WESTPOINT v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: PETER I WESTPOINT
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Case Number: 2:2018cv13858
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jose L Linares
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PETER I WESTPOINT. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY served on 10/10/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (WLADYKA, AGNES)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (JB, )
September 17, 2018 COMPLAINT See (DKT No. 1) against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, filed by PETER I WESTPOINT.(JB, )
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Granting #1 #2 Application IFP. The Clerk is Ordered to file the Complaint. It is further Ordered, the Clerk issue a summons and the U.S. Marshal serve a copy of the Complaint summons and this Order upon the defendant as directed by the Plaintiff. All costs of service shall be advanced by the United States, etc. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 9/17/2018. (JB, )
September 14, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Jose L. Linares. (jr)
September 14, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Complaint entered by AGNES S. WLADYKA on September 13, 2018 was submitted with an Application for In forma pauperis (IFP). For future filings of complaints with an IFP application please use the event COMPLAINT RECEIVED, which can be found under Service of Process. This message is for informational purposes only. (jr)
September 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT RECEIVED against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY by PETER I WESTPOINT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Application IFP)(WLADYKA, AGNES) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/14/2018: #3 Proposed IFP Order) (jr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WESTPOINT v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PETER I WESTPOINT
Represented By: AGNES S. WLADYKA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?