VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC. et al v. MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., WYETH LLC and WYETH
Defendant: MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN INC., ACTAVIS LLC, MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD. and CHARLES E. LIPSEY
Case Number: 2:2015cv08180
Filed: November 19, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Somerset
Presiding Judge: Stanley R Chesler
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 405 TEXT ORDER: The 5/28/20 teleconference is canceled.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 5/19/20. (tjg, )
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 404 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference, to be initiated by plaintiff, on 5/28/20 at 12pm. Parties may contact chambers at (973) 776 7862 Parties are directed to view Judge Waldors COVID-19 emergency preferences at www.njd.uscourts.gov/content/cathy-l-waldor for instructions regarding the upcoming conference in this matter. Additional information can also be found in the link.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 5/18/20. (tjg, )
May 18, 2020 Filing 403 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. re #402 Letter. (DENI, WILLIAM)
May 12, 2020 Filing 402 Letter from Amy Luria. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(LURIA, AMY)
April 8, 2020 Filing 407 Federal Circuit JUDGMENT as to #324 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit). Reversed and Remanded. Terminated on the merits after oral argument. Costs taxed against Appellee(s). Mandate to issue in due course. etc. (dam)
April 8, 2020 Filing 406 Federal Circuit OPINION re #324 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit). etc.(dam, )
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 401 ORDER; granting #400 letter request pursuant to Local Civil Rule 101.1(c)(5), for the withdrawal of Kristi L. McIntyre as pro hac vice counsel for Plaintiffs in the above-referenced action; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 10/22/2019. (sms)
October 18, 2019 Filing 400 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. re: withdrawal of pro hac vice counsel Kristi L. McIntyre. (DENI, WILLIAM)
October 9, 2019 Filing 399 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (DENI, WILLIAM)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 398 STIPULATION AND ORDER; The four Katten lateral attorneys will not reappear or in any way represent Mylan in the above-captioned actions;Plaintiffs Valeant Pharmaceuticals International, Inc. and Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc. will withdraw their pending Motion to Disqualify, subject to the conditions set forth in paragraphs 1 and 2; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 6/29/2019. (sms)
July 26, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 7/26/2019. (tjg, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 397 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. re: Stipulation and Proposed Order. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and Proposed Order)(DENI, WILLIAM)
July 25, 2019 Filing 396 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney CYMETRA MONIQUE WILLIAMS terminated. (WILLIAMS, CYMETRA)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 395 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference, to be initiated by plaintiff, on 7/26/19 at 9:45am. Parties may contact chambers at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/11/19. (tjg, )
July 11, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 7/11/2019. (tjg, )
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 394 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference, to be initiated by plaintiff, on 7/11/19 at 3:30pm. Parties may contact chambers at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 6/24/19. (tjg, )
June 24, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 6/24/2019. (tjg, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 393 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (DENI, WILLIAM)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER, granting #389 Letter request for the withdrawal of Michael I. Verde as pro hac vice counsel; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 5/29/2019. (sms)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 391 ORDER, granting #390 Letter request for the withdrawal of Sharad K. Bijanki, Esq. as pro hac vice counsel; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 5/29/2019. (sms)
May 24, 2019 Filing 390 Letter from Amy Luria Requesting Withdrawal of Pro Hac Vice Admission of Sharad K. Bijanki. (LURIA, AMY)
April 2, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee: as to Melanie Black Dubis, Esq., Tasneem Dharamsi, Esq. and Sharad K. Bijanki, Esq., $ 450.00, receipt number NEW039200. (sms)
April 1, 2019 Filing 389 Letter from Amy Luria re: Withdrawal of Pro Hac Vice Counsel. (LURIA, AMY)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 388 TEXT ORDER: The Court will adjourn the 6/20/19 conference to 6/24/19 at 3pm. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/28/19. (tjg, )
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER, granting #379 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, the appearance of Jonathan Rotenberg as counsel on behalf of Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mylan Laboratories Ltd., and Mylan Inc. ("Defendants") in the above-referenced case. Jonathan Rotenberg shall be deemed to have withdrawn as counsel for Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/15/2019. (sms)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ORDER, granting #380 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney the appearance of Alissa M. Pacchioti as counsel on behalf of Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mylan Laboratories Ltd., and Mylan Inc.( "Defendants") in the above-referenced case. Alissa M. Pacchioli shall be deemed to have withdrawn as counsel for Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/15/2019. (sms)
March 20, 2019 Filing 385 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (DENI, WILLIAM)
March 20, 2019 Filing 384 NOTICE by VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC. of Party Name Change to BAUSCH HEALTH COMPANIES INC. (DENI, WILLIAM)
March 19, 2019 Filing 383 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney HOWARD J. SCHWARTZ; TYLER DOH and JASON B. LATTIMORE terminated. (LATTIMORE, JASON)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER, granting #381 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Melanie Black Dubis, Esq., Tasneem Dharamsi, Esq. and Sharad K. Bijanki, Esq., are hereby admitted pro hac vice in the above-captioned matter; Counsel shall each make payment to the New Jersey Lawyers' Fund for Client Protection as provided by New Jersey Court Rule 1:28-2(a) for any year in which they represent a client in a matter pending before this Court; and make payment as provided by L.Civ.R. 101.1(c); etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 03/18/2019. (sms)
March 19, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #379 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , Filed, #380 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney . Motion set for 4/15/2019 before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sms)
March 15, 2019 Filing 381 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Melanie Black Dubis, Sharad K. Bijanki and Tasneem Dharamsi by MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Amy Luria, #2 Certification of Melanie Black Dubis, #3 Certification of Sharad K. Bijanki, #4 Certification of Tasneem Dharamsi, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(LURIA, AMY)
March 14, 2019 Filing 380 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(PACCHIOLI, ALISSA)
March 14, 2019 Filing 379 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , Filed by MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate Of Service)(ROTENBERG, JONATHAN)
March 13, 2019 Filing 378 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Robert L. Florence and Carroll L. Carroll to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (LURIA, AMY)
March 13, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, ROBERT L. FLORENCE and KAREN L. CARROLL, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (sms)
March 12, 2019 Filing 377 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney ALISSA MARIE PACCHIOLI terminated. (PACCHIOLI, ALISSA)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
March 12, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee: as to Robert L. Florence, Esq. and Karen L. Carroll, Esq. $300.00, receipt number NEW038960. (sms)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ORDER, granting #373 Letter application for the withdrawal of pro hac vice counsel of Deepro R. Mukerjee, Esq., Lance Soderstrorn, Esq., Stephanie M Roberts, Esq. and Jitendra Malik, Esq. Mr. Mukerjee, Mr. Soderstrom and Ms. Roberts were admitted pro hac vice on behalf of Defendants Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Laboratories Ltd. and Mylan Inc. by this Courts Order on May 24, 2016 (ECF No. 26); etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/7/2019. (sms)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 375 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference, to be initiated by plaintiff, on 6/20/19 at 4pm. Parties may contact chambers at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/8/19. (tjg, )
March 8, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 3/8/2019. (tjg, )
March 6, 2019 Filing 374 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. re: unsealing of decision on Motion to Disqualify Counsel before the Federal Circuit in Case No. 18-2097 and re #368 Letter,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(DENI, WILLIAM)
March 6, 2019 Filing 373 Letter from Amy Luria re: Withdrawal of Pro Hac Vice Counsel. (LURIA, AMY)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER, granting #371 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robert L. Florence, Esq. and Karen L. Carroll, Esq.; Counsel shall make payment to the New Jersey Lawyers' fund for Client Protection as provided by New Jersey Court Rule 1:28-2(a) for any year in which they represent a client in a matter pending before this Court; and Make payment as provided by L.Civ.R. 101.1(c); etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 03/04/2019. (sms)
March 4, 2019 Filing 371 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Amy Luria, #2 Certification of Karen L. Carroll, #3 Certification of Robert L. Florence, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(LURIA, AMY)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 370 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference, to be initiated by plaintiff, on 3/8/19 at 1pm. Parties may contact chambers at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/26/19. (tjg, )
February 26, 2019 Filing 369 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL LLOYD BINNS on behalf of MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (BINNS, MICHAEL)
February 11, 2019 Filing 368 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. re: resolution of the Motion to Disqualify Counsel before the Federal Circuit in Case No. 18-2097 and re 366 Order,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(DENI, WILLIAM)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
August 29, 2018 Filing 367 STATEMENT - Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by All Plaintiffs. (DENI, WILLIAM)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 366 TEXT ORDER: The Motion to Disqualify Counsel, DE 325, is administratively terminated pending the resolution of the Motion to Disqualify Counsel before the Federal Circuit in Case No. 18-2097.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 8/8/18. (tjg, )
August 2, 2018 Filing 365 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J.. (Attachments: #1 Order scheduling oral argument)(DENI, WILLIAM)
July 23, 2018 Filing 364 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. re #360 Letter, #359 Letter. (DENI, WILLIAM)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #361 Letter request of the withdrawal of Megan Leinen Johns, Esq., as pro hac vice counsel, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 07/23/2018. (ek)
July 23, 2018 Filing 362 NOTICE of Appearance by LEIGH A. DECOTIIS on behalf of PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., WYETH LLC (DECOTIIS, LEIGH)
July 20, 2018 Filing 361 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. re: Withdrawal of Pro Hac Vice Counsel. (DENI, WILLIAM)
July 19, 2018 Filing 360 Letter from Jonathan A. Rotenberg re #359 Letter. (ROTENBERG, JONATHAN)
July 19, 2018 Filing 359 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. re: recent developments on motion to disqualify. (DENI, WILLIAM)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 358 FINDINGS OF FACT, CONCLUSIONS OF LAW AND ORDER granting the Parties' #354 Consolidated MOTION to Seal Document #332 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion, #326 Brief in Support of Motion #344 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 07/18/2018. (ek)
July 18, 2018 CHAMBER'S NOTATION: MOTION SCHEDULED BEFORE JUDGE CHESLER ON 8/1/18 HAS NOW BEEN REFERRED TO JUDGE WALDOR. JUDGE WALDOR'S CHAMBERS WILL NOTIFY COUNSEL WHEN THE MOTIONS WILL BE SCHEDULED. NO APPEARANCE REQUIRED BEFORE JUDGE CHESLER AT THIS TIME (tt, )
July 18, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #325 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP. Motion set for 8/1/2018 10:00 AM before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. ORDERED ALL PARTIES TO APPEAR READY TO PROCEED. (tt, )
July 5, 2018 Filing 357 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. re #352 Order,, Add and Terminate Parties, (ROTENBERG, JONATHAN)
July 5, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #354 MOTION to Seal Document #332 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion,,, #326 Brief in Support of Motion,,,, #344 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,,,, . Motion set for 8/6/2018 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ek)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER granting #353 Letter re modified deadlines; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 07/03/2018. (sms)
