ROSA GOMEZ v. H&M INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORTATION, INC. et al
Plaintiff: CARMEN ROSA GOMEZ
Defendant: H&M INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORTATION, INC., NORFOLK SOUTHERN CORPORATION, CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION, TECHNICAL SERVICES INTERNATIONAL, MI-JACK PRODUCTS, INC., HOIST LIFTRUCK MANUFACTURING, LLC., FEDEX FREIGHT, INC., GENERAL CABLE INDUSTRIES, INC. and PMX INDUSTRIES, INC.
Case Number: 2:2017cv00231
Filed: January 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Hudson
Presiding Judge: Joseph A. Dickson
Presiding Judge: Jose L. Linares
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 319 OPINION. Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 9/30/21. (cm, )
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 298 OPINION. Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 1/25/2021. (sm)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 9/7/17. (cm, )
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 OPINION. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 4/24/17. (sr, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROSA GOMEZ v. H&M INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORTATION, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARMEN ROSA GOMEZ
Represented By: STEPHEN JOHN LIAKAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H&M INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM EDWARD MARSALA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORFOLK SOUTHERN CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TECHNICAL SERVICES INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: THADDEUS J. HUBERT, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MI-JACK PRODUCTS, INC.
Represented By: THADDEUS J. HUBERT, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOIST LIFTRUCK MANUFACTURING, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDEX FREIGHT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL CABLE INDUSTRIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PMX INDUSTRIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?