RODRIGUEZ DEAN v. SESSIONS et al
Petitioner: JOSE RODRIGUEZ DEAN
Respondent: JAMES MCHENRY and JEFF SESSIONS
Case Number: 2:2018cv13030
Filed: August 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. Motion set for 11/19/2018 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (gl, )
October 17, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint by JOSE RODRIGUEZ DEAN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Complaint)(BERTOLLINI, SIMONE)
September 24, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINA PETERSEN GREER on behalf of JAMES MCHENRY, JEFF SESSIONS (GREER, CHRISTINA)
August 21, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to JAMES MCHENRY, JEFF SESSIONS. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr)
August 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JAMES MCHENRY, JEFF SESSIONS ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8968802), filed by JOSE RODRIGUEZ DEAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(BERTOLLINI, SIMONE)
August 21, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RODRIGUEZ DEAN v. SESSIONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JAMES MCHENRY
Represented By: CHRISTINA PETERSEN GREER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JEFF SESSIONS
Represented By: CHRISTINA PETERSEN GREER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JOSE RODRIGUEZ DEAN
Represented By: SIMONE BERTOLLINI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?