DIXON MILLS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC v. RGD HOLDING COMPANY, LLC et al
Plaintiff: DIXON MILLS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC
Defendant: GREG BERGER, RMPC DIXON, LLC, PROSPECT CAPITAL GROUP, LLC, RGD HOLDING COMPANY, LLC, THE SCHONBRAUN MCCANN GROUP LLP, RMC MEZZANINE COMP ANY, LLC,, MATTHEW MCGRATH, URS CORPORATION, DAVID PARISIER, BRUCE PETERSON, TIMOTHY M JONES, GOLDENTREE INSITE 72"d ST LLC, BARRY RITZHOLZ, ROBIN STEINER, MARK DURNO, RMC GTIS DIXON, LLC, ROBERT MARTIN COMPANY, LLC, RMR RESIDENTIAL REALTY, LLC, JOHN DOE 1-20, GOLDENTREE INSITE 72nd ST LLC and ABC CORP. 1-20
Case Number: 2:2018cv11927
Filed: July 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Hudson
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2018 ***Civil Case Terminated. (cm, )
August 16, 2018 Filing 15 Transmittal Letter for remanded case to Hudson County Administration Building595 Newark AvenueJersey City, NJ 07306 State No: HUD-L-004277-16. Mailed certified copy of the Order remanding case. (cm, )
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REMANDING this case to the Superior Court New Jersey, Hudson County. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 8/16/18. (cm, )
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting voluntary withdrawal of Count XI to the Amended Complaint, without prejudice and without costs. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 8/15/2018. (ld, )
August 2, 2018 Filing 12 Letter from Counsel to Plaintiff Dixon Mills Condominium Association Inc. re #11 Letter, #10 Letter,. (ESTIS, DENNIS)
August 1, 2018 Filing 11 Letter. (RIGGIOLA, LORYN)
August 1, 2018 Filing 10 Letter from Counsel for Goldentree Insite 72Street LLC re #8 Notice (Other), #9 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Fiest Amended Complaint Excerpt, #2 Exhibit 1st Amendment to First Amended Complaint Excerpt, #3 Exhibit Answer to Complaint Excerpt, #4 Exhibit Answer to Complaint Excerpt, #5 Exhibit Answer to Complaint Excerpt)(WEINER, STEVEN)
July 31, 2018 Filing 9 Letter re #8 Notice (Other),. (WEINER, STEVEN)
July 31, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE by DIXON MILLS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Statement Letter to Judge Arleo in Support of Notice of Voluntary Withdrawal of Count XI, #2 Text of Proposed Order Remanding Action to State Court)(ESTIS, DENNIS)
July 30, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by ELYSE HANA WOLFF on behalf of DIXON MILLS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC (WOLFF, ELYSE)
July 30, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DIXON MILLS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (ESTIS, DENNIS)
July 26, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RMR RESIDENTIAL REALTY, LLC identifying RMR Residential Realty, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (MCANDREW, MARTIN)
July 26, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by MARTIN J. MCANDREW on behalf of RMR RESIDENTIAL REALTY, LLC (MCANDREW, MARTIN)
July 24, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GOLDENTREE INSITE 72nd ST LLC. (WEINER, STEVEN)
July 24, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (JB, )
July 23, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (jr)
July 23, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTIAN M. SCHEUERMAN on behalf of GREG BERGER, DAVID PARISIER, ROBIN STEINER (SCHEUERMAN, CHRISTIAN)
July 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GOLDENTREE INSITE 72"d ST LLC from SUPERIOR COURT LAW DIVISION HUDSON COUNTY, case number HUD-L-4277-16. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8899236), filed by GOLDENTREE INSITE 72"d ST LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(WEINER, STEVEN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DIXON MILLS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC v. RGD HOLDING COMPANY, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREG BERGER
Represented By: CHRISTIAN M. SCHEUERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RMPC DIXON, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROSPECT CAPITAL GROUP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RGD HOLDING COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: PETER JOHN SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE SCHONBRAUN MCCANN GROUP LLP
Represented By: ROBERT A. BERNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RMC MEZZANINE COMP ANY, LLC,
Represented By: PETER JOHN SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW MCGRATH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: URS CORPORATION
Represented By: LORYN P. RIGGIOLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID PARISIER
Represented By: CHRISTIAN M. SCHEUERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRUCE PETERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY M JONES
Represented By: PETER JOHN SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOLDENTREE INSITE 72"d ST LLC
Represented By: STEVEN ALLEN WEINER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARRY RITZHOLZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBIN STEINER
Represented By: CHRISTIAN M. SCHEUERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK DURNO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RMC GTIS DIXON, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT MARTIN COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: PETER JOHN SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RMR RESIDENTIAL REALTY, LLC
Represented By: MARTIN J. MCANDREW
Represented By: GLEN D. KIMBALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOLDENTREE INSITE 72nd ST LLC
Represented By: STEVEN ALLEN WEINER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORP. 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIXON MILLS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC
Represented By: ELYSE HANA WOLFF
Represented By: DENNIS ESTIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?