ADP, LLC v. LYNCH
Plaintiff: ADP, LLC
Defendant: JORDAN LYNCH
Counter_claimant: JORDAN LYNCH
Counter_defendant: ADP, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv01053
Filed: February 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Essex
Presiding Judge: Mark Falk
Presiding Judge: William J. Martini
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 188 OPINION. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 4/21/20. (gh, )
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 173 OPINION. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 4/2/19. (gh, )
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 165 OPINION. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 3/12/19. (gh, )
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 OPINION. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 6/25/18. (gh, )
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 OPINION. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 4/17/18. (gh, )
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 OPINION. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 2/26/18. (gh, )
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 OPINION. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 7/17/17. (gh, )
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 OPINION. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 4/24/17. (gh, )
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 OPINION. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 9/8/16. (gh, )
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 OPINION. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 6/30/16. (gh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ADP, LLC v. LYNCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADP, LLC
Represented By: HARRIS SAMUEL FREIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JORDAN LYNCH
Represented By: JOHN H. SCHMIDT, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: JORDAN LYNCH
Represented By: JOHN H. SCHMIDT, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: ADP, LLC
Represented By: HARRIS SAMUEL FREIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?