July 3, 2018 Filing 355 REDACTION to #332 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion,,, by MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Deepro R. Mukerjee, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Declaration Of Doron S. Goldstein, #4 Declaration Of Thomas W. Jenkins, #5 Declaration Of Michael I. Verde, #6 Certificate Of Service)(LURIA, AMY)
July 2, 2018 Filing 354 MOTION to Seal Document #332 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion,,, #326 Brief in Support of Motion,,,, #344 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,,,, by SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William P. Deni, Jr., #2 Appendix A to Declaration of William P. Deni, Jr., #3 Certification of Amy Luria, #4 Appendix A to Certification of Amy Luria, #5 Proposed Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, and Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(DENI, WILLIAM)
July 2, 2018 Filing 353 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J.. (DENI, WILLIAM)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER re #331 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney on behalf of Hidetada James Abe and Andrew Ligotti, is hereby GRANTED; and a copy of this Order be served on all parties within seven days of its entry; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 06/27/2018. (sms)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #347 Letter request for an extension of time until July 2, 2018 to file the Consolidated Motion to Seal portions of the Motion to Disqualify Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP., etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 06/26/2018. (ek)
June 26, 2018 Filing 350 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. in response to Mylan's statement re #348 Statement. (DENI, WILLIAM)
June 25, 2018 Filing 348 STATEMENT OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE, by MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ROTENBERG, JONATHAN)
June 25, 2018 Filing 347 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. requesting extension of time to file motion to seal. (DENI, WILLIAM)
June 22, 2018 Filing 349 Notice of Docketing of Federal Circuit Case Number 18-2097 for (35 in 2:16-cv-00035-SRC-CLW, 324 in 2:15-cv-08180-SRC-CLW, 22 in 2:16-cv-00889-SRC-CLW, 42 in 2:15-cv-08353-SRC-CLW) re #324 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit), filed by MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN INC. (dam, )
June 22, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, Michael I. Verde, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ek)
June 21, 2018 Filing 346 NOTICE by MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. Requesting ECF Notification for Michael I. Verde (LURIA, AMY)
June 15, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee as to Michael I. Verde, Esq. : $ 150, receipt number NEW036707. (ek)
June 12, 2018 Filing 345 REDACTION to #344 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,,,, by SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Bryan C. Diner, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit A-1, #4 Exhibit A-2, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit D-1, #9 Exhibit D-2, #10 Exhibit E, #11 Exhibit F, #12 Declaration of Robert Gorman, #13 Exhibit A, #14 Exhibit B, #15 Exhibit C, #16 Exhibit D, #17 Exhibit E, #18 Supplemental Declaration of John F. LaFave, #19 Certificate of Service)(DENI, WILLIAM)
June 11, 2018 Filing 344 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC. re #325 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Bryan C. Diner, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit A-1, #4 Exhibit A-2, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit D-1, #9 Exhibit D-2, #10 Exhibit E, #11 Exhibit F, #12 Declaration of Robert Gorman, #13 Exhibit A, #14 Exhibit B, #15 Exhibit C, #16 Exhibit D, #17 Exhibit E, #18 Supplemental Declaration of John F. LaFave, #19 Certificate of Service)(DENI, WILLIAM)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER granting #341 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael I. Verde, Esq., etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 06/11/2018. (ek)
June 11, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #341 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for the Limited Purpose of Addressing Plaintiffs' Motion to Disqualify. Motion set for 7/2/2018 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ek)
June 8, 2018 Filing 342 NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN ROTENBERG on behalf of MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ROTENBERG, JONATHAN)
June 8, 2018 Filing 341 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for the Limited Purpose of Addressing Plaintiffs' Motion to Disqualify by MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Amy Luria, #2 Declaration of Michael I. Verde, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(LURIA, AMY)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 340 TEXT ORDER: The order granting the Mylan Defendants' Motion to Withdraw Counsel Admitted Pro Hac Vice (ECF No. 331) was entered in error. Please disregard the order (ECF No. 338).. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 6/6/18. (tjg, )
June 6, 2018 Filing 339 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. re: Motion to Withdraw of Alston & Bird LLP re #338 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DENI, WILLIAM)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER granting Defendants' #331 Motion to Withdraw as Pro Hac Vice Attorney of Hidetada James Abe and Andrew Ligotti, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 06/05/2018. (ek)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 337 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONSOLIDATING Civil Action No. 15-8180 (Consolidated) and Civil Action No. 17-6714(Consolidated) for purposes of trial only, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 06/04/2018. (ek)
June 5, 2018 Filing 336 REDACTION to #332 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion,,, by MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Deepro R. Mukerjee, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Declaration Of Doron S. Goldstein, #5 Declaration Of Thomas W. Jenkins, #6 Declaration Of Michael I. Verde, #7 Certificate of Service)(LURIA, AMY)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER REOPENING CASE, etc. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 06/05/2018. (ek)
June 5, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #331 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney on behalf of Hidetada James Abe and Andrew Ligotti. Motion set for 7/2/2018 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ek)
June 4, 2018 Filing 334 Exhibit to #332 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion,,, by MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (LURIA, AMY)
June 4, 2018 Filing 333 Exhibit to #332 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion,,, by MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (LURIA, AMY)
June 4, 2018 Filing 332 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. re #325 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Deepro R. Mukerjee, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Declaration of Doron S. Goldstein, #7 Declaration of Thomas W. Jenkins, #8 Declaration of Michael I. Verde, #9 Certificate of Service)(LURIA, AMY)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
June 4, 2018 Filing 331 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney on behalf of Hidetada James Abe and Andrew Ligotti by MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amy Luria, #2 Notice of Withdrawal, #3 Statement in Lieu of Brief, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(LURIA, AMY)
June 1, 2018 Filing 330 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. re: Stipulation and Proposed Order Consolidating Cases for Purposes of Trial. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and Proposed Order Consolidating Cases for Purposes of Trial)(DENI, WILLIAM)
May 31, 2018 Filing 329 STIPULATION CONSENT JUDGMENT AND INJUNCTION, etc. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 05/31/2018. (ek)
May 29, 2018 Filing 328 REDACTION to #326 Brief in Support of Motion,,,, by SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John F. LaFave, #2 Declaration of Holly Smith, #3 Declaration of Bryan C. Diner, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17)(DENI, WILLIAM)
May 29, 2018 Filing 327 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to Honorable Stanley R. Chesler, U.S.D.J.. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Stipulated Consent Judgment and Injunction)(DENI, WILLIAM)
May 29, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #325 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP. Motion set for 6/18/2018 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ek)
May 25, 2018 Filing 326 BRIEF in Support filed by SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC. re #325 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John F. LaFave, #2 Declaration of Holly Smith, #3 Declaration of Bryan C. Diner, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17)(DENI, WILLIAM)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
May 25, 2018 Filing 325 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP by SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(DENI, WILLIAM)
May 25, 2018 Filing 324 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #321 JUDGMENT to Federal Circuit by MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0312-8767066. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. Appeal Record due by 6/8/2018. (LURIA, AMY)
May 24, 2018 Filing 323 Letter from Amy Luria re: Case Termination. (LURIA, AMY)
May 24, 2018 Filing 322 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. re #311 Letter,,. (DENI, WILLIAM)
May 23, 2018 Filing 321 JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiffs, VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., WYETH LLC against Defendants, ACTAVIS LLC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., etc. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 05/23/2018. (ek, )
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 320 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #316 Motion to seal documents; the material identified in Appendix A to the Declaration of William P. Deni, Jr., Appendix A to the Declaration of Jason B. Lattimore, Appendix A to the Declaration of Amy Luria in Support of Motion to Seal Documents, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 05/22/2018. (ek)
May 23, 2018 ***Civil Case Terminated. (ek)
May 22, 2018 Filing 319 Letter from Amy Luria. (LURIA, AMY)
May 16, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stanley R. Chesler: Telephone Conference held on 5/16/2018. MOTIONS IN LIMINE WITHDRAWN WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND TERMINATED. TRIAL WITHOUT JURY ADJOURNED WITHOUT DATE. (tt, )
May 15, 2018 Filing 318 NOTICE of Appearance by CYMETRA MONIQUE WILLIAMS on behalf of PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., WYETH LLC (WILLIAMS, CYMETRA)
May 15, 2018 Filing 317 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney LAUREN BROPHY COOPER terminated. (COOPER, LAUREN)
May 15, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #316 MOTION to Seal Document #246 Exhibit (to Document),, #257 Declaration,, #282 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,, #286 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,, #258 Declaration,,,, #293 Certification in Opposition to Motion,,, #260 Brief,, #287 C. Motion set for 6/18/2018 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ek)
May 15, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE CALL Set for 5/16/2018 01:00 PM before Judge Stanley R. Chesler REGARDING DOC 315. COUNSEL SHALL INITIATE THE CALL TO CHAMBERS WITH ALL PARTIES PRESENT. (tt, )
May 14, 2018 Filing 316 MOTION to Seal Document #246 Exhibit (to Document),, #257 Declaration,, #282 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,, #286 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,, #258 Declaration,,,, #293 Certification in Opposition to Motion,,, #260 Brief,, #287 Certification in Opposition to Motion,,, #279 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,, #262 Brief,,, #250 Brief in Support of Motion,,, #248 Declaration,,, #283 Brief in Support of Motion,,, #281 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,, #244 Brief in Support of Motion,, #255 Declaration,,, #243 MOTION in Limine , #288 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,,, #280 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,, #284 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,, #291 Certification in Opposition to Motion,,, #253 Declaration,,, by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Deni Declaration, #2 Deni Appendix A, #3 Lattimore Declaration, #4 Lattimore Appendix A, #5 Luria Declaration, #6 Luria Appendix A, #7 Proposed Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, and Order, #8 Certificate of Service)(DENI, WILLIAM)
May 14, 2018 Filing 315 Letter from Amy Luria. (LURIA, AMY)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 314 CONSENT ORDER STAYING CASE respect to Actavis, etc. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 05/14/2018. (ek)
May 14, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #313 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) . Motion set for 6/4/2018 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ek)
May 11, 2018 Filing 313 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(DENI, WILLIAM)
May 11, 2018 Filing 312 REDACTION to #311 Letter,, by All Plaintiffs. (DENI, WILLIAM)
