SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA v. LASCOLA TITSWORTH et al

Plaintiff: SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Defendant: GARY L. COOKE, JR., CHARLES TITSWORTH, STEPHANIE L. COOKE and DONNA M. LASCOLA TITSWORTH
Case Number: 2:2018cv13847
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: New Jersey District Court
0 Judge: Joseph A Dickson
1 Judge: Esther Salas
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2018 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Esther Salas: Telephone Conference held on 11/8/2018. Preliminary Injunction Hearing RESCHEDULED to 12/6/2018 at 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 5A before Judge Esther Salas. (Court Reporter Mary Jo Monteleone) (ps, )
November 7, 2018 23 Letter re #19 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Spreadsheet and Personal Financial Statement)(CASSIDY, KYLE)
November 6, 2018 22 BRIEF in further support of Selective Insurance Company of America's Order to Show Cause Application (Attachments: #1 Certification of Gabe Mihaly, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Certificate of Service)(MODUGNO, LOUIS)
November 6, 2018 21 Letter from Selective Insurance Company of America re #17 Response to Order to Show Cause. (CASSIDY, KYLE)
November 6, 2018 20 NOTICE of Appearance by KYLE HUDSON CASSIDY on behalf of SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA (CASSIDY, KYLE)
November 5, 2018 Set Hearings: Telephone Conference has been scheduled for 11/8/2018 at 11:30 AM before Judge Esther Salas. Defense counsel shall kindly coordinate the call. (ps, )
November 1, 2018 19 Letter from Dominic Caruso. (CARUSO, DOMINIC)
October 31, 2018 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ps, )
October 30, 2018 18 Featured Case ORDER: Initial Conference set for 1/11/2019 11:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 2D before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/30/18. (nm, )
October 29, 2018 17 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by DONNA M. LASCOLA TITSWORTH, CHARLES TITSWORTH. (CARUSO, DOMINIC)
October 25, 2018 16 ANSWER to Complaint by DONNA M. LASCOLA TITSWORTH, CHARLES TITSWORTH.(CARUSO, DOMINIC)
October 11, 2018 15 Featured Case TEXT ORDER: The Court has received the parties' letter dated October 10, 2018 (D.E. No. 14). Regarding the Court's previous Order (D.E. No. 13), the Court (i) extends the date by which Defendants may file an opposition brief to October 26, 2018; (ii) extends the date by which Plaintiff may reply to the opposition brief to November 2, 2018; and (iii) adjourns the November 2, 2018, hearing to November 15, 2018, at 1:00 p.m. So Ordered by Judge Esther Salas on 10/11/2018. (ps, )
October 10, 2018 14 Letter re 13 Order,. (MODUGNO, LOUIS)
October 1, 2018 13 Featured Case TEXT ORDER: The Court has received the parties' letter dated September 28, 2018 (D.E. No. 12). Regarding the Court's previous Order (D.E. No. 9), the Court (i) extends the date by which Defendants may file an opposition brief to October 12, 2018; (ii) extends the date by which Plaintiff may reply to the opposition brief to October 19, 2018; and (iii) adjourns the October 19, 2018, hearing to November 2, 2018, at 1:30 p.m. So Ordered by Judge Esther Salas on 10/1/2018. (ps, )
September 28, 2018 12 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order to Show Cause on Consent)(MODUGNO, LOUIS)
September 28, 2018 11 P. 65 BOND in the amount of $ 25,000.00 posted by SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (JB, )
September 25, 2018 10 Letter re #9 Order to Show Cause. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Fed. R. Civ. P. 65 Bond)(MODUGNO, LOUIS)
September 21, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Hearing set for 10/19/2018 01:00 PM in Newark - Courtroom 5A before Judge Esther Salas. why a preliminary injunctive Order should not be issue, etc. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 9/20/2018. (JB, )
September 19, 2018 8 Featured Case TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference, to be initiated by plaintiff, on 10/10/18 at 3:15pm. Parties may contact chambers at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/19/18. (tjg, )
September 19, 2018 7 Letter re #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed OTSC w/ Bond Amount)(MODUGNO, LOUIS)
September 18, 2018 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Esther Salas: Order to Show Cause Hearing held on 9/18/2018. The parties have informed the court that they have agreed to a consent order. Briefing schedule has been set for the preliminary injunction application. Opposition briefs to be filed by 10/2/2018. Reply briefs to be filed by 10/9/2018. Hearing set for 10/19/2018 at 1:00 PM in Newark - Courtroom 5A before Judge Esther Salas. (Court Reporter Mary Jo Monteleone) (ps, )
September 18, 2018 5 Letter re Set/Reset Hearings, #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MODUGNO, LOUIS)
September 17, 2018 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Esther Salas: Telephone Conference held on 9/17/2018. (Court Reporter Mary Jo Monteleone) (ps, )
September 17, 2018 Set Hearings: Hearing on the Plaintiff's OTSC application is scheduled for 9/18/2018 at 3:00 PM in Newark - Courtroom 5A before Judge Esther Salas. (ps, )
September 13, 2018 3 Certification on behalf of SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA Re #1 Complaint, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MODUGNO, LOUIS)
September 13, 2018 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA identifying SELECTIVE INSURANCE GROUP, INC. as Corporate Parent. (byl)
September 13, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against STEPHANIE L. COOKE, GARY L. COOKE, JR., DONNA M. LASCOLA TITSWORTH, CHARLES TITSWORTH ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number NEW037409), filed by SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Cover Letter, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(byl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA v. LASCOLA TITSWORTH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARY L. COOKE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES TITSWORTH
Represented By: DOMINIC V. CARUSO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHANIE L. COOKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONNA M. LASCOLA TITSWORTH
Represented By: DOMINIC V. CARUSO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By: LOUIS A. MODUGNO
Represented By: KYLE HUDSON CASSIDY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?