NELSON v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: LINDA A NELSON
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Case Number: 2:2018cv13361
Filed: August 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jose L Linares
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LINDA A NELSON. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY served on 9/19/2018, answer due 11/19/2018. (WLADYKA, AGNES)
September 11, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sms)
September 11, 2018 Filing 6 Letter from plaintiff's attorney. (WLADYKA, AGNES)
September 10, 2018 Filing 5 CLERK'S LETTER: Transmittal of USM 285 Forms. (sms)
September 10, 2018 COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, IFP GRANTED, filed by LINDA A NELSON.(sms)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ON APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES; Plaintiff's application to proceed without prepayment of fees is GRANTED; The clerk is ordered to file the complaint; The Clerk shall issue a summons and the U.S. Marshal serve a copy of the complaint, summons and this order upon the defendant(s) as directed by the plaintiff(s). All costs of service shall be advanced by the United States. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 09/10/2018. (sms)
September 7, 2018 Filing 3 APPLICATION to proceed IN FORMA PAUPERIS by LINDA A NELSON. (WLADYKA, AGNES)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis; the Court shall administratively terminate this case until such time as this Court receives a complete application to proceed in forma pauperis or until Plaintiff pays the $400 filing fee; If Plaintiff wishes to reopen this case, she shall notify the Court in writing, addressed to the Clerk of the Court, within 30 days of the date of entry of this Order; the Clerk shall mark this matter closed; etc. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 09/04/2018. (sms, )
August 31, 2018 Chief Judge Jose L. Linares added. (eu, )
August 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT received against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, filed by LINDA A NELSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Application IFP)(WLADYKA, AGNES) Modified on 8/31/2018 (sms, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NELSON v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA A NELSON
Represented By: AGNES S. WLADYKA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?