May 11, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #261 MOTION in Limine 2, #247 MOTION in Limine No. 3 To Preclude Defendants Witnesses from Testifying About Which They Are Not Experts, #252 MOTION in Limine No. 6 To Preclude Defendants from Presenting any Testimony, Evidence, or Argument at Trial that Plaintiffs Asserted Claims are Invalid for Indefiniteness Based on Inventor Testimony and Plaintiffs Internal Documents, #249 MOTION in Limine No. 4 To Preclude Defendants from Presenting Any Evidence, Testimony, or Argument Inconsistent with Mylans Representations to the FDA, #242 MOTION in Limine No. 1 To Exclude Evidence and Argument Regarding References That Are Not Prior Art to the Wyeth Patents, #245 MOTION in Limine No. 2 To Preclude Defendants from Offering Testimony Related to the Work of Dr. Fawzi by Dr. Mullen or Any Other Witness Who Lacks Personal Knowledge of the Subject Matter, #243 MOTION in Limine , #251 MOTION in Limine No. 5 To Preclude Defendants from Presenting any Testimony, Evidence, or Argument at Trial that Plaintiffs Asserted Claims are Invalid as Obvious Based on the Disclosure of the 025 Patent Specification, #254 MOTION in Limine No. 7 To Preclude Defendants from Presenting at Trial Testimony Based on Paragraphs 89-90 of Dr. Mullens Reply Report Concerning Alleged Lack of Enablement, #259 MOTION in Limine 1, #256 MOTION in Limine No. 8 To Preclude Defendants from Presenting at Trial Any Testimony Regarding Alleged Anticipation by Shah 115 of Claims 6, 8, and 12 of the 425 Patent. Motion set for 5/21/2018 11:00 AM before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. ORDERED ALL PARTIES TO APPEAR READY TO PROCEED. (tt, )
May 10, 2018 Filing 311 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to the Honorable Stanley R. Chesler, U.S.D.J.. (DENI, WILLIAM)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
May 10, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stanley R. Chesler: Telephone Conference held on 5/10/2018, regarding letters from counsel (tt, )
May 8, 2018 Filing 310 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to the Honorable Stanley R. Chesler, U.S.D.J. re: Proposed Order for Final Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Final Judgment)(DENI, WILLIAM)
May 4, 2018 Filing 309 REDACTION to #286 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,, In Limine No. 4 by MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (LURIA, AMY)
May 4, 2018 Filing 308 REDACTION to #283 Brief in Support of Motion,,, and Declaration by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tyler Doh, #2 Exhibit (s) A-F Filed Under Seal)(LATTIMORE, JASON)
May 4, 2018 Filing 307 REDACTION to #282 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,, and Declaration by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tyler Doh, #2 Exhibit (s) 1-5 Filed Under Seal)(LATTIMORE, JASON)
May 4, 2018 Filing 306 REDACTION to #284 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,, and Declaration by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shaobo Zhu, #2 Exhibit (s) A-D Filed Under Seal)(LATTIMORE, JASON)
May 4, 2018 Filing 305 REDACTION to #288 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,,, and Declaration by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shaobo Zhu, #2 Exhibit (s) 2-3 and 5-21 Filed Under Seal)(LATTIMORE, JASON)
May 4, 2018 Filing 304 REDACTION to #280 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,, by All Plaintiffs. (DENI, WILLIAM)
May 4, 2018 Filing 303 REDACTION to #279 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,, by All Plaintiffs. (DENI, WILLIAM)
May 4, 2018 Filing 302 REDACTION to #281 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,, by All Plaintiffs. (DENI, WILLIAM)
May 3, 2018 Filing 301 NOTICE of Change of Address by AMY DANIELLE LURIA (LURIA, AMY)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 300 OPINION AND ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #197 Motion for partial Summary Judgment and as to Defendants' affirmative defense to infringement of claim 8 of invalidity due to obviousness, Judgment is hereby entered in Plaintiffs' favor, etc. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 05/01/2018. (ek)
April 27, 2018 Filing 299 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to Hon. Stanley R. Chesler, U.S.D.J. enclosing copy of case with corrected citation for Motions In Limine No. 1 and 2 re #244 Brief in Support of Motion,, #245 MOTION in Limine No. 2 To Preclude Defendants from Offering Testimony Related to the Work of Dr. Fawzi by Dr. Mullen or Any Other Witness Who Lacks Personal Knowledge of the Subject Matter. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(DENI, WILLIAM)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER extending the deadline for the filing of motions until 5/14/18. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 4/27/18. (sr, )
April 26, 2018 Filing 297 Letter from Jason B. Lattimore Requesting Extension of Time to File Motions to Seal. (LATTIMORE, JASON)
April 26, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stanley R. Chesler: Telephone Conference OFF THE RECORD held on 4/26/2018. MOTIONS IN LIMINE SET FOR 5/22/18 AT 9:30 A.M. PRE TRIAL SUBMISSIONS DUE 5/28/18; ALL EXHIBITS TO BE PREMARKED WITH CORRESPONDING EXHIBIT LIST ;ORDERED TRIAL DATE SET FOR 6/4/18 A 9:30 A.M. (5DNJ) ORDERED ALL PARTIES TO APPEAR READY TO PROCEED (tt, )
April 26, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #261 MOTION in Limine 2, #247 MOTION in Limine No. 3 To Preclude Defendants Witnesses from Testifying About Which They Are Not Experts, #249 MOTION in Limine No. 4 To Preclude Defendants from Presenting Any Evidence, Testimony, or Argument Inconsistent with Mylans Representations to the FDA, #242 MOTION in Limine No. 1 To Exclude Evidence and Argument Regarding References That Are Not Prior Art to the Wyeth Patents, #245 MOTION in Limine No. 2 To Preclude Defendants from Offering Testimony Related to the Work of Dr. Fawzi by Dr. Mullen or Any Other Witness Who Lacks Personal Knowledge of the Subject Matter, #197 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #243 MOTION in Limine , #251 MOTION in Limine No. 5 To Preclude Defendants from Presenting any Testimony, Evidence, or Argument at Trial that Plaintiffs Asserted Claims are Invalid as Obvious Based on the Disclosure of the 025 Patent Specification, #254 MOTION in Limine No. 7 To Preclude Defendants from Presenting at Trial Testimony Based on Paragraphs 89-90 of Dr. Mullens Reply Report Concerning Alleged Lack of Enablement, #259 MOTION in Limine 1, #256 MOTION in Limine No. 8 To Preclude Defendants from Presenting at Trial Any Testimony Regarding Alleged Anticipation by Shah 115 of Claims 6, 8, and 12 of the 425 Patent. Motion set for 5/22/2018 09:30 AM before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. ORDERED ALL PARTIES TO APPEAR READY TO PROCEED (tt, )
April 26, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Bench Trial set for 6/4/2018 09:30 AM before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. (5 Days) (tt, )
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 296 FINDINGS OF FACT, CONCLUSIONS OF LAW/ORDER granting #240 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 4/24/18. (sr, )
April 17, 2018 Filing 295 NOTICE of Appearance by HOWARD J. SCHWARTZ on behalf of ACTAVIS LLC (SCHWARTZ, HOWARD)
April 17, 2018 Filing 294 Certification of of Service on behalf of MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. Re #289 Certification in Opposition to Motion, #283 Brief in Support of Motion,,, #285 Brief in Opposition to Motion, #282 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,, #286 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,, #293 Certification in Opposition to Motion,,, #288 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,,, #287 Certification in Opposition to Motion,,, #284 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,, #291 Certification in Opposition to Motion,,, #290 Brief in Opposition to Motion, #292 Brief in Opposition to Motion,. (LURIA, AMY)
April 17, 2018 Filing 293 CERTIFICATION in Opposition filed by MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. re #254 MOTION in Limine No. 7 To Preclude Defendants from Presenting at Trial Testimony Based on Paragraphs 89-90 of Dr. Mullens Reply Report Concerning Alleged Lack of Enablement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(LURIA, AMY)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
April 17, 2018 Filing 292 BRIEF in Opposition filed by MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. re #254 MOTION in Limine No. 7 To Preclude Defendants from Presenting at Trial Testimony Based on Paragraphs 89-90 of Dr. Mullens Reply Report Concerning Alleged Lack of Enablement (LURIA, AMY)
April 17, 2018 Filing 291 CERTIFICATION in Opposition filed by MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. re #251 MOTION in Limine No. 5 To Preclude Defendants from Presenting any Testimony, Evidence, or Argument at Trial that Plaintiffs Asserted Claims are Invalid as Obvious Based on the Disclosure of the 025 Patent Specification FILED UNDER SEAL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(LURIA, AMY)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
April 17, 2018 Filing 290 BRIEF in Opposition filed by MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. re #251 MOTION in Limine No. 5 To Preclude Defendants from Presenting any Testimony, Evidence, or Argument at Trial that Plaintiffs Asserted Claims are Invalid as Obvious Based on the Disclosure of the 025 Patent Specification (LURIA, AMY)
April 16, 2018 Filing 289 CERTIFICATION in Opposition filed by MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. re #242 MOTION in Limine No. 1 To Exclude Evidence and Argument Regarding References That Are Not Prior Art to the Wyeth Patents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 22)(LURIA, AMY)
April 16, 2018 Filing 288 BRIEF in Opposition filed by MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. re #242 MOTION in Limine No. 1 To Exclude Evidence and Argument Regarding References That Are Not Prior Art to the Wyeth Patents (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shaobo Zhu, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10, #10 Exhibit 11, #11 Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit 13, #13 Exhibit 14, #14 Exhibit 15, #15 Exhibit 16, #16 Exhibit 17, #17 Exhibit 18, #18 Exhibit 19, #19 Exhibit 20, #20 Exhibit 21)(LURIA, AMY)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
April 16, 2018 Filing 287 CERTIFICATION in Opposition filed by MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. re #247 MOTION in Limine No. 3 To Preclude Defendants Witnesses from Testifying About Which They Are Not Experts FILED UNDER SEAL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 5, #4 Exhibit 6, #5 Exhibit 8, #6 Exhibit 10, #7 Exhibit 13, #8 Exhibit 14)(LURIA, AMY)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
April 16, 2018 Filing 286 BRIEF in Opposition filed by MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. re #249 MOTION in Limine No. 4 To Preclude Defendants from Presenting Any Evidence, Testimony, or Argument Inconsistent with Mylans Representations to the FDA on behalf of the Mylan Defendants (LURIA, AMY)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
April 16, 2018 Filing 285 BRIEF in Opposition filed by MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. re #247 MOTION in Limine No. 3 To Preclude Defendants Witnesses from Testifying About Which They Are Not Experts (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephanie Roberts, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 7, #5 Exhibit 9, #6 Exhibit 11, #7 Exhibit 12, #8 Exhibit 15, #9 Exhibit 16)(LURIA, AMY)
April 16, 2018 Filing 284 BRIEF in Opposition filed by MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. re #245 MOTION in Limine No. 2 To Preclude Defendants from Offering Testimony Related to the Work of Dr. Fawzi by Dr. Mullen or Any Other Witness Who Lacks Personal Knowledge of the Subject Matter (Attachments: #1 Declaration Shaobo Zhu, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(LURIA, AMY)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
April 16, 2018 Filing 283 BRIEF in Support filed by MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. re #256 MOTION in Limine No. 8 To Preclude Defendants from Presenting at Trial Any Testimony Regarding Alleged Anticipation by Shah 115 of Claims 6, 8, and 12 of the 425 Patent (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tyler Doh, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(LURIA, AMY)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
April 16, 2018 Filing 282 BRIEF in Opposition filed by MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. re #252 MOTION in Limine No. 6 To Preclude Defendants from Presenting any Testimony, Evidence, or Argument at Trial that Plaintiffs Asserted Claims are Invalid for Indefiniteness Based on Inventor Testimony and Plaintiffs Internal Documents (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tyler Doh, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(LURIA, AMY)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
April 16, 2018 Filing 281 BRIEF in Opposition filed by PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., WYETH LLC re #243 MOTION in Limine (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William P. Deni, Jr., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Certificate of Service)(DENI, WILLIAM)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
April 16, 2018 Filing 280 BRIEF in Opposition filed by PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., WYETH LLC re #261 MOTION in Limine 2 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William P. Deni, Jr., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Certificate of Service)(DENI, WILLIAM)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
April 16, 2018 Filing 279 BRIEF in Opposition filed by PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., WYETH LLC re #259 MOTION in Limine 1 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William P. Deni, Jr., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Certificate of Service)(DENI, WILLIAM)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER permitting Actavis and Mylan defendants an extension of time to submit oppositions to motions in limine until 4/16/18. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 4/10/18. (sr, )
April 10, 2018 Filing 277 Letter from Jason B. Lattimore Requesting Extension of Deadline to File Oppositions to Motions In Limine. (LATTIMORE, JASON)
April 5, 2018 Filing 276 Letter from Amy Luria re #240 MOTION to Seal Document #231 Declaration,, #224 Statement of Material Facts in Opposition to Motion,, #198 Statement of Material Fact in Support of Motion,, #225 Certification in Opposition to Motion,,, #199 Declaration,,,, . (Attachments: #1 Appendix Revised)(LURIA, AMY)
