WARE INDUSTRIES, INC. et al v. ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY et al

Plaintiff: WILLIAM A. GARDNER and WARE INDUSTRIES, INC.
Defendant: ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY, JOHN DOES 1-10 and MARKEL AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2018cv13895
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: New Jersey District Court
0 Judge: Cathy L Waldor
1 Judge: William H Walls
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 12, 2018 9 MOTION for Leave to File a Motion for Summary Judgment by ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY. (BRADY, LAURA)
October 9, 2018 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (tjg, )
October 9, 2018 8 Featured Case TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor in courtroom 4C on 11/15/18 at 3:15pm. Local counsel must be present. Parties are to submit a completed Pretrial Scheduling Order found in the Notice of Judicial Preferences link to chambers via email at CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 10/9/18. (tjg, )
October 5, 2018 7 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY.(BRADY, LAURA)
October 5, 2018 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MARKEL AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Markel Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (JABBOUR, TIMOTHY)
October 5, 2018 5 ANSWER to Complaint by MARKEL AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY.(JABBOUR, TIMOTHY)
September 21, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/5/2018. (ld, )
September 21, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by MARKEL AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/5/2018. (ld, )
September 20, 2018 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant, St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company.. (BRADY, LAURA)
September 20, 2018 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant, Markel American Insurance Company. Attorney TIMOTHY MICHAEL JABBOUR for MARKEL AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY added. (JABBOUR, TIMOTHY)
September 14, 2018 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying THE TRAVLERS COMPANY, INC. as Corporate Parent. (sms)
September 14, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY from SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY: MIDDLESEX COUNTY, case number MID-L-004872-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9023018), filed by ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Certificate of Service)(sms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WARE INDUSTRIES, INC. et al v. ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: LAURA A. BRADY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARKEL AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: TIMOTHY MICHAEL JABBOUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM A. GARDNER
Represented By: EUGENE KILLIAN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WARE INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: EUGENE KILLIAN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?