WINGATE INNS INTERNATIONAL, INC. v. LATROBE HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC et al

Plaintiff: WINGATE INNS INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Defendant: NIRAV SHROFF, LATROBE HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC, SANJAY PATEL and CHARAN SINGH
Case Number: 2:2018cv13896
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: New Jersey District Court
0 Judge: Mark Falk
1 Judge: William J Martini
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 15, 2018 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WINGATE INNS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. NIRAV SHROFF served on 10/10/2018, answer due 10/31/2018. (COUCH, BRYAN)
September 15, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr)
September 15, 2018 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to LATROBE HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC, SANJAY PATEL, NIRAV SHROFF, CHARAN SINGH. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr)
September 15, 2018 Case assigned to Judge William J. Martini and Magistrate Judge Mark Falk. (jr)
September 14, 2018 4 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL ANTHONY ROLEK on behalf of WINGATE INNS INTERNATIONAL, INC. (ROLEK, MICHAEL)
September 14, 2018 3 NOTICE of Appearance by KELLY ANN KRUG on behalf of WINGATE INNS INTERNATIONAL, INC. (KRUG, KELLY)
September 14, 2018 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WINGATE INNS INTERNATIONAL, INC. identifying WYNDHAM HOTEL GROUP, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (COUCH, BRYAN)
September 14, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against LATROBE HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC, SANJAY PATEL, NIRAV SHROFF, CHARAN SINGH ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9024384), filed by WINGATE INNS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(COUCH, BRYAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WINGATE INNS INTERNATIONAL, INC. v. LATROBE HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NIRAV SHROFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LATROBE HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANJAY PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARAN SINGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WINGATE INNS INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: KELLY ANN KRUG
Represented By: BRYAN PAUL COUCH
Represented By: MICHAEL ANTHONY ROLEK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?