CREDITORS RELIEF LLC v. UNITED DEBT SETTLEMENT, LLC et al
Plaintiff: CREDITORS RELIEF LLC
Defendant: MARCEL BLUVSTEIN, UNITED DEBT SETTLEMENT, LLC, JOHN DOE ENTITIES (1-10), EVERYTHING IS IN STOCK, LLC, JANE DOE (1-5) and MARCEL BLUSKIN
Case Number: 2:2017cv07474
Filed: September 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Bergen
Presiding Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Referring Judge: Cathy L Waldor
2 Judge: William H Walls
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 40 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney SUZANNE IAZZETTA terminated.. (IAZZETTA, SUZANNE)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez for all further proceedings. Judge William H. Walls no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 7/26/2019. (ti, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 38 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by MARCEL BLUVSTEIN, EVERYTHING IS IN STOCK, LLC, UNITED DEBT SETTLEMENT, LLC re #33 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss (GELLER, MELISSA)
June 13, 2019 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by CREDITORS RELIEF LLC re #33 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Certification Cert of Suzanne Iazzetta, #2 Exhibit Ex A - EIIS NJ Registration, #3 Exhibit Ex B - EIIS Website, #4 Exhibit Ex C - Google Review)(IAZZETTA, SUZANNE)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff has failed to file a timely opposition to the pending Motion to Dismiss (DE 33). The briefing schedule for the Motion to Dismiss is extended as follows: Plaintiffs opposition is due 6/13/19, Defendants reply is due 6/27/19. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 5/30/19. (tjg, )
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference, to be initiated by plaintiff, on 11/18/19 at 4pm. Parties may contact chambers at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 5/2/19. (tjg, )
May 2, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 5/2/2019. (tjg, )
May 2, 2019 Re: Motion DE #33 . Chambers will notify counsel if oral argument is necessary. (dam, )
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference, to be initiated by plaintiff, on 5/2/19 at 1pm. Parties may contact chambers at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 5/1/19. (tjg, )
April 30, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss by MARCEL BLUVSTEIN, EVERYTHING IS IN STOCK, LLC, UNITED DEBT SETTLEMENT, LLC. Responses due by 5/21/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief in support, #2 Declaration of Melissa S. Geller in Support, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Text of Proposed Order, #9 Certificate of Service)(GELLER, MELISSA)
January 31, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 1/31/2019. (tjg, )
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 TEXT ORDER: As to RFP I Defendant Bluvstein to submit in declaration the reason his address was misstated. RFP II- Bluvstein to submit declaration stating he did not personally solicit debt relief clients. RFP III- Bluvstein to submit declaration that he personally did not have any correspondence with potential debt relief clients. RFP IV-Bluvstein to submit a declaration that he personally did not make calls to solicit debt relief clients at any NJ telephone numbers. RFP V - was resolved between the parties. RFP VI -was resolved between the parties. RFP VII- is moot without prejudice. RFP VIII-is resolved between the parties. RFP IX- is moot without prejudice. RFP X- Amended to have defendant submit a declaration responding to the percentage of NJ clients as against the number of total clients. RFP XI- UDS will submit a declaration describing the types of marketing it uses, and how many NJ clients were solicited from formation up to the date of the filing of the complaint. RFP XII- Previously answered but defendant to follow up. RFP XII- is moot without prejudice. RFP XIV- Defendant will confirm that this was previously answered. RFP XV-Defendant to provide information from the date of the formation of UDS up to the date the complaint was filed as regards marketing in NJ, or targeted to NJ. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/6/18. (tjg, )
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference, to be initiated by plaintiff, on 1/31/19 at 10:30am. Parties may contact chambers at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/6/18. (tjg, )
November 6, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Status Conference held on 11/6/2018. (tjg, )
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an In-Person Status conference on 11/6/18 at 10:30am before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor in courtroom 4C. Please contact chambers at (973) 776 7862 with any questions or concerns. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/1/18. (tjg, )
