented By: GREGORY D. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN INC.
Represented By: GREGORY D. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES LTD.
Represented By: ALAN HENRY POLLACK
Represented By: STUART D. SENDER
Represented By: DMITRY V. SHELHOFF
Represented By: ALAN HENRY POLLACK
Represented By: STUART D. SENDER
Represented By: DMITRY V. SHELHOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES INC.
Represented By: ALAN HENRY POLLACK
Represented By: STUART D. SENDER
Represented By: DMITRY V. SHELHOFF
Represented By: ALAN HENRY POLLACK
Represented By: STUART D. SENDER
Represented By: DMITRY V. SHELHOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: HORIZON PHARMA, INC.
Represented By: JOHN EDMUND FLAHERTY
Represented By: RAVIN R. PATEL
Represented By: JOHN EDMUND FLAHERTY
Represented By: RAVIN R. PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: POZEN INC.
Represented By: JOHN EDMUND FLAHERTY
Represented By: RAVIN R. PATEL
Represented By: JOHN EDMUND FLAHERTY
Represented By: RAVIN R. PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant_consolidated: LUPIN LTD.
Represented By: KAREN A. CONFOY
Represented By: ALLISON LINDA HOLLOWS
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER ROBERT KINKADE
Represented By: STEPHEN JOHN SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant_consolidated: LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: KAREN A. CONFOY
Represented By: ALLISON LINDA HOLLOWS
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER ROBERT KINKADE
Represented By: STEPHEN JOHN SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?