MCALLISTER v. PORT AUTHORITY OF NEW YORK AND NEW JERSEY et al
Plaintiff: JOSEPH MCALLISTER
Defendant: ABC CORP. 1-10, JOHN DOES 1-10, PORT AUTHORITY TRANS-HUDSON CORP., PORT AUTHORITY NEW YORK AND NEW JERSEY and JOHN DOES 1-20
Case Number: 2:2018cv14927
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LETTER ORDER Granting #4 Letter from Thomas R. Brophy re: extension of time to respond to the Summons and Complaint until 1/5/2019, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 11/19/2018. (JB, )
November 16, 2018 Filing 4 Letter from Thomas R. Brophy re: extension of time to respond to the Summons and Complaint. (BROPHY, THOMAS)
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS ROBERT BROPHY on behalf of PORT AUTHORITY NEW YORK AND NEW JERSEY, PORT AUTHORITY TRANS-HUDSON CORP. (BROPHY, THOMAS)
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to PORT AUTHORITY NEW YORK AND NEW JERSEY, PORT AUTHORITY TRANS-HUDSON CORP.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (gl, )
October 15, 2018 Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre added. (eu, )
October 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9089814) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JOSEPH MCALLISTER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ANZALONE, GIOVANNI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCALLISTER v. PORT AUTHORITY OF NEW YORK AND NEW JERSEY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORP. 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PORT AUTHORITY TRANS-HUDSON CORP.
Represented By: THOMAS ROBERT BROPHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PORT AUTHORITY NEW YORK AND NEW JERSEY
Represented By: THOMAS ROBERT BROPHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH MCALLISTER
Represented By: GIOVANNI ANZALONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?