BRODSKY et al v. BMW OF MANHATTAN et al

Plaintiff: JAY BRODSKY and DONNA MARTIN
Defendant: BMW MANHATTAN, BMW GROUP INC., BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, BMW GROUP FINANCIAL SERVICES and JOHN AND JANE DOE
Case Number: 2:2018cv13885
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
0 Judge: James B Clark
1 Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BMW GROUP FINANCIAL SERVICES, BMW GROUP INC., BMW MANHATTAN, BMW OF NORTH AMERICA. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm)
October 10, 2018 Filing 6 USMS 285 Form Returned. (sm)
October 10, 2018 Filing 5 CLERK'S LETTER: Transmittal of USM 285 Forms. (sm)
October 10, 2018 COMPLAINT #1 against BMW GROUP FINANCIAL SERVICES, BMW GROUP INC., BMW MANHATTAN, BMW OF NORTH AMERICA (IFP granted), filed by JAY BRODSKY, DONNA MARTIN.(sm)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ON APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES is Granted; the Clerk shall file the Complaint and provide the Plaintiff with the USM 258 Forms for each defendant to complete and return; the Clerk shall issue a summons after all completed USM285 forms are returned and the U.S. Marshal shall serve a copy of the Complaint, summons and this order upon Defendants. All costs of service shall be advanced by the United States. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 10/10/2018. (sm)
October 1, 2018 Filing 3 APPLICATION to proceed IN FORMA PAUPERIS by JAY BRODSKY. (sm)
September 18, 2018 Filing 2 BLANK APPLICATION to proceed IN FORMA PAUPERIS AO 230 (Long Form) and Consent & Registration Form to Receive Documents Electronically mailed to Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 ECF-Reg-ProSe form)(nic, )
September 13, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Addendum, #2 Application IFP, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Envelope)(ys )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRODSKY et al v. BMW OF MANHATTAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAY BRODSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONNA MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW MANHATTAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW GROUP INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW OF NORTH AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW GROUP FINANCIAL SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN AND JANE DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?