KUKU v. WILSON et al
Plaintiff: CAPTAIN ADEKUNIE KUKU
Defendant: EJIKE UZOR and HON. MARCELLA MATOS WILSON
Case Number: 2:2018cv14333
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Leda D Wettre
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF DISMISSAL; that Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6).. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 11/5/2018. (ld, )
November 2, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by MARCELLA MATOS WILSON. Responses due by 12/3/2018 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(RASHED, MARWAN)
November 2, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion set for 12/3/2018 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
October 30, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #6 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion set for 12/3/2018 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
October 29, 2018 Filing 6 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by All Defendants. Responses due by 11/22/2018 (Attachments: #1 Statement Leave to file Motion out of time)(UZOR, EJIKE)
October 15, 2018 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Application for an Extension of Time to Answer. Attorney MARWAN M. RASHED for MARCELLA MATOS WILSON added. (RASHED, MARWAN)
October 15, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by MARCELLA MATOS WILSON has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/5/2018. (dam, )
October 5, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ADEKUNIE KUKU. (Summons was served by Plaintiff) (ld, )
October 1, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to EJIKE UZOR, MARCELLA MATOS WILSON. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 Consent & Registration Form to Receive Documents Electronically by ADEKUNIE KUKU (ld, )
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EJIKE UZOR, MARCELLA MATOS WILSON ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number NEW037507) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ADEKUNIE KUKU. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ld, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KUKU v. WILSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAPTAIN ADEKUNIE KUKU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EJIKE UZOR
Represented By: EJIKE N. UZOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HON. MARCELLA MATOS WILSON
Represented By: MARWAN M. RASHED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?