SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION v. FIXELLE et al
Plaintiff: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Defendant: GENESIS ADVISORY SERVICES CORP., BRUCE J FIXELLE and AURORA CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv15026
Filed: October 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: James B Clark
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 12:22
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. GENESIS ADVISORY SERVICES CORP. waiver sent on 10/24/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (PRIMOFF, RICHARD)
October 31, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. AURORA CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC waiver sent on 10/24/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (PRIMOFF, RICHARD)
October 31, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. BRUCE J FIXELLE waiver sent on 10/24/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (PRIMOFF, RICHARD)
October 17, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JANNA I. BERKE on behalf of SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (BERKE, JANNA)
October 17, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD G PRIMOFF on behalf of SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (PRIMOFF, RICHARD)
October 16, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (ak, )
October 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AURORA CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC, BRUCE J FIXELLE, GENESIS ADVISORY SERVICES CORP. with JURY DEMAND, filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION.(MEHRABAN, LARA) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/17/2018: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION v. FIXELLE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENESIS ADVISORY SERVICES CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRUCE J FIXELLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AURORA CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Represented By: LARA SHALOV MEHRABAN
Represented By: JANNA I. BERKE
Represented By: RICHARD G PRIMOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?