JORGENSEN & COMPANY v. SUTHERLAND et al
Plaintiff: JORGENSEN & COMPANY
Defendant: GARY SUTHERLAND, PLAZA INSURANCE COMPANY, ROCKHILL INSURANCE COMPANY and NORTH AMERICAN PROFESSIONAL LIABILITY INSURANCE AGENCY, LLC
Case Number: 2:2015cv07373
Filed: October 8, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Bergen
Presiding Judge: Claire C. Cecchi
Presiding Judge: Mark Falk
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER & OPINION OF THE SPECIAL MASTER. Signed by DENNIS M. CAVANAUGH, Special Master on 11/28/2017. (ld, ).
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 160 OPINION AND ORDER OF THE SPECIAL MASTER denying 134 Motion to Substitute Party, etc. Signed by DENNIS M. CAVANAUGH, U.S.D.J.(Ret.)(Special Master) 10/18/17. (cm, )
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 OPINION. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 4/17/2017. (ld, )
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 OPINION re 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by PLAZA INSURANCE COMPANY, Rockhill Insurance Company, ROCKHILL INSURANCE COMPANY, 22 MOTION to Dismiss filed by GARY SUTHERLAND. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 6/30/2016. (ld, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JORGENSEN & COMPANY v. SUTHERLAND et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JORGENSEN & COMPANY
Represented By: PAUL E. PARAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARY SUTHERLAND
Represented By: ERIC BARRY LEVINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLAZA INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: BRIAN J. NEFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROCKHILL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: BRIAN J. NEFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTH AMERICAN PROFESSIONAL LIABILITY INSURANCE AGENCY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?