April 5, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, CHARLES E. LIPSEY, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (sr, )
April 4, 2018 Filing 275 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Charles E. Lipsey to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (DENI, WILLIAM)
April 3, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW036051 RE: Charles E. Lipsey, Esq. (sr, )
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 274 STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding pending discovery disputes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 4/2/18. (sr, )
April 2, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #261 MOTION in Limine 2, #259 MOTION in Limine 1. Motion set for 5/7/2018 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, )
March 30, 2018 Filing 273 REDACTION to #262 Brief,,, and Declaration by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shaobo Zhu, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit (s) B-O Filed Under Seal, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(LATTIMORE, JASON)
March 30, 2018 Filing 272 REDACTION to #260 Brief,, and Declaration by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephanie M. Roberts, #2 Exhibit (s) 1-4 Filed Under Seal, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(LATTIMORE, JASON)
March 29, 2018 Filing 271 REDACTION to ECF No. 243 Brief and Declaration by ACTAVIS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua A. Whitehill, #2 Exhibit (s) A-C and G-W Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F)(LATTIMORE, JASON)
March 29, 2018 Filing 270 REDACTION to #257 Declaration,, re Motion in Limine No. 8 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(DENI, WILLIAM)
March 29, 2018 Filing 269 REDACTION to #255 Declaration,,, re Motion in Limine No. 7 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(DENI, WILLIAM)
March 29, 2018 Filing 268 REDACTION to #253 Declaration,,, re Motion in Limine No. 6 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(DENI, WILLIAM)
March 29, 2018 Filing 267 REDACTION to #250 Brief in Support of Motion,,, in Limine No. 4 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(DENI, WILLIAM)
March 29, 2018 Filing 266 REDACTION to #248 Declaration,,, re Motion in Limine No. 3 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(DENI, WILLIAM)
March 29, 2018 Filing 265 REDACTION to #258 Declaration,,,, re Motion in Limine No. 1 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24)(DENI, WILLIAM)
March 29, 2018 Filing 264 REDACTION to #244 Brief in Support of Motion,, in Limine No. 1 by All Plaintiffs. (DENI, WILLIAM)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 263 TEXT ORDER: In light of the parties' stipulation (ECF No. 241), Plaintiffs' Motion To Strike Sections of Defendants' Opening Reports (ECF No. 163) is hereby terminated as moot.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/29/18. (tjg, )
March 29, 2018 Filing 262 BRIEF In Support of Defendants' Motion In Limine 2 (Doc. No. 261) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shaobo Zhu, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Text of Proposed Order, #18 Certificate of Service)(LATTIMORE, JASON)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
March 29, 2018 Filing 261 MOTION in Limine 2 by All Defendants. (LATTIMORE, JASON)
March 29, 2018 Filing 260 BRIEF In Support of Defendants' Motion In Limine 1 (Doc. No. 259) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephanie M. Roberts, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(LATTIMORE, JASON)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
March 29, 2018 Filing 259 MOTION in Limine 1 by All Defendants. (LATTIMORE, JASON)
March 29, 2018 Filing 258 DECLARATION of William P. Deni, Jr. re #242 MOTION in Limine No. 1 To Exclude Evidence and Argument Regarding References That Are Not Prior Art to the Wyeth Patents by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24)(DENI, WILLIAM)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
March 29, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #261 MOTION in Limine 2, #247 MOTION in Limine No. 3 To Preclude Defendants Witnesses from Testifying About Which They Are Not Experts, #252 MOTION in Limine No. 6 To Preclude Defendants from Presenting any Testimony, Evidence, or Argument at Trial that Plaintiffs Asserted Claims are Invalid for Indefiniteness Based on Inventor Testimony and Plaintiffs Internal Documents, #249 MOTION in Limine No. 4 To Preclude Defendants from Presenting Any Evidence, Testimony, or Argument Inconsistent with Mylans Representations to the FDA, #242 MOTION in Limine No. 1 To Exclude Evidence and Argument Regarding References That Are Not Prior Art to the Wyeth Patents, #245 MOTION in Limine No. 2 To Preclude Defendants from Offering Testimony Related to the Work of Dr. Fawzi by Dr. Mullen or Any Other Witness Who Lacks Personal Knowledge of the Subject Matter, #243 MOTION in Limine , #251 MOTION in Limine No. 5 To Preclude Defendants from Presenting any Testimony, Evidence, or Argument at Trial that Plaintiffs Asserted Claims are Invalid as Obvious Based on the Disclosure of the 025 Patent Specification, #254 MOTION in Limine No. 7 To Preclude Defendants from Presenting at Trial Testimony Based on Paragraphs 89-90 of Dr. Mullens Reply Report Concerning Alleged Lack of Enablement, #259 MOTION in Limine 1, #256 MOTION in Limine No. 8 To Preclude Defendants from Presenting at Trial Any Testimony Regarding Alleged Anticipation by Shah 115 of Claims 6, 8, and 12 of the 425 Patent. Motion set for 5/7/2018 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, )
March 28, 2018 Filing 257 DECLARATION of William P. Deni, Jr. re #256 MOTION in Limine No. 8 To Preclude Defendants from Presenting at Trial Any Testimony Regarding Alleged Anticipation by Shah 115 of Claims 6, 8, and 12 of the 425 Patent by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(DENI, WILLIAM)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
March 28, 2018 Filing 256 MOTION in Limine No. 8 To Preclude Defendants from Presenting at Trial Any Testimony Regarding Alleged Anticipation by Shah 115 of Claims 6, 8, and 12 of the 425 Patent by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief)(DENI, WILLIAM)
March 28, 2018 Filing 255 DECLARATION of William P. Deni, Jr. re #254 MOTION in Limine No. 7 To Preclude Defendants from Presenting at Trial Testimony Based on Paragraphs 89-90 of Dr. Mullens Reply Report Concerning Alleged Lack of Enablement by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(DENI, WILLIAM)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
March 28, 2018 Filing 254 MOTION in Limine No. 7 To Preclude Defendants from Presenting at Trial Testimony Based on Paragraphs 89-90 of Dr. Mullens Reply Report Concerning Alleged Lack of Enablement by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief)(DENI, WILLIAM)
March 28, 2018 Filing 253 DECLARATION of William P. Deni, Jr. re #252 MOTION in Limine No. 6 To Preclude Defendants from Presenting any Testimony, Evidence, or Argument at Trial that Plaintiffs Asserted Claims are Invalid for Indefiniteness Based on Inventor Testimony and Plaintiffs Internal Documents by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(DENI, WILLIAM)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
March 28, 2018 Filing 252 MOTION in Limine No. 6 To Preclude Defendants from Presenting any Testimony, Evidence, or Argument at Trial that Plaintiffs Asserted Claims are Invalid for Indefiniteness Based on Inventor Testimony and Plaintiffs Internal Documents by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief)(DENI, WILLIAM)
March 28, 2018 Filing 251 MOTION in Limine No. 5 To Preclude Defendants from Presenting any Testimony, Evidence, or Argument at Trial that Plaintiffs Asserted Claims are Invalid as Obvious Based on the Disclosure of the 025 Patent Specification by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Declaration, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3)(DENI, WILLIAM)
March 28, 2018 Filing 250 BRIEF in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #249 MOTION in Limine No. 4 To Preclude Defendants from Presenting Any Evidence, Testimony, or Argument Inconsistent with Mylans Representations to the FDA (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(DENI, WILLIAM)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
March 28, 2018 Filing 249 MOTION in Limine No. 4 To Preclude Defendants from Presenting Any Evidence, Testimony, or Argument Inconsistent with Mylans Representations to the FDA by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DENI, WILLIAM)
March 28, 2018 Filing 248 DECLARATION of William P. Deni, Jr. re #247 MOTION in Limine No. 3 To Preclude Defendants Witnesses from Testifying About Which They Are Not Experts by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(DENI, WILLIAM)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
March 28, 2018 Filing 247 MOTION in Limine No. 3 To Preclude Defendants Witnesses from Testifying About Which They Are Not Experts by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief)(DENI, WILLIAM)
March 28, 2018 Filing 246 Exhibit to #245 Motion in Limine, by All Plaintiffs. (DENI, WILLIAM)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
March 28, 2018 Filing 245 MOTION in Limine No. 2 To Preclude Defendants from Offering Testimony Related to the Work of Dr. Fawzi by Dr. Mullen or Any Other Witness Who Lacks Personal Knowledge of the Subject Matter by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Declaration)(DENI, WILLIAM)
March 28, 2018 Filing 244 BRIEF in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #242 MOTION in Limine No. 1 To Exclude Evidence and Argument Regarding References That Are Not Prior Art to the Wyeth Patents (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(DENI, WILLIAM)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
March 28, 2018 Filing 243 MOTION in Limine by ACTAVIS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit R, #21 Exhibit S, #22 Exhibit T, #23 Exhibit U, #24 Exhibit V, #25 Exhibit W, #26 Text of Proposed Order, #27 Certificate of Service)(LATTIMORE, JASON)
March 28, 2018 Filing 242 MOTION in Limine No. 1 To Exclude Evidence and Argument Regarding References That Are Not Prior Art to the Wyeth Patents by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DENI, WILLIAM)
March 28, 2018 Filing 241 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. re: Stipulation Regarding Pending Discovery Disputes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Stipulation)(DENI, WILLIAM)
March 28, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #240 MOTION to Seal Document #231 Declaration,, #224 Statement of Material Facts in Opposition to Motion,, #198 Statement of Material Fact in Support of Motion,, #225 Certification in Opposition to Motion,,, #199 Declaration,,,, . Motion set for 5/7/2018 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (cm, )
March 27, 2018 Filing 240 MOTION to Seal Document #231 Declaration,, #224 Statement of Material Facts in Opposition to Motion,, #198 Statement of Material Fact in Support of Motion,, #225 Certification in Opposition to Motion,,, #199 Declaration,,,, by PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William P. Deni, Jr., #2 Appendix A to Declaration of William P. Deni, Jr., #3 Declaration of Amy Luria, #4 Appendix A to Declaration of Amy Luria, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(DENI, WILLIAM)
March 27, 2018 Filing 239 REDACTION to #224 Statement of Material Facts in Opposition to Motion,, by ACTAVIS LLC, MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (LURIA, AMY)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 238 TEXT ORDER: Due to the unavailability of plaintiffs supplemental expert permitted by the Court and with consent of the parties the final pretrial Order shall be submitted to this Court on April 18, 2018. There will be no further extensions on that submission.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/23/18. (tjg, )
March 23, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 3/23/2018. (tjg, )
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 237 CONSENT ORDER permitting Charles E. Lipsey, Esq. to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/14/18. (sr, )
March 14, 2018 Filing 236 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of William P. Deni, Jr. in Support of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Certification of Charles E. Lipsey in Support of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(DENI, WILLIAM)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 235 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference, to be initiated by plaintiff, on 3/23/18 at 12:30 PM. All pretrial submissions shall be filed by 3/28/18. Opposition shall be filed by 4/11/18. Judge Waldor will sign off on the final pretrial order on 4/4/18 barring exceptional circumstances. Parties may contact chambers at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/13/18. (tjg, )
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 234 STIPULATION AND ORDER to narrow the issues to be presented at trial as to U.S. Patent No. 8,552,025. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 3/13/18. (sr, )
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 233 STIPULATION/ORDER. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 3/13/18. (sr, )
March 13, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Final Pretrial Conference held on 3/13/2018. (tjg, )
March 12, 2018 Filing 232 REDACTION to #231 Declaration,, by PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., WYETH LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(DENI, WILLIAM)
March 12, 2018 Filing 231 DECLARATION of William P. Deni, Jr. re #230 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion, by PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., WYETH LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(DENI, WILLIAM)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
March 12, 2018 Filing 230 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., WYETH LLC re #197 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Supplemental Statement of Disputed Material Facts, #2 Certificate of Service)(DENI, WILLIAM)
