DIABATE V. NIELSEN, ET AL.
Petitioner: Ansoumane DIABATE
Respondent: KIRSTJEN NEILSON, JOHN TSOUKARIS, ALFARO ORTIZ and RONALD D. VITIELLO
Case Number: 2:2018cv12502
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Essex
Presiding Judge: Esther Salas
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that Defendants-Respondents are enjoined and prohibited from removing or causing the removal from the United States of Plaintiff-Petitioner Ansoumane Diabate; that removal of Plaintiff-Petitioner is stayed and shall not proceed; that Defendants-Respondents shall immediately release Plaintiff-Petitioner from detention on his personal recognizance pending the Court's resolution of his habeas petition; that this Order shall remain in full force and effect until further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 8/9/2018. (sm)
August 9, 2018 Filing 4 United States' RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by KIRSTJEN NEILSON, ALFARO ORTIZ, JOHN TSOUKARIS, RONALD D. VITIELLO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(DAUENHEIMER, DAVID) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/10/2018) (sm, ).
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that Defendants-Respondents are hereby enjoined and prohibited from removing or causing the removal from the United States of Plaintiff-Petitioner Ansoumane Diabate; that removal of Plaintiff-Petitioner Ansoumane Diabate is hereby stayed and shall not proceed; that Defendants-Respondents are enjoined and prohibited from transferring or causing the transfer of Plaintiff-Petitioner Ansoumane Diabate from the jurisdiction of the Newark Field Office of the Immigration and Customs Enforcement Office of Enforcement and Removal Operations; this Order shall remain in full force and effect until further order of the Court; that Defendants-Respondents shall file an opposition brief by 12:00 p.m. on 8/9/2018; that the Court will hold an in-person status conference at a date to be determined. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 8/7/2018, etc. (sm)
August 7, 2018 Filing 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Esther Salas: Hearing on the petitioner's application for a TRO held on 8/7/2018. Ordered the petitioners removal from the U.S.A. is hereby stayed and petitioner to remain detained in I.C.E. custody in Newark. Ordered govts, opposition to be filed by noon on 8/9/2018. (Court Reporter Mary Jo Monteleone) (ps, )
August 7, 2018 Judge Esther Salas added. (eu, )
August 7, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0312-8937383.), filed by Ansoumane DIABATE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet, #2 Certification Disclosure statement, #3 Supplement Motion for temporary restraining order and stay of removal, #4 Brief Memorandum of law in support of temporary restraining order and stay of removal, #5 Exhibit Index and exhibits in support of temporary restraining order and stay of removal, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed temporary restraining order and stay of removal)(BOAZ, MATTHEW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DIABATE V. NIELSEN, ET AL.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ansoumane DIABATE
Represented By: MATTHEW SINCLAIR BOAZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: KIRSTJEN NEILSON
Represented By: DAVID EDWARD DAUENHEIMER
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOHN TSOUKARIS
Represented By: DAVID EDWARD DAUENHEIMER
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ALFARO ORTIZ
Represented By: DAVID EDWARD DAUENHEIMER
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: RONALD D. VITIELLO
Represented By: DAVID EDWARD DAUENHEIMER
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?