RAMADA WORLDWIDE, INC. v. 7240 SHAWNEE MISSION HOSPITALITY, LLC et al
Plaintiff: RAMADA WORLDWIDE, INC.
Defendant: 7240 SHAWNEE MISSION HOSPITALITY, LLC and SHAZIA MEMON
Case Number: 2:2018cv13551
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Steven C Mannion
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #8 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by SHAZIA MEMON, 7240 SHAWNEE MISSION HOSPITALITY, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/6/2018. (sms)
October 19, 2018 Filing 8 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants, 7240 Shawnee Mission Hospitality, LLC and Shazia Memon.. (DEVLIN, KATHLEEN)
October 19, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN J. DEVLIN on behalf of 7240 SHAWNEE MISSION HOSPITALITY, LLC, SHAZIA MEMON (DEVLIN, KATHLEEN)
October 4, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RAMADA WORLDWIDE, INC.. 7240 SHAWNEE MISSION HOSPITALITY, LLC served on 10/2/2018, answer due 10/23/2018; SHAZIA MEMON served on 10/2/2018, answer due 10/23/2018. (COUCH, BRYAN)
September 6, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to 7240 SHAWNEE MISSION HOSPITALITY, LLC, SHAZIA MEMON. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sms)
September 5, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. (ak, )
September 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by KELLY ANN KRUG on behalf of RAMADA WORLDWIDE, INC. (KRUG, KELLY)
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by ALYRA N. LIRIANO on behalf of RAMADA WORLDWIDE, INC. (LIRIANO, ALYRA)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RAMADA WORLDWIDE, INC. identifying WYNDHAM HOTEL GROUP, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (COUCH, BRYAN)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 7240 SHAWNEE MISSION HOSPITALITY, LLC, SHAZIA MEMON ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9001193), filed by RAMADA WORLDWIDE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(COUCH, BRYAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RAMADA WORLDWIDE, INC. v. 7240 SHAWNEE MISSION HOSPITALITY, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAMADA WORLDWIDE, INC.
Represented By: KELLY ANN KRUG
Represented By: BRYAN PAUL COUCH
Represented By: ALYRA N. LIRIANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7240 SHAWNEE MISSION HOSPITALITY, LLC
Represented By: KATHLEEN J. DEVLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHAZIA MEMON
Represented By: KATHLEEN J. DEVLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?