COMPREHENSIVE SPINE CARE, P.A. v. OXFORD HEALTH INSURANCE, INC. et al

Plaintiff: COMPREHENSIVE SPINE CARE, P.A.
Defendant: JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-10, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10, OXFORD HEALTH INSURANCE, INC. and UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.
Case Number: 2:2018cv13874
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: New Jersey District Court
0 Judge: James B Clark
1 Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2018 10 Featured Case ORDER granting Plaintiff's #9 Letter Rule 7.1, Reset Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 12/17/2018 before Judge John Michael Vazquez.. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 11/6/2018. (gl, )
November 2, 2018 9 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss . (MITCHELL, AARON)
November 2, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 12/3/2018 before Judge John Michael Vazquez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (gl, )
November 1, 2018 8 MOTION to Dismiss by OXFORD HEALTH INSURANCE, INC., UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Britto, #2 Exhibit A to Dec. of M. Britto, #3 Exhibit B to Dec. of M. Britto, #4 Brief, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(BERNSTEIN, MICHAEL)
October 23, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER granting Defendant's letter request for an extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by 11/1/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 10/23/2018. (dmr)
October 22, 2018 6 Letter from Defendant Seeking Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. (BERNSTEIN, MICHAEL)
October 3, 2018 5 Letter from Defendant Seeking Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. (BERNSTEIN, MICHAEL)
September 20, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by OXFORD HEALTH INSURANCE, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/4/18. (cm, )
September 19, 2018 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiff's Complaint... (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BERNSTEIN, MICHAEL)
September 15, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr)
September 15, 2018 Case assigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (jr)
September 13, 2018 3 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW P. MAZZOLA on behalf of OXFORD HEALTH INSURANCE, INC., UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC. (MAZZOLA, MATTHEW)
September 13, 2018 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OXFORD HEALTH INSURANCE, INC., UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC. identifying UnitedHealth Group Incorporated as Corporate Parent.. (BERNSTEIN, MICHAEL)
September 13, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., OXFORD HEALTH INSURANCE, INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey, Bergen County, case number BER-L-002948-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9022407), filed by UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., OXFORD HEALTH INSURANCE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (State Court Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (State Report Filed By Plaintiff), #3 Exhibit C (Public Docs Re: Defendant), #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Certificate of Service)(BERNSTEIN, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COMPREHENSIVE SPINE CARE, P.A. v. OXFORD HEALTH INSURANCE, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OXFORD HEALTH INSURANCE, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL H. BERNSTEIN
Represented By: MATTHEW P. MAZZOLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL H. BERNSTEIN
Represented By: MATTHEW P. MAZZOLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMPREHENSIVE SPINE CARE, P.A.
Represented By: AARON AUBREY MITCHELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?