November 1, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 11/1/2018. (tjg, )
September 6, 2018 Filing 29 Letter from Plaintiff regarding Unresolved Issues. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(ZEFUTIE, JOHN)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's submission to the joint letter shall be delivered to Defendants by August 31, 2018 and submitted to the Court by September 6, 2018.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 8/28/18. (tjg, )
August 27, 2018 Filing 27 Letter from Plaintiff re #26 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PL email to D, #2 Exhibit B - D response to P email, #3 Exhibit C - P response to D response)(IAZZETTA, SUZANNE)
August 27, 2018 Filing 26 Letter from Melissa S. Geller to Magistrate Judge Waldor. (GELLER, MELISSA)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ORDER: Defendants' time to file a responsive pleading to the complaint shall be stayed pending the resolution of the jurisdictional issue.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 8/8/18. (tjg, )
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference, to be initiated by plaintiff, on 11/1/18 at 3:00 PM. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 9) is terminated pending the completion of jurisdictional discovery. Parties may contact chambers at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 8/8/18. (tjg, )
August 8, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 8/8/2018. (tjg, )
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER: At the request of the parties, the telephone conference scheduled for 8/2/18 is adjourned to 8/8/18 at 11:00 AM. Parties may contact chambers at (973) 776-7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 8/2/18. (tjg, )
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference, to be initiated by plaintiff, on 8/2/18 at 12:45 PM. Parties may contact chambers at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/2/18. (tjg, )
July 2, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 7/2/2018. (tjg, )
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference, to be initiated by plaintiff, on 7/2/18 at 11:30 AM. Parties may contact chambers at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 6/5/18. (tjg, )
June 5, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 6/5/2018. (tjg, )
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference, to be initiated by plaintiff, on 6/5/18 at 2:00 PM. Parties may contact chambers at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 5/3/18. (tjg, )
April 30, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 4/30/2018. (tjg, )
April 14, 2018 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CREDITORS RELIEF LLC re 16 Order, Jurisdictional Discovery upon United Debt Settlement (IAZZETTA, SUZANNE)
April 14, 2018 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CREDITORS RELIEF LLC re 16 Order, Jurisdictional Discovery upon upon Marcel Bluvstein (IAZZETTA, SUZANNE)
February 13, 2018 Filing 17 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by MARCEL BLUVSTEIN, EVERYTHING IS IN STOCK, LLC, UNITED DEBT SETTLEMENT, LLC re #9 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Marcel Bluvstein, #2 Certificate of Service)(ZEFUTIE, JOHN)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference, to be initiated by plaintiff, on 4/30/18 at 3:15pm. Initial Scheduling Order: Discovery shall be limited to jurisdictional issues. Rule 26: 2/21/18; Service of initial discovery 25 interrogatories and document requests: 4/15/18; Response: 6/15/18. Parties may contact chambers at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 2/7/18. (tjg, )
February 7, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/7/2018. (tjg, )
February 7, 2018 #14 MOTION FOR DISCOVERY [chmbrs. will notify counsel if oral argument is necessary] (DD, )
February 6, 2018 Filing 15 BRIEF in Support filed by CREDITORS RELIEF LLC re #14 Cross MOTION for Discovery Expedited Jurisdictional Discovery or, alternatively, to Transfer Venue, #9 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) (and in opposition to Motion to Dismiss) (Attachments: #1 Certification of Suzanne Iazzetta in Support of Cross Motion and in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A - NY SOS filing, #3 Exhibit B - Bizapedia listing, #4 Exhibit C - EIIS NJ Registration, #5 Exhibit D - Answer One location information, #6 Exhibit E - EIIS Website, #7 Exhibit F - Google Review, #8 Certification of Michael Lupolover in Support of Cross Motion and in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss)(IAZZETTA, SUZANNE)
February 6, 2018 Filing 14 Cross MOTION for Discovery Expedited Jurisdictional Discovery or, alternatively, to Transfer Venue by CREDITORS RELIEF LLC. (IAZZETTA, SUZANNE)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Resetting Hearing on Motion #9 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) : Motion reset for 2/20/2018 before Judge William H. Walls, opposition due 2/6/18, reply due 2/13/18. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court.. Signed by Judge William H. Walls on 1/5/18. (DD, )