March 9, 2018 Filing 229 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jitendra Malik to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (LURIA, AMY)
March 9, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, JITENDRA MALIK, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (sr, )
March 7, 2018 Filing 228 STIPULATION re 220 Order,, as to Preliminary Injunction Application by PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., WYETH LLC. (DENI, WILLIAM)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
March 6, 2018 Filing 227 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Narrow the Issues to be Presented at Trial as to U.S. Patent No. 8,552,025 by PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., WYETH LLC. (DENI, WILLIAM)
March 6, 2018 Filing 226 CERTIFICATION in Opposition filed by MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. re #197 MOTION for Summary Judgment Signed by H. James Abe, Esq. (LURIA, AMY)
March 6, 2018 Filing 225 CERTIFICATION in Opposition filed by MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. re #197 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5, #2 Exhibit 7, #3 Exhibit 9, #4 Exhibit 10, #5 Exhibit 11, #6 Exhibit 12, #7 Exhibit 15, #8 Exhibit 17, #9 Exhibit 18, #10 Exhibit 20)(LURIA, AMY)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
March 6, 2018 Filing 224 STATEMENT of Material Facts in Opposition filed by MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. re #197 MOTION for Summary Judgment (LURIA, AMY)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
March 6, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The CERTF. IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION - D.E. 223 & CERTF. IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION - D.E. 225 submitted by A. LURIA on 3/6/18 contains an improper signature. Only the filing user is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (DD, )
March 5, 2018 Filing 223 CERTIFICATION in Opposition filed by MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. re #197 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 5 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #9 Exhibit 10 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #10 Exhibit 11 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #11 Exhibit 12 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #12 Exhibit 13, #13 Exhibit 14, #14 Exhibit 15 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #15 Exhibit 16, #16 Exhibit 17 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #17 Exhibit 18 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #18 Exhibit 19, #19 Exhibit 20 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #20 Exhibit 21)(LURIA, AMY)
March 5, 2018 Filing 222 BRIEF in Opposition filed by MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. re #197 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 56.1 Responsive Statement [Filed Under Seal], #2 Certificate of Service)(LURIA, AMY)
March 1, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW035762 RE: Jitendra Malik, Esq. (sr, )
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER granting #212 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice RE: Jitendra Malik, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/27/18. (sr, )
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 220 TEXT ORDER: The 3/13/18 conference at 12:00 PM (ECF No. 218) is hereby reconverted to a Final Pretrial Conference. All briefing on a preliminary injunction is to be completed by March 16, 2018. The Court will not hold any further oral argument on discovery issues or entertain any further discovery disputes. In the event the parties cannot resolve pending discovery disputes, the parties shall meet and confer in Courtroom 4C on 3/1/18, 3/2/18, 3/8/18 and 3/9/18.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/26/18. (tjg, )
February 26, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 2/26/2018. (tjg, )
February 23, 2018 Filing 219 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to Honorable Stanley R. Chesler, U.S.D.J. requesting conference. (DENI, WILLIAM)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 218 TEXT ORDER: The Court will convert the 3/13/18 final pretrial conference to an in-person status conference at 12pm. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/22/18. (tjg, )
February 22, 2018 Filing 217 Letter from Amy Luria. (LURIA, AMY)
February 20, 2018 Filing 216 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. re: update to the parties' recent letter exchanges re #205 Letter,, #194 Letter, #196 Letter, 177 Order,. (DENI, WILLIAM)
February 19, 2018 Filing 215 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #197 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (LURIA, AMY)
February 16, 2018 Filing 214 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by ACTAVIS LLC re #197 MOTION for Summary Judgment (LATTIMORE, JASON)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 213 TEXT ORDER: Defendants' request (ECF No. 209) is denied. Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 197) is due 2/20/18. Defendants are entitled to an extension under Local Rule 7.1(d)(5).. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/16/18. (tjg, )
February 16, 2018 Filing 212 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Amy Luria, #2 Certification of Jitendra Malik, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(LURIA, AMY)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 211 TEXT ORDER: The Court will adjourn the 2/16/18 conference. A new date is forthcoming. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/16/18. (tjg, )
February 16, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #212 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 3/19/2018 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, )
February 15, 2018 Filing 210 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to the Hon. Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. regarding Plaintiffs' request for an adjournment of the February 16th conference re #208 Letter, #209 Letter. (DENI, WILLIAM)
February 15, 2018 Filing 209 Letter from Jason B. Lattimore re #208 Letter. (LATTIMORE, JASON)
February 15, 2018 Filing 208 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. requesting adjournment of February 16 conference and consolidated scheduling of other dates. (DENI, WILLIAM)
February 14, 2018 Filing 207 REDACTION to #205 Letter,, by PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., WYETH LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(DENI, WILLIAM)
February 13, 2018 Filing 206 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. re #197 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #200 Letter. (DENI, WILLIAM)
February 13, 2018 Filing 205 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. re #194 Letter, #196 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(DENI, WILLIAM)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 204 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an in-person status conference on 2/16/18 at 2:30 PM.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/13/18. (tjg, )
February 13, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #197 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion set for 3/5/2018 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, )
February 12, 2018 Filing 203 REDACTION to #199 Declaration,,,, by PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., WYETH LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25)(DENI, WILLIAM)
February 12, 2018 Filing 202 REDACTION to #198 Statement of Material Fact in Support of Motion,, by PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., WYETH LLC. (DENI, WILLIAM)
February 12, 2018 Filing 201 Exhibit to #200 Letter by ACTAVIS LLC. (LATTIMORE, JASON)
February 12, 2018 Filing 200 Letter from Jason B. Lattimore re #197 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #199 Declaration,,,, #198 Statement of Material Fact in Support of Motion,,. (LATTIMORE, JASON)
February 9, 2018 Filing 199 DECLARATION of William P. Deni, Jr. re #197 MOTION for Summary Judgment by PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., WYETH LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28)(DENI, WILLIAM)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
February 9, 2018 Filing 198 STATEMENT of Material Fact in Support filed by PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., WYETH LLC re #197 MOTION for Summary Judgment (DENI, WILLIAM)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
February 9, 2018 Filing 197 MOTION for Summary Judgment by PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., WYETH LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(DENI, WILLIAM)
February 7, 2018 Filing 196 Letter from Amy Luria. (LURIA, AMY)
February 5, 2018 Filing 195 Letter from Amy Luria. (LURIA, AMY)
February 2, 2018 Filing 194 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. re #163 MOTION to Strike Sections of Defendants' Opening Reports. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DENI, WILLIAM)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 193 TEXT ORDER: The Court will adjourn the 2/22/18 final pretrial conference to 3/13/18 at 11:30am. Order shall be submitted to the Court by 4pm Friday, March 9, 2018. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/2/18. (tjg, )
February 2, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 2/2/2018. (tjg, )
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 192 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference, to be initiated by plaintiff, on 2/2/18 at 10:00 AM. Parties may contact chambers at (973) 776 7862.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/1/18. (tjg, )
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER permitting a one-week extension of the deadlines re: Court's scheduling order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/29/18. (sr, )
January 26, 2018 Filing 190 Letter from Amy Luria. (LURIA, AMY)
January 24, 2018 Filing 189 Letter from Amy Luria. (LURIA, AMY)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 188 TEXT ORDER: The 1/16/18 teleconference is canceled.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/12/18. (tjg, )
January 12, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Status Conference held on 1/12/2018. (tjg, )
January 11, 2018 Filing 187 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Andrew Ligotti to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (LURIA, AMY)
January 11, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, ANDREW LIGOTTI, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (sr, )
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 186 FINDING OF FACT, CONCLUSIONS OF LAW/ORDER granting #180 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/5/18. (sr, )
January 3, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee of $150 received as to ANDREW LIGOTTI, ESQ., receipt number TRE087515 (mps)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 185 TEXT ORDER: The Court will grant counsels request to adjourn the 1/5/18 in-person meet and confer to 1/12/18 at 10am. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 12/29/17. (tjg, )
December 28, 2017 Filing 184 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to Hon. Cathy Waldor requesting that the in-person meet and confer be rescheduled to January 12, 2018. re 177 Order,. (DENI, WILLIAM)
December 22, 2017 Filing 183 NOTICE of Appearance by ALISSA MARIE PACCHIOLI on behalf of MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (PACCHIOLI, ALISSA)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER granting #181 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to ANDREW LIGOTTI, ESQ., etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 12/19/17. (cm, )
December 15, 2017 Filing 181 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Amy Luria, #2 Certification of Andrew Ligotti, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(LURIA, AMY)
December 15, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #181 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 1/16/2018 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, )
December 12, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #180 MOTION to Seal Document #164 Exhibit (to Document),, #176 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,,, #171 Exhibit (to Document),, . Motion set for 1/16/2018 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, )
December 11, 2017 Filing 180 MOTION to Seal Document #164 Exhibit (to Document),, #176 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,,, #171 Exhibit (to Document),, by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William P. Deni, Jr. in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Appendix to Declaration of William P. Deni, Jr., #3 [Proposed] Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, and Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(DENI, WILLIAM)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER granting a one week extension of time to file a consolidated Motion to Seal for Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Sections of Defendants' Expert Reports; that the consolidated Motion to Seal will be filed on December 11, 2017 re #163 MOTION to Strike Sections of Defendants' Opening Reports filed by VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., WYETH LLC, PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 12/4/2017. (ld, )
December 4, 2017 Filing 178 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. re #163 MOTION to Strike Sections of Defendants' Opening Reports, #164 Exhibit (to Document),, #171 Exhibit (to Document),, #170 Brief in Opposition to Motion, #176 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,,,. (DENI, WILLIAM)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 177 TEXT ORDER: All parties will appear in Courtroom 4C, before Magistrate Judge Waldor on January 5, 2017 at 10:00 am to meet and confer on significantly reducing claims, and narrow prior art references and defenses theories asserted, as well as the pending Motion to Strike (Dkts. 163, 170, 176). Counsel shall be mindful of the fact that this case is to be streamlined for pre-trial and trial purposes. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 12/1/17. (tjg, )
