APARICIO-GARCIA v. NIELSEN
Plaintiff: SOCRATES APARICIO-GARCIA
Defendant: KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, RONALD D. VITIELLO, ORLANDO RODRIGUEZ and JOHN TSOUKARIS
Case Number: 2:2018cv13460
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 Filing 5 RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by All Defendants.(SIMUNOVICH, DAVID)
September 20, 2018 Filing 4 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN terminated. Attorney DAVID V. SIMUNOVICH for KIRSTJEN NIELSEN,DAVID V. SIMUNOVICH for ORLANDO RODRIGUEZ,DAVID V. SIMUNOVICH for JOHN TSOUKARIS,DAVID V. SIMUNOVICH for RONALD D. VITIELLO added.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SIMUNOVICH, DAVID)
September 20, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas document number #2 filed by MATTHEW BOAZ on 09/06/2018 was submitted incorrectly as EXHIBITS. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE RESPONS USING EXHIBIT to document under Other Filings-Other Documents. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (ek)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO ANSWER: This Court has examined the Petition and determined that dismissal of Petitioner's challenge to his detention prior to submission of ananswer and the record is not warranted; The Clerk of the Court shall forward a copy of the Petition and this Order to Chief, Civil Division, United States Attorney's Office, at the following email address: USANJHabeasCases@usdoj.gov; Within 45 days after the date of entry of this Order, Respondent shall electronically file a full and complete answer to said Petition, which responds to the factual and legal allegations of the Petition, etc.; Petitioner may file and serve a reply in support of the Petition within 30 days after the answer is filed; Within 7 days after any change in Petitioner's custody or immigration status, be it release or otherwise, Respondents shall electronically file a written notice of the same with the Clerk of the Court, etc. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 09/12/2018. (ek, )
September 17, 2018 A copy of the Petition and this Order served upon the Warden of Elizabeth Detention Center by regular mail; A copy of the Order sent to Petitioner by regular mail. (ek)
September 6, 2018 Filing 2 RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by SOCRATES APARICIO-GARCIA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit D pt 2, #2 Exhibit Exhibit D pt 3, #3 Exhibit Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit Exhibit F, #5 Exhibit Exhibit G)(BOAZ, MATTHEW)
September 4, 2018 Judge Madeline Cox Arleo added. (eu, )
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0312-8994564.), filed by SOCRATES APARICIO-GARCIA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Brief Preliminary statement in support of petition for writ of habeas corpus, #3 Exhibit Exh A, #4 Exhibit Exh B, #5 Exhibit Exh C)(BOAZ, MATTHEW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: APARICIO-GARCIA v. NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOCRATES APARICIO-GARCIA
Represented By: MATTHEW SINCLAIR BOAZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIRSTJEN NIELSEN
Represented By: DAVID V. SIMUNOVICH
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD D. VITIELLO
Represented By: DAVID V. SIMUNOVICH
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORLANDO RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: DAVID V. SIMUNOVICH
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN TSOUKARIS
Represented By: DAVID V. SIMUNOVICH
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?