January 3, 2018 Filing 12 Letter from Counsel for Creditors Relief requesting Extension of Dates for Motion to Dismiss re #9 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Extending Dates of Motion to Dismiss)(IAZZETTA, SUZANNE)
December 24, 2017 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CREDITORS RELIEF LLC. MARCEL BLUVSTEIN waiver sent on 10/3/2017, answer due 12/18/2017; EVERYTHING IS IN STOCK, LLC waiver sent on 10/3/2017, answer due 12/18/2017; UNITED DEBT SETTLEMENT, LLC waiver sent on 10/3/2017, answer due 12/18/2017. (IAZZETTA, SUZANNE)
December 19, 2017 Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6). Motion set for 1/16/2018 before Judge William H. Walls. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ek)
December 19, 2017 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (tjg, )
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor in courtroom 4C on 2/7/18 at 11:00 AM. Local counsel must be present. Parties are to submit a Joint Discovery Plan to chambers via email to CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 12/19/17. (tjg, )
December 18, 2017 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) by MARCEL BLUVSTEIN, EVERYTHING IS IN STOCK, LLC, UNITED DEBT SETTLEMENT, LLC. Responses due by 1/2/2018 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John J. Zefutie, Jr., #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of John J. Zefutie, Jr., #3 Declaration of Marcel Bluvstein, #4 Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(ZEFUTIE, JOHN)
December 5, 2017 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #7 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by EVERYTHING IS IN STOCK, LLC, UNITED DEBT SETTLEMENT, LLC, MARCEL BLUVSTEIN has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/18/17. (DD, )
December 4, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN J. ZEFUTIE, JR on behalf of MARCEL BLUVSTEIN, EVERYTHING IS IN STOCK, LLC, UNITED DEBT SETTLEMENT, LLC (ZEFUTIE, JOHN)
December 4, 2017 Filing 7 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to United Debt Settlement, LLC d/b/a United Settlement (United Debt Settlement), Everything Is In Stock, LLC, d/b/a Elite Restaurant Equipment, d/b/a Kitchen Eporium (Everything is In Stock), and Marcel Bluvstein.. (GELLER, MELISSA)
December 4, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by MELISSA S. GELLER on behalf of MARCEL BLUVSTEIN, EVERYTHING IS IN STOCK, LLC, UNITED DEBT SETTLEMENT, LLC (GELLER, MELISSA)
October 11, 2017 Filing 5 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (th, )
October 3, 2017 Filing 4 AO121 Copyright Form filed. (jr)
September 26, 2017 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MARCEL BLUVSTEIN, EVERYTHING IS IN STOCK, LLC, UNITED DEBT SETTLEMENT, LLC Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *John Reilly* (jr)
September 26, 2017 Case assigned to Judge William H. Walls and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (jr)
September 26, 2017 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information - Parties are to be entered in all CAPITAL letters . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jr)
September 26, 2017 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CREDITORS RELIEF LLC identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (IAZZETTA, SUZANNE)
September 26, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Marcel Bluvstein, Everything is in Stock, LLC, JANE DOE (1-5), JOHN DOE ENTITIES (1-10), United Debt Settlement, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8114049) with JURY DEMAND, filed by CREDITORS RELIEF LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(IAZZETTA, SUZANNE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CREDITORS RELIEF LLC v. UNITED DEBT SETTLEMENT, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARCEL BLUVSTEIN
Represented By: JOHN J. ZEFUTIE, JR.
Represented By: MELISSA S. GELLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED DEBT SETTLEMENT, LLC
Represented By: JOHN J. ZEFUTIE, JR.
Represented By: MELISSA S. GELLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE ENTITIES (1-10)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVERYTHING IS IN STOCK, LLC
Represented By: JOHN J. ZEFUTIE, JR.
Represented By: MELISSA S. GELLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE (1-5)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARCEL BLUSKIN
Represented By: JOHN J. ZEFUTIE, JR.
Represented By: MELISSA S. GELLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CREDITORS RELIEF LLC
Represented By: SUZANNE IAZZETTA
Represented By: DAVID GRAFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?