November 20, 2017 Filing 176 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #163 MOTION to Strike Sections of Defendants' Opening Reports (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin J. Hasford, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3 (part 1 of 2), #5 Exhibit 3 (part 2 of 2), #6 Certificate of Service)(DENI, WILLIAM)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 175 TEXT ORDER: Please disregard the instruction for a teleconference on 2/8/18, there will be no teleconference.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/16/17. (tjg, )
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 174 TEXT ORDER: The Court will grant counsels request to adjourn the 2/14/18 final pretrial conference to 2/22/18 at 2pm. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/16/17. (tjg, )
November 15, 2017 Filing 173 Letter from Jason B. Lattimore re #169 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings. (LATTIMORE, JASON)
November 13, 2017 Filing 172 Certification of Service on behalf of ACTAVIS LLC, MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. Re #171 Exhibit (to Document),, #170 Brief in Opposition to Motion,. (LATTIMORE, JASON)
November 13, 2017 Filing 171 Exhibit to #170 Brief in Opposition to Motion, by ACTAVIS LLC, MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Joshua A. Whitehill)(LATTIMORE, JASON)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 13, 2017 Filing 170 BRIEF in Opposition filed by ACTAVIS LLC, MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. re #163 MOTION to Strike Sections of Defendants' Opening Reports (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua Whitehill, #2 Exhibit A (filed separately under seal), #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(LATTIMORE, JASON)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER, Expert Discovery due by 1/26/2018, dispositive Motions due by 2/2/2018, proposed Final Pretrial Order due by 2/8/2018, Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/14/2018; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/9/17. (sr, )
November 8, 2017 Filing 168 Court's Letter adjourning the #163 MOTION to Strike to 12/4/17. (sr, )
November 8, 2017 Reset Deadlines as to #163 MOTION to Strike Sections of Defendants' Opening Reports. Motion set for 12/4/2017 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, )
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 167 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference, to be initiated by plaintiff, on 1/16/18 at 1:00 PM. The 12/1/17 teleconference is canceled. Parties may contact chambers at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/7/17. (tjg, )
November 6, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 11/6/2017. (tjg, )
November 6, 2017 Filing 166 Letter from Jason B. Lattimore Enclosing Proposed Scheduling Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LATTIMORE, JASON)
October 30, 2017 Filing 165 Letter from Jason B. Lattimore re #152 Order, #158 Order. (LATTIMORE, JASON)
October 30, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #163 MOTION to Strike Sections of Defendants' Opening Reports. Motion set for 11/20/2017 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, )
October 27, 2017 Filing 164 Exhibit to #163 Motion to Strike, by PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., WYETH LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Exhibit H)(DENI, WILLIAM)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
October 27, 2017 Filing 163 MOTION to Strike Sections of Defendants' Opening Reports by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Brief in Support of Motion to Strike Sections of Defendants' Opening Reports, #2 Appendix A to Plaintiffs' Brief, #3 Declaration of Justin J. Hasford, #4 Exhibits A through H [Filed Under Seal], #5 Exhibit I, #6 Exhibit J, #7 Exhibit K, #8 Exhibit L, #9 Text of Proposed Order, #10 Certificate of Service)(DENI, WILLIAM)
October 6, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 10/6/2017. (tjg, )
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 162 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a teleconference, to be initiated by Plaintiff, on October 6, 2017 at 11:00 AM.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 10/3/17. (tjg, )
September 26, 2017 Filing 161 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor re #160 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(DENI, WILLIAM)
September 25, 2017 Filing 160 Letter from Jason B. Lattimore re #159 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(LATTIMORE, JASON)
September 22, 2017 Filing 159 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to Hon. Cathy Waldor Requesting Leave to File A Formal Motion to Strike Sections of Defendants' Opening Expert Reports. (DENI, WILLIAM)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER modifying dates re: discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/20/17. (sr, )
September 19, 2017 Filing 157 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to Hon. Cathy Waldor informing Court of agreement to modify expert discovery schedule & requesting So Order execution. (DENI, WILLIAM)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 156 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference, to be initiated by plaintiff, on 12/1/17 at 10:00 AM. Parties may contact chambers at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 8/22/17. (tjg, )
August 22, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 8/22/2017. (tjg, )
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 155 STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding miscellaneous fact discovery issues; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/27/17. (sr, )
July 25, 2017 Filing 154 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J.. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and Proposed Order)(DENI, WILLIAM)
June 12, 2017 Filing 153 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (LURIA, AMY)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER granting #150 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 6/6/17. (sr, )
June 6, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #150 MOTION to Seal Document Docket Entry No. 145. Motion set for 7/3/2017 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, )
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 152 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Re: discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 6/5/17. (sr, )
June 5, 2017 Filing 150 MOTION to Seal Document Docket Entry No. 145 by MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Amy Luria, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(LURIA, AMY)
June 2, 2017 Filing 149 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J.. (DENI, WILLIAM)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 148 STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding claim construction; etc. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 5/30/17. (sr, )
May 25, 2017 Filing 147 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to the Honorable Stanley R. Chesler, U.S.D.J. re: Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Claim Construction. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Claim Construction)(DENI, WILLIAM)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 146 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference, to be initiated by plaintiff, on 8/22/17 at 1:00 PM. Parties may contact chambers at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 5/25/17. (tjg, )
May 25, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 5/25/2017. (tjg, )
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting #98 Motion to Amend Contentions; finding as moot #127 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 5/22/17. (tjg, )
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 144 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference, to be initiated by plaintiff, on 5/25/17 at 12:00 PM. Parties to supply Court with transcript of today's proceedings via email to CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov as soon as practicable. Parties may contact chambers at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 5/11/17. (tjg, )
May 11, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Status Conference held on 5/11/2017. (tjg, )
May 2, 2017 Pro Hac Vice counsel, ANDREW J. RA, JR, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (sr, )
May 2, 2017 Pro Hac Vice counsel, CAITLYN E. O'CONNELL, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (sr, )
May 1, 2017 Filing 143 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Andrew J. Ra, Jr., Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-7807338.) (DENI, WILLIAM)
May 1, 2017 Filing 142 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Caitlyn E. O'Connell, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-7807271.) (DENI, WILLIAM)
May 1, 2017 Filing 141 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Chiaki Fujiwara, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-7807169.) (DENI, WILLIAM)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 140 TEXT ORDER: All parties are to appear before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 5/11/17 at 9:30 am. Parties shall be prepared to meet and confer on the outstanding Motion to Amend; Motion to Compel and all outstanding discovery disputes. Parties shall also meet and confer regarding the number of claims, and have available a Ceritfied Court Reporter. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 4/28/17. (tjg, )
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 139 CONSENT ORDER permitting Chiaki Fujiwara, Caitlin E. O'Connell, and Andrew J. Ra, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 4/27/17. (sr, )
April 26, 2017 Filing 138 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of William P. Deni, Jr. in Support of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admissions, #2 Certification of Chiaki Fujiwara in Support of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #3 Certification of Caitlyn E. O'Connell in Support of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #4 Certification of Andrew J. Ra, Jr. in Support of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(DENI, WILLIAM)
April 5, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 4/5/2017. (tjg, )
April 4, 2017 Filing 137 Letter from Amy Luria re: Plaintiffs' March 31, 2017 letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(LURIA, AMY)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 TEXT ORDER: All parties are to appear before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on April 28, 2017 at 9:30 am. Parties shall be prepared to meet and confer on the outstanding Motion to Amend; Motion to Compel and all outstanding discovery disputes. Parties shall also meet and confer regarding the number of claims, and have available a Ceritfied Court Reporter.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 4/3/17. (tjg, )
March 31, 2017 Filing 135 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., WYETH LLC re #127 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Defendant Mylan (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Brian C. Diner, #2 Exhibit 1 (part 1), #3 Exhibit 1 (part 2), #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Certificate of Service)(DENI, WILLIAM)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
March 31, 2017 Filing 134 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to Hon. Cathy L. Waldor requesting deposition of Defendants expert and teleconference with Court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(DENI, WILLIAM)
March 27, 2017 Filing 133 Letter from Jason B. Lattimore re #132 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(LATTIMORE, JASON)
March 27, 2017 Filing 132 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to the Honorable Stanley R. Chesler, U.S.D.J.. (DENI, WILLIAM)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting Pltf's re #129 Letter Request for an extension until Monday, 3/27/17, to subm. a letter to the Court re: the proposed schedule for a Claim Const. Hrg. purs. to Local Patent Rule 4.6. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 3/27/17. (DD, )
March 24, 2017 Filing 130 BRIEF in Opposition filed by MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. re #127 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Defendant Mylan (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amy Luria, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Certificate of Service)(LURIA, AMY)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
March 24, 2017 Filing 129 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to the Honorable Stanley R. Chesler, U.S.D.J. Regarding Joint Request for Extension. (DENI, WILLIAM)
March 20, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #127 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Defendant Mylan. Motion set for 4/17/2017 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, )
March 17, 2017 Filing 128 BRIEF in Support filed by PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., WYETH LLC re #127 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Defendant Mylan (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bryan C. Diner, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(DENI, WILLIAM)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
March 17, 2017 Filing 127 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Defendant Mylan by PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., WYETH LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(DENI, WILLIAM)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER re: testimony; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/13/17. (sr, )
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 TEXT ORDER: Motion to Compel Briefing Schedule: Opening: 3/17/17; Opposition: 3/25/17; Reply: 3/31/17.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/13/17. (tjg, )
March 13, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 3/13/2017. (tjg, )
March 10, 2017 Filing 124 MARKMAN RESPONSE BRIEF re #97 Markman Opening Brief,, (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Bryan C. Diner, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Certificate of Service)(DENI, WILLIAM)
