MOORE v. BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: VIOLA MOORE
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. and JOHN DOE
Case Number: 2:2018cv13727
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: New Jersey District Court
0 Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
1 Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 6, 2018 6 Letter from Daniel C. Fleming re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). (FLEMING, DANIEL)
November 5, 2018 5 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by VIOLA MOORE re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) (JOHNSON, ADRIAN)
September 27, 2018 4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.. Responses due by 10/22/2018 (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Steven Woodside, #3 Exhibit 1 to Woodside Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 to Woodside Declaration, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(FLEMING, DANIEL)
September 14, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/1/2018. (JB, )
September 13, 2018 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant Bank of America N.A... (FLEMING, DANIEL)
September 11, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (jr)
September 10, 2018 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. identifying BANA is a national association and a wholly owned subsidiary of BANA Holding Corporation. BANA Holding Corporation is a wholly owned subsidiary of BAC North America Holding Company. BAC North America Holding Company is a wholly owned subsidiary of NB Holdings Corporation. NB Holdings Corporation is a wholly owned subsidiary of Bank of America Corporation. as Corporate Parent.. (FLEMING, DANIEL)
September 10, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. with consent of Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. from Superior Court of New Jersey, Hudson County Vicinage, case number HUD-L-531-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9012816), filed by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A Summons, Complaint, CIS, TAN, #3 Exhibit B Answer by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., #4 Exhibit C Motion by JPMorgan Chase to Compel Discovery, #5 Exhibit D Bank of America Motion to Dismiss, #6 Exhibit E August 25, 2018 Order Dismissing Def John Doe, #7 Exhibit F August 31, 2018 Order Granting JPMorgan Chase's Motion to Compel, #8 Certificate of Service)(FLEMING, DANIEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOORE v. BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
Represented By: DANIEL C. FLEMING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Represented By: ANTHONY C. VALENZIANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIOLA MOORE
Represented By: ADRIAN JAWAUN JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?