ADENIJI v. BLUE SKY BLUE SEA INC. et al
Plaintiff: VICTOR OLUSEGUN ADENIJI
Defendant: MILWAUKEE CAR CARRIERS, AMERICAN EXPORT LINES, BLUE SKY BLUE SEA, INC., NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY and COLONY INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2018cv13836
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Mark Falk
Referring Judge: William J Martini
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 11/16/2018 at 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 9 before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 10/30/18. (LM, )
October 3, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BLUE SKY BLUE SEA, INC.. (JABBOUR, TIMOTHY)
October 3, 2018 Filing 3 American Export Line's ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against MILWAUKEE CAR CARRIERS by BLUE SKY BLUE SEA, INC..(JABBOUR, TIMOTHY)
September 20, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #2 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by BLUE SKY BLUE SEA, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/3/18. (cm, )
September 19, 2018 Filing 2 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant, Blue Sky Blue Sea, Inc. d/b/a American Export Lines.. (JABBOUR, TIMOTHY)
September 14, 2018 Case assigned to Judge William J. Martini and Magistrate Judge Mark Falk. (jr)
September 14, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr)
September 12, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AMERICAN EXPORT LINES from Superior Court of New Jersey, Essex County, case number ESX-L-3505-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9019897), filed by AMERICAN EXPORT LINES. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(JABBOUR, TIMOTHY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ADENIJI v. BLUE SKY BLUE SEA INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MILWAUKEE CAR CARRIERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN EXPORT LINES
Represented By: TIMOTHY MICHAEL JABBOUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLUE SKY BLUE SEA, INC.
Represented By: TIMOTHY MICHAEL JABBOUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLONY INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICTOR OLUSEGUN ADENIJI
Represented By: ANGELITA VALENCIA DESILVA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?