March 10, 2017 Filing 123 MARKMAN RESPONSE BRIEF re #96 Markman Opening Brief,, (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James F. Castner, #2 Declaration of Tyler Doh, #3 Exhibit 17, #4 Exhibit 18, #5 Certificate of Service)(LATTIMORE, JASON)
March 10, 2017 Filing 122 Letter from Amy Luria re #118 Letter,,. (LURIA, AMY)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 TEXT ORDER:The Court will hold a teleconference, to be initiated by Plaintiffs, on Monday, March 13, 2017 at 4:30 PM.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/9/17. (tjg, )
March 8, 2017 Filing 120 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. Re: Joint Stipulation as to Authenticity and Non-Hearsay Business Record Status of Documents. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Joint Stipulation)(DENI, WILLIAM)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 119 STIPULATION AND ORDER Re: #113 Letter. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 3/6/17. (sr, )
March 7, 2017 Filing 118 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. Requesting Permission to File Motion. (DENI, WILLIAM)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting #116 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/7/17. (sr, )
March 6, 2017 Filing 116 MOTION to Seal Docket Entry #114 by MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Amy Luria, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(LURIA, AMY)
March 6, 2017 Filing 115 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. re #98 MOTION Pursuant to Local Patent Rule 3.7 to Amend Noninfringement Contentions (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amy Luria (redacted), #2 Certificate of Service)(LURIA, AMY)
March 6, 2017 Filing 114 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. re #98 MOTION Pursuant to Local Patent Rule 3.7 to Amend Noninfringement Contentions (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amy Luria, #2 Exhibit 18)(LURIA, AMY)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
March 6, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #116 MOTION to Seal Docket Entry #114. Motion set for 4/3/2017 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, )
March 2, 2017 Filing 113 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to the Honorable Stanley R. Chesler, U.S.D.J.. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and Proposed Order)(DENI, WILLIAM)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting Mylan's Request for a seven day extension to submit a reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Mylan's Motion Pursuant to L. Pat. R. 3.7 to Amend Noninfringement Contentions until 3/6/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/24/17. (sr, )
February 24, 2017 Filing 111 Letter from Amy Luria re: extension of time to file reply papers. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LURIA, AMY)
February 21, 2017 Filing 110 BRIEF in Opposition filed by PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., WYETH LLC re #98 MOTION Pursuant to Local Patent Rule 3.7 to Amend Noninfringement Contentions (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bryan C. Diner, Esq., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit A-1, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit R, #21 Certificate of Service)(DENI, WILLIAM)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
February 14, 2017 Filing 109 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to Judge Waldor responding to Defendants' February 10 Letter re #107 Letter. (DENI, WILLIAM)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting #99 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/13/17. (sr, )
February 10, 2017 Filing 107 Letter from Jason B. Lattimore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(LATTIMORE, JASON)
February 10, 2017 Filing 106 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Cindy Chang to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-7643055.) (LATTIMORE, JASON)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 CONSENT ORDER permitting Cindy Chang to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/10/17. (sr, )
February 10, 2017 Pro Hac Vice counsel, CINDY CHANG, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (sr, )
February 9, 2017 Filing 104 Letter from Jason B. Lattimore Re Pro Hac Vice Application of Cindy Chang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason B. Lattimore, #2 Declaration of Cindy Chang, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(LATTIMORE, JASON)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER that Plaintiffs' Request for a 14 day extension to respond to theMylan Defendants' Motion to Amend Non-Infringement Contentions (ECF No. 98) is granted. Plaintiffs' Opposition to the Mylan Defendants' Motion to Amend Non-Infringement Contentions shall be filed by February 21, 2017, Mylan Defendants' Reply shall be filed by February 27, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/1/17. (sr, )
January 31, 2017 Filing 102 Letter from Plaintiffs Seeking an Extension of Time to Respond to the Mylan Defendants' Motion to Amend Non-Infringement Contentions. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(COOPER, LAUREN)
January 24, 2017 Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN BROPHY COOPER on behalf of PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., WYETH LLC (COOPER, LAUREN)
January 24, 2017 Filing 100 BRIEF in Support filed by MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. re #98 MOTION Pursuant to Local Patent Rule 3.7 to Amend Noninfringement Contentions (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amy Luria, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10, #10 Exhibit 11, #11 Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit 13, #13 Exhibit 14, #14 Exhibit 15, #15 Exhibit 16, #16 Exhibit 17)(LURIA, AMY)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
January 24, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #98 MOTION Pursuant to Local Patent Rule 3.7 to Amend Noninfringement Contentions , #99 MOTION to Seal Brief in Support of Motion Pursuant to L. Pat. R. 3.7 for Leave to Amend Noninfringement Contentions, and Declaration of Amy Luria, Esq. in Support of Motion Pursuant to L. Pat. R. 3.7 for Leave to Amend Noninfringement Contentions a. Motion set for 2/21/2017 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, )
January 23, 2017 Filing 99 MOTION to Seal Brief in Support of Motion Pursuant to L. Pat. R. 3.7 for Leave to Amend Noninfringement Contentions, and Declaration of Amy Luria, Esq. in Support of Motion Pursuant to L. Pat. R. 3.7 for Leave to Amend Noninfringement Contentions and Exhibits 1-3, 5-7, and 9-17 attached thereto by MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification, #3 Certificate of Service)(LURIA, AMY)
January 23, 2017 Filing 98 MOTION Pursuant to Local Patent Rule 3.7 to Amend Noninfringement Contentions by MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief (Redacted), #3 Declaration of Amy Luria (Redacted), #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 8, #6 Certificate of Service)(LURIA, AMY)
January 12, 2017 Filing 97 MARKMAN OPENING BRIEF - Joint Opening Markman Brief on Behalf of All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James F. Castner, Ph.D., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Declaration of Tyler Doh, Esq., #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit 11, #16 Exhibit 12, #17 Exhibit 13, #18 Exhibit 14, #19 Exhibit 15, #20 Exhibit 16)(LATTIMORE, JASON)
January 12, 2017 Filing 96 MARKMAN OPENING BRIEF of Plaintiffs Valeant Pharmaceuticals International, Inc., Salix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Progenics Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Wyeth LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bryan C. Diner, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Certificate of Service)(DENI, WILLIAM)
January 12, 2017 Filing 95 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jessica M. Lebeis, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-7585929.) (LOWER, J.)
January 12, 2017 Filing 94 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Kristi L. McIntyre, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-7585913.) (LOWER, J.)
January 12, 2017 Pro Hac Vice counsel, KRISTI L. MCINTYRE and JESSICA M. LEBEIS, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (sr, )
January 10, 2017 Filing 93 STATEMENT - Amended Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by ACTAVIS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(LATTIMORE, JASON)
January 4, 2017 Filing 92 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ACTAVIS LLC identifying Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. and Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. as Corporate Parent.. (LATTIMORE, JASON)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference, to be initiated by plaintiff, on 4/5/17 at 10:30 AM. Parties may contact chambers at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 12/12/16. (tjg, )
December 12, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 12/12/2016. (tjg, )
November 22, 2016 Filing 90 STATEMENT - Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., WYETH LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(DENI, WILLIAM)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting #86 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/18/16. (sr, )
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting #78 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/18/16. (sr, )
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting #75 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/18/16. (sr, )
October 21, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #86 MOTION to Seal Docket Entry #85. Motion set for 11/21/2016 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, )
October 20, 2016 Filing 86 MOTION to Seal Docket Entry #85 by MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Amy Luria, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(LURIA, AMY)
October 20, 2016 Filing 85 Certification of Deepro R. Mukerjee, Esq. on behalf of MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (LURIA, AMY)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
October 14, 2016 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by TYLER DOH on behalf of ACTAVIS LLC (DOH, TYLER)
October 14, 2016 Filing 83 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Molly R. Grammel to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-7416275.) (LATTIMORE, JASON)
October 14, 2016 Pro Hac Vice counsel, MOLLY R. GRAMMEL, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (sr, )
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 CONSENT ORDER re #81 Letter for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Molly R. Grammel, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 10/13/2016. (ek)
October 13, 2016 Filing 81 Letter from Jason B. Lattimore Enclosing Consent Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration)(LATTIMORE, JASON)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #64 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 10/11/16. (sr, )
October 6, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 10/6/2016. (tjg, )
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a teleconference, to be initiated by Plaintiff, on Thursday, October 6, 2016 at 4:30 PM. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 10/5/16. (tjg, )
October 5, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #78 MOTION to Seal Document #76 Letter . Motion set for 11/7/2016 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, )
October 4, 2016 Filing 78 MOTION to Seal Document #76 Letter by PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., WYETH LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of William P. Deni, Jr., #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(DENI, WILLIAM)
October 4, 2016 Filing 77 REDACTION to #76 Letter by PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., WYETH LLC. (DENI, WILLIAM)
October 3, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #75 MOTION to Seal Document #73 Letter . Motion set for 11/7/2016 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, )
September 30, 2016 Filing 76 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. regarding status of dispute about Mylan's ANDA product samples. (DENI, WILLIAM)
September 30, 2016 Filing 75 MOTION to Seal Document #73 Letter by ACTAVIS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(LATTIMORE, JASON)
September 30, 2016 Filing 74 REDACTION to #73 Letter by ACTAVIS LLC. (LATTIMORE, JASON)
September 30, 2016 Filing 73 Letter from Jason B. Lattimore Regarding Status of ANDA Product Sample Dispute as to Actavis. (LATTIMORE, JASON)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #53 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/20/16. (sr, )
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting #57 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/20/16. (sr, )
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #60 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/20/16. (sr, )
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #46 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/20/16. (sr, )
September 16, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 9/16/2016. (tjg, )
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER permitting Kristi L. McIntyre & Jessica M. Lebeis to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/13/16. (sr, )
September 13, 2016 Filing 67 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Consent Order, #2 Certification of William P. Deni, Jr., #3 Certification of Kristi L. McIntyre, Esq., #4 Certification of Jessica M. Lebeis, Esq.)(DENI, WILLIAM)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 TEXT ORDER: The Court will reschedule the 9/12/16 teleconference to 9/16/16 at 10:00am. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/12/16. (tjg, )
September 12, 2016 Filing 65 Exhibit to #62 Letter, #63 Letter by MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(LURIA, AMY)
September 12, 2016 Filing 64 MOTION to Seal Document #63 Letter by MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(LURIA, AMY)
September 12, 2016 Filing 63 Letter from Amy Luria re #58 Letter, #59 Letter. (LURIA, AMY)
September 12, 2016 Filing 62 Letter from Amy Luria re #58 Letter, #59 Letter. (LURIA, AMY) (Main Document 62 replaced on 9/12/2016) (tjg, ).
