SCHEPISI et al v. SANTANDER BANK, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: LAURA SCHEPISI and MARK SCHEPISI
Defendant: SANTANDER BANK, N.A., PHH MORTGAGE, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1 THROUGH 10 and XYZ CORPORATIONS 1 THROUGH 10
Case Number: 2:2018cv15006
Filed: October 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Joseph A Dickson
Referring Judge: Jose L Linares
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Filing 12 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by PHH MORTGAGE, SANTANDER BANK, N.A. re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint With Prejudice (Attachments: #1 Certification of Service)(MATTHEWS, BRIAN)
December 3, 2018 Filing 11 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint With Prejudice (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Client, #2 Certification of Counsel)(CAULFIELD, MICHAEL)
November 20, 2018 Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint With Prejudice. Motion set for 12/17/2018 before Chief Judge Jose L. Linares. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rss, )
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting Letter request for an automatic extension pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(d)(5). Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 11/20/2018. (rss, )
November 18, 2018 Filing 9 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint With Prejudice . (CAULFIELD, MICHAEL)
November 12, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL THOMAS CAULFIELD on behalf of All Plaintiffs (CAULFIELD, MICHAEL)
November 7, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint With Prejudice. Motion set for 12/3/2018 before Chief Judge Jose L. Linares. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (gl, )
November 6, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint With Prejudice by PHH MORTGAGE, SANTANDER BANK, N.A.. Responses due by 11/19/2018 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint With Prejudice, #2 Certification of Brian P. Matthews, Esq., #3 Exhibits A-L to Certification of Brian P. Matthews, Esq., #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service, #6 Letter to Hon. Jose L. Linares, U.S.D.J.)(MATTHEWS, BRIAN)
October 24, 2018 Filing 6 The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by PHH MORTGAGE, SANTANDER BANK, N.A. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/6/2018. (ld, ).
October 22, 2018 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Santander Bank, N.A. and PHH Mortgage.. (MATTHEWS, BRIAN)
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SANTANDER BANK, N.A.. (MATTHEWS, BRIAN)
October 22, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PHH MORTGAGE. (MATTHEWS, BRIAN)
October 18, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (byl)
October 16, 2018 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Jose L. Linares and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson. (ak, )
October 16, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN P. MATTHEWS on behalf of PHH MORTGAGE, SANTANDER BANK, N.A. (MATTHEWS, BRIAN)
October 16, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PHH MORTGAGE, SANTANDER BANK, N.A. from SUPERIOR COURT OF BERGEN COUNTY, case number BER L 6025 18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9097195), filed by PHH MORTGAGE, SANTANDER BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certification of Brian P. Matthews, Esq., #4 Certificate of Service)(MATTHEWS, BRIAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCHEPISI et al v. SANTANDER BANK, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAURA SCHEPISI
Represented By: MICHAEL THOMAS CAULFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK SCHEPISI
Represented By: MICHAEL THOMAS CAULFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANTANDER BANK, N.A.
Represented By: BRIAN P. MATTHEWS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH MORTGAGE
Represented By: BRIAN P. MATTHEWS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN AND JANE DOES 1 THROUGH 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ CORPORATIONS 1 THROUGH 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?