MARCHI v. M&T BANK, et als
Plaintiff: ANNE MARIE MARCHI
Defendant: HUDSON CITY SAVINGS BANK
Case Number: 2:2015cv05725
Filed: July 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Passaic
Presiding Judge: James B. Clark
Presiding Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 OPINION & ORDER, Denying 24 APPLICATION/PETITION for reconsideration as to Dismissal, for by ANNE MARIE MARCHI. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 4/24/2017. (JB, )
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AMENDED OPINION. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 2/15/2017. (JB, )
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 OPINION. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 2/14/2017. (JB, )
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM/ORDER that plaintiff may, on or before March 21, 2016, file a response to the defendants motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 2/29/16. (DD, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARCHI v. M&T BANK, et als
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNE MARIE MARCHI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUDSON CITY SAVINGS BANK
Represented By: WHITNEY E. WEINLEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?