PINCKNEY v. ESSEX PROBATION CHILD SUPPORT UNIT
Plaintiff: DAVID H PINCKNEY
Defendant: ESSEX PROBATION CHILD SUPPORT UNIT and JUDGE DONALD KESSLER
Case Number: 2:2017cv03794
Filed: May 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Essex
Presiding Judge: Michael A. Hammer
Presiding Judge: Esther Salas
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 5/22/18. (cm, )
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 LETTER-ORDER denying 29 Motion for Reconsideration re 27 Order on Motion for Default Judgment, ; denying 30 Motion for Summary Judgment; etc. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 3/1/18. (DD, )
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 LETTER-ORDER denying 23 Motion for Default Judgment ; denying 24 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 10/18/17. (DD, ) N/M
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 LETTER-ORDER denying w/out prejudice 15 Motion for Default Judgment ; denying w/out prejudice 18 Motion for Default Judgment to Plaintiff re-filing any such motion(s); etc. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 9/15/17. (DD, ) N/M
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PINCKNEY v. ESSEX PROBATION CHILD SUPPORT UNIT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID H PINCKNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESSEX PROBATION CHILD SUPPORT UNIT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUDGE DONALD KESSLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?