FERRENTINO v. SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS INC. et al
Plaintiff: JOHN FERRENTINO
Defendant: SCHNEIDER%20NATIONAL%20INTERMODAL%20SERVICES, SCHNEIDER%20NATIONAL%20BULK%20CARRIERS%2C%20INC., CSX INTERMODAL TERMINALS, INC., SCHNEIDER%20NATIONAL%20CARRIERS%20INC., SCHNEIDER%20NATIONAL, SCHNEIDER NATIONAL, INC., SCHNEIDER NATIONAL BULK CARRIERS, INC., SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS INC., SCHNEIDER NATIONAL INTERMODAL SERVICES, JOHN DOES 1-100, Alsip Acquisition, LLC and Alsip MiniMill, LLC
Counter Defendant: PACIFIC RAIL SERVICES, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv14928
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael A Hammer
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alsip Acquisition, LLC, Alsip MiniMill, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (JB, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 Request for Summons to be Issued by JOHN FERRENTINO as to Alsip Acquisition, LLC, Alsip MiniMill, LLC. (SIMON, LAWRENCE)
November 16, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to PACIFIC RAIL SERVICES, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (JB, )
November 15, 2018 Filing 5 Request for Summons to be Issued by SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS INC., SCHNEIDER NATIONAL BULK CARRIERS, INC., SCHNEIDER NATIONAL INTERMODAL SERVICES, SCHNEIDER NATIONAL BULK CARRIERS, INC., SCHNEIDER NATIONAL, INC. as to PACIFIC RAIL SERVICES, LLC. (STECKLOW, DAVID)
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against CSX INTERMODAL TERMINALS, INC., COUNTERCLAIM against JOHN FERRENTINO, PACIFIC RAIL SERVICES, LLC by SCHNEIDER NATIONAL INTERMODAL SERVICES, SCHNEIDER NATIONAL BULK CARRIERS, INC., SCHNEIDER NATIONAL, INC., SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS INC., SCHNEIDER NATIONAL BULK CARRIERS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Service)(STECKLOW, DAVID)
November 6, 2018 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Alsip MiniMill, LLC, Alsip Acquisition, LLC, filed by JOHN FERRENTINO.(KAHN, ERIC)
October 26, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The NOTICE OF REMOVAL submitted on 10/12/2018 appears to have address information for LAWRENCE MICHAEL SIMON, ESQ. that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (gl, )
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against SCHNEIDER NATIONAL, SCHNEIDER NATIONAL BULK CARRIERS, INC., SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS INC., SCHNEIDER NATIONAL INTERMODAL SERVICES by CSX INTERMODAL TERMINALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ABILHEIRA, ELIAS)
October 15, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (eu, )
October 15, 2018 Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (eu, )
October 12, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CSX INTERMODAL TERMINALS, INC. by Abilheira & Associates, PC from Law Division, Hudson County, case number HUD-L-3180-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9089850), filed by CSX INTERMODAL TERMINALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint & Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Summons, #4 Statement Disclosure Statement, #5 Certificate of Service)(ABILHEIRA, ELIAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FERRENTINO v. SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHNEIDER%20NATIONAL%20INTERMODAL%20SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHNEIDER%20NATIONAL%20BULK%20CARRIERS%2C%20INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX INTERMODAL TERMINALS, INC.
Represented By: ELIAS ABILHEIRA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHNEIDER%20NATIONAL%20CARRIERS%20INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHNEIDER%20NATIONAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHNEIDER NATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: DAVID SAMUEL STECKLOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHNEIDER NATIONAL BULK CARRIERS, INC.
Represented By: DAVID SAMUEL STECKLOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS INC.
Represented By: DAVID SAMUEL STECKLOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHNEIDER NATIONAL INTERMODAL SERVICES
Represented By: DAVID SAMUEL STECKLOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alsip Acquisition, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alsip MiniMill, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN FERRENTINO
Represented By: ERIC G. KAHN
Represented By: LAWRENCE MICHAEL SIMON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: PACIFIC RAIL SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?