September 12, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #64 MOTION to Seal Document #63 Letter . Motion set for 10/17/2016 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, )
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a teleconference, to be initiated by Plaintiff, on Monday, September 12, 2016 at 3:00pm. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/9/16. (tjg, )
September 8, 2016 Filing 60 MOTION to Seal Document #59 Letter to Hon. Cathy Waldor and Exhibits 2 and 5 by PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., WYETH LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Counsel In Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(DENI, WILLIAM)
September 8, 2016 Filing 59 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to Judge Waldor regarding issues with production samples. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 5)(DENI, WILLIAM)
September 8, 2016 Filing 58 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to Judge Waldor regarding issues with production samples. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 [filed under seal], #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5 [filed under seal], #6 Exhibit 6)(DENI, WILLIAM)
September 8, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #60 MOTION to Seal Document #59 Letter to Hon. Cathy Waldor and Exhibits 2 and 5. Motion set for 10/3/2016 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, )
September 1, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #57 MOTION to Seal #55 Letter and Exhibits. Motion set for 10/3/2016 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, )
August 31, 2016 Filing 57 MOTION to Seal #55 Letter and Exhibits by ACTAVIS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(LATTIMORE, JASON)
August 31, 2016 Filing 56 REDACTION to #55 Letter by ACTAVIS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (s) A-E)(LATTIMORE, JASON)
August 31, 2016 Filing 55 Letter from Jason B. Lattimore re #50 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (s) A-E)(LATTIMORE, JASON)
August 31, 2016 Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 150 received as to Hidetada James Abe, Esq., receipt number TRE072422 (mps)
August 30, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #53 MOTION to Seal Document #50 Letter . Motion set for 10/3/2016 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, )
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #51 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to HIDETADA JAMES ABE, ESQ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 8/29/16. (DD, )
August 29, 2016 Filing 53 MOTION to Seal Document #50 Letter by PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., WYETH LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of William P. Deni, Jr., #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(DENI, WILLIAM)
August 29, 2016 Filing 52 REDACTION to #50 Letter by PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., WYETH LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibits 5-6, #6 Exhibit 7)(DENI, WILLIAM)
August 29, 2016 Filing 51 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Amy Luria, #2 Certification of Hidetada James Abe, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(LURIA, AMY)
August 29, 2016 Filing 50 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(DENI, WILLIAM)
August 29, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #51 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 10/3/2016 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, )
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Stipulated Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 8/23/16. (sr, )
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: scheduling a Telephone Conference on 12/12/2016 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor, that the close of Fact Discovery shall be 4/14/2017, the deadline for filing of dispositive motions shall be 10/12/2017; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 8/22/16. (sr, )
August 22, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #46 MOTION to Seal Document #44 Letter . Motion set for 9/19/2016 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, )
August 19, 2016 Filing 47 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. re: Proposed Stipulated Discovery Confidentiality Order. (Attachments: #1 Certification of William P. Deni, Jr., #2 Proposed Stipulated Discovery Confidentiality Order)(DENI, WILLIAM)
August 19, 2016 Filing 46 MOTION to Seal Document #44 Letter by PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., WYETH LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of William P. Deni, Jr., #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(DENI, WILLIAM)
August 19, 2016 Filing 45 REDACTION to #44 Letter by PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., WYETH LLC. (DENI, WILLIAM)
August 19, 2016 Filing 44 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. re #43 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-4)(DENI, WILLIAM)
August 12, 2016 Filing 43 Letter from Jason B. Lattimore Regarding Unresolved Scheduling Disputes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (s) 1-3)(LATTIMORE, JASON)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER consolidating cv-16-35, cv-15-8353 with cv-15-8180 for all purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/22/16. (sr, )
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/22/16. (sr, )
July 21, 2016 Filing 40 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. regarding HIPAA Qualified Protective Order. (Attachments: #1 Proposed HIPAA Qualified Protective Order, #2 Certification of William P. Deni, Jr. in Support of HIPAA Qualified Protective Order)(DENI, WILLIAM)
July 21, 2016 Filing 39 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J.. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and Proposed Order Consolidating Cases)(DENI, WILLIAM)
July 15, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 7/15/2016. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (tjg, )
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a teleconference, to be initiated by Valeant, on Friday, July 15, 2016 at 10:30 AM. This teleconference applies to 15-cv-8180, 15-cv-8353, and 16-cv-0035... So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/14/16. (tjg, )
June 27, 2016 Filing 37 Letter from Amy Luria. (LURIA, AMY)
June 27, 2016 Filing 36 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J.. (DENI, WILLIAM)
June 20, 2016 Filing 35 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J. re #34 Letter. (DENI, WILLIAM)
June 20, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 6/20/2016. (tjg, )
June 17, 2016 Filing 34 Letter from Amy Luria. (LURIA, AMY)
June 16, 2016 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 450, receipt number NEW029952 RE: Deepro R. Mukerjee, Lance Soderstrom, Stephanie M. Roberts. (sr, )
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a teleconference, to be initiated by Valeant, on Monday, June 20, 2016 at 12:30 PM. This teleconference applies to 15-cv-8180, 15-cv-8353, and 16-cv-0035.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 6/13/16. (tjg, )
June 10, 2016 Filing 32 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to Judge Waldor Seeking Leave to Consolidate Cases. (DENI, WILLIAM)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference with all parties, to be initiated by plaintiff, on 6/13/16 at 1:00 PM. Parties may contact chambers at (973) 776 7862.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 6/1/16. (tjg, )
May 31, 2016 Filing 30 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Megan Leinen Johns to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-7133846.) (LOWER, J.)
May 31, 2016 Filing 29 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Justin J. Hasford to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-7133840.) (LOWER, J.)
May 31, 2016 Pro Hac Vice counsel, JUSTIN J. HASFORD and MEGAN LEINEN JOHNS, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (sr, )
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CONSENT ORDER permitting Justin J. Hasford and Megan Leinen Johns to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 5/25/16. (sr, )
May 24, 2016 Filing 27 Letter from William P. Deni, Jr. to the Honorable Cathy L. Waldor, U.S.M.J.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Consent Order, #2 Certification of William P. Deni, Jr., #3 Certification of Justin J. Hasford, #4 Certification of Megan Leinen Johns)(DENI, WILLIAM)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice RE: Deepro R. Mukerjee, Lance Soderstrom, Stephanie M. Roberts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 5/24/16. (sr, )
May 24, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 6/20/2016 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, )
May 23, 2016 Filing 25 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 Certificate of Service)(LURIA, AMY)
May 23, 2016 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Amy Luria, #2 Certification of Deepro Mukerjee, #3 Certification of Lance Soderstrom, #4 Certification of Stephanie Roberts, #5 Certificate of Service, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(LURIA, AMY)
May 18, 2016 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL ANDREW HOLTMAN on behalf of PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC. (HOLTMAN, MICHAEL)
May 18, 2016 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by BRYAN C. DINER on behalf of PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC. (DINER, BRYAN)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CONSENT ORDER extending time for defendants Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Mylan Laboratories, Ltd. and Mylan Inc. to respond to the Complaint until 5/23/16. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 4/18/16. (sr, )
April 18, 2016 Answer Due Deadline Update - RE: #21 Order as to defts, MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD. The answer due date has been set for 5/23/16. (sr, )
April 15, 2016 Filing 20 Letter from Amy Luria re: extension of time to answer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LURIA, AMY)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CONSENT ORDER EXTENDING TIME to file a responsive answer, move orotherwise plead with respect to the Complaint no later than April 22, 2016 as to Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Laboratories Ltd., and Mylan Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 03/23/2016. (ek)
March 23, 2016 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #19 Order, submitted by MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 04/22/2016. (ek)
March 22, 2016 Filing 18 Letter from Amy Luria re: extension of time to answer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LURIA, AMY)
March 7, 2016 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #17 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 3/23/16. (sr, )
March 6, 2016 Filing 17 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (LURIA, AMY)
March 6, 2016 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by AMY DANIELLE LURIA on behalf of All Defendants (LURIA, AMY)
March 4, 2016 Filing 15 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney ELVIN ESTEVES terminated. (ESTEVES, ELVIN)
March 2, 2016 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM P. DENI, JR on behalf of All Plaintiffs (DENI, WILLIAM)
February 18, 2016 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., WYETH LLC, PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD. served on 2/17/2016, answer due 3/9/2016. (ESTEVES, ELVIN)
February 18, 2016 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., WYETH LLC, PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (ESTEVES, ELVIN)
February 18, 2016 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., WYETH LLC, PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. served on 2/17/2016, answer due 3/9/2016. (ESTEVES, ELVIN)
February 18, 2016 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., WYETH LLC, PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. MYLAN INC. served on 2/17/2016, answer due 3/9/2016. (ESTEVES, ELVIN)
February 4, 2016 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., filed by VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., WYETH LLC, PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(ESTEVES, ELVIN)
January 28, 2016 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note the AO120 Form attached to docket entry 8 filed by the Clerk's office on 1/28/2016 was docketed in error. Please disregard. (gl)
January 27, 2016 Filing 8 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (gl)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER REALLOCATING AND REASSIGNING CASE. Case reallocated to Newark and reassigned to Judge Stanley R. Chesler and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor for all further proceedings. Judge Michael A. Shipp, Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 11/25/2015. (dm )
November 24, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael A. Shipp: Pursuant to Local Patent Rule 1.5 Patent Pilot Project, case shall be reassigned to a designated patent judge. (NR )
November 20, 2015 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by J. BRUGH LOWER on behalf of All Plaintiffs (LOWER, J.)
November 20, 2015 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *PATRICK SEILER* (mps)
November 19, 2015 Filing 4 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (mps)
November 19, 2015 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WYETH LLC identifying PFIZER INC. as Corporate Parent.. (mps)
November 19, 2015 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (mps)
November 19, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 6769204), filed by VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., WYETH LLC, PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Certification, #7 Statement)(mps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC. et al v. MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL LLOYD BINNS
Represented By: AMY DANIELLE LURIA
Represented By: JONATHAN ROTENBERG
Represented By: ALISSA MARIE PACCHIOLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL LLOYD BINNS
Represented By: AMY DANIELLE LURIA
Represented By: JONATHAN ROTENBERG
Represented By: ALISSA MARIE PACCHIOLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS LLC
Represented By: TYLER DOH
Represented By: JASON B. LATTIMORE
Represented By: HOWARD J. SCHWARTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD.
Represented By: MICHAEL LLOYD BINNS
Represented By: AMY DANIELLE LURIA
Represented By: JONATHAN ROTENBERG
Represented By: ALISSA MARIE PACCHIOLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES E. LIPSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALEANT PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL ANDREW HOLTMAN
Represented By: BRYAN C. DINER
Represented By: LAUREN BROPHY COOPER
Represented By: WILLIAM P. DENI, JR.
Represented By: CYMETRA MONIQUE WILLIAMS(do not use)
Represented By: J. BRUGH LOWER
Represented By: LEIGH A. DECOTIIS
Represented By: ELVIN ESTEVES (Do not use or delete)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROGENICS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL ANDREW HOLTMAN
Represented By: BRYAN C. DINER
Represented By: LAUREN BROPHY COOPER
Represented By: WILLIAM P. DENI, JR.
Represented By: CYMETRA MONIQUE WILLIAMS(do not use)
Represented By: J. BRUGH LOWER
Represented By: LEIGH A. DECOTIIS
Represented By: ELVIN ESTEVES (Do not use or delete)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SALIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL ANDREW HOLTMAN
Represented By: BRYAN C. DINER
Represented By: LAUREN BROPHY COOPER
Represented By: WILLIAM P. DENI, JR.
Represented By: CYMETRA MONIQUE WILLIAMS(do not use)
Represented By: J. BRUGH LOWER
Represented By: LEIGH A. DECOTIIS
Represented By: ELVIN ESTEVES (Do not use or delete)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WYETH LLC
Represented By: LAUREN BROPHY COOPER
Represented By: WILLIAM P. DENI, JR.
Represented By: CYMETRA MONIQUE WILLIAMS(do not use)
Represented By: J. BRUGH LOWER
Represented By: LEIGH A. DECOTIIS
Represented By: ELVIN ESTEVES (Do not use or delete)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WYETH
Represented By: LAUREN BROPHY COOPER
Represented By: WILLIAM P. DENI, JR.
Represented By: CYMETRA MONIQUE WILLIAMS(do not use)
Represented By: J. BRUGH LOWER
Represented By: LEIGH A. DECOTIIS
Represented By: ELVIN ESTEVES (Do not use or delete)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?