BRADY v. DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL BANK TRUST COMPANY
Plaintiff: ELENA V. BRADY
Defendant: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL BANK TRUST COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2018cv03825
Filed: March 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Union
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE and without costs against any party. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 11/29/2018. (sm)
November 27, 2018 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL BANK TRUST COMPANY. (KURTZ, MITCHELL)
November 27, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by MITCHELL SCOTT KURTZ on behalf of DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL BANK TRUST COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KURTZ, MITCHELL)
November 6, 2018 Filing 6 Notice of Call for dismissal Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(m). Motion set for 11/26/2018 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (aa, )
August 21, 2018 Filing 4 Letter. (KURTZ, MITCHELL)
August 17, 2018 Filing 5 Defendants' Notice of Withdrawal of Motion. (sm)
July 27, 2018 Filing 3 CLERK'S LETTER: Transmittal of USM 285 Forms. (sms)
July 27, 2018 COMPLAINT against DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL BANK TRUST COMPANY, IFP GRANTED, filed by ELENA V. BRADY.(sms)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER, that Plaintiff be permitted to proceed without prepayment of fees or costs, and the Clerk shall filed the Complaint without prepayment of the filing fee; the Clerk shall issue a summons and the U.S. Marshal shall serve a copy of the complaint, summons, and this order upon Defendants as directed by Plaintiff. All costs of service shall be advanced by the United States; etc. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 07/27/2018. (sms)(n/m)
March 20, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Application IFP, #3 Additional attachment to IFP, #4 Exhibit A-Mortgage, #5 Exhibit B- Assignment of Judgment)(sms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRADY v. DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL BANK TRUST COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELENA V. BRADY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL BANK TRUST COMPANY
Represented By: MITCHELL SCOTT KURTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?