Reeves v. I.C.E. et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL DUKE REEVES
Defendant: Four - Unknown ICE Agents and I.C.E.
Respondent: JEFFREY B. SESSIONS, CHARLES GREEN, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY and KIRSTJEN NIELSEN
Case Number: 2:2018cv15063
Filed: October 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: John Michael Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Filing 18 Letter to Judge Vazquez from MICHAEL DUKE REEVES. (ld, )
November 14, 2018 Filing 17 APPLICATION/MOTION IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by MICHAEL DUKE REEVES. (Attachments: #1 LETTER)(ld, )
November 7, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINA PETERSEN GREER on behalf of CHARLES GREEN (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(GREER, CHRISTINA)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order denying application for Pro Bono Counsel, D.E. #5 Motions terminated:. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 11/7/2018. (byl)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO ANSWER; that the Clerk shall re-open this matter; that Respondents Kirstjen Nielsen, Jefferson B. Sessions, and the United States Department of Homeland Security are dismissed with prejudice. The sole proper respondent in a petition brought under 28 U.S.C. 2241 is the warden of the facility where the detainee is currently being held, i.e., Charles Green.; that Petitioner's motion to add new exhibits (at ECF No. 6) is GRANTED; that the Clerk shall serve a copy of this Memorandum Order on Petitioner by regular United States mail; that the Clerk shall serve copies of the Petition (at ECF No. 10) and this Memorandum Order upon Respondent by regular United States mail; that the Clerk shall forward a copy of the Petition (at ECF No. 10) and this Memorandum Order to Chief, Civil Division, United States Attorney's Office, at the following email address: USANJ-HabeasCases@usdoj.gov; that, within forty-five (45) days after the date of entry of this Memorandum Order, Respondent shall electronically file an answer to the Petition;etc. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 11/7/2018. (ld, )
November 6, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Change of Address by MICHAEL DUKE REEVES (ld, )
October 29, 2018 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number NEW037823 (ld, )
October 29, 2018 Filing 12 Letter REQUEST TO EXPEDITE HABEAS CORPUS PETITION from MICHAEL DUKE REEVES. (ld, )
October 29, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address by MICHAEL DUKE REEVES (ld, )
October 24, 2018 Filing 10 AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 0.), filed by MICHAEL DUKE REEVES. (Attachments: #1 ENVELOPE)(ld, )
October 23, 2018 ***Civil Case Terminated. (ld, )
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that the Clerk shall administratively terminate this matter; that, if Petitioner wishes to reopen this action, he shall so notify the Court within thirty (30) days of the date of entry of this Order, in writing addressed to the Clerk of the Court, Martin Luther King Building & United States Courthouse, 50 Walnut Street, Newark, New Jersey 07101; Petitioners writing shall include either: (1) a properly completed in forma pauperis application; or (2) the five dollar ($5.00) filing fee; that the Clerk shall serve this Order upon Petitioner by regular United States mail, together with the appropriate blank IFP application form, i.e., District of New Jersey Form DNJ-ProSe-007-B-(Rev. 09/09). (blank IFP application form mailed). Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 10/23/2018. (ld, )
October 18, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez. (ak, )
October 18, 2018 Filing 8 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:18-cv-07195. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 11, 2018 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of District of New Jersey. (sac)
October 11, 2018 Mailed a copy of #7 Transfer Order (case opening only), to Michael Duke Reeves E-44111 Bergen County Jail 160 S. River St. Hackensack, NJ 07601.(vba)
October 11, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (rdz)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Petitioner, and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. Whether Petitioner should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. And all other pending motions, applications, and requests are to be also decided by the transferee court. This order closes this case. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 10/11/2018) (rdz) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
September 5, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION TO ADD NEW EXHIBITS. Document filed by Michael Duke Reeves.(sc)
August 21, 2018 Filing 5 APPLICATION FOR THE COURT TO REQUEST PRO BONO COUNSEL. Document filed by Michael Duke Reeves.(sc)
August 16, 2018 Filing 3 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Michael Duke Reeves.(sc) Modified on 8/17/2018 (sc).
August 15, 2018 Filing 4 LETTER from Michael D. Reeves, dated 8/7/18 re: INTENTIONAL MISSED DIAGNOSIS/ BOWEL OBSTRUCTION. Document filed by Michael Duke Reeves.(sc)
August 7, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (sac)
August 7, 2018 Filing 2 (COMPLAINT) MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION STAY OF REMOVAL PENDING FINAL ADJUDICATION MEDICAL RELEASED FROM ICE DETENTION ORDER against Four - Unknown ICE Agents, I.C.E. Document filed by Michael Duke Reeves. (sac)
August 7, 2018 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Michael Duke Reeves.(sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reeves v. I.C.E. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Four - Unknown ICE Agents
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I.C.E.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL DUKE REEVES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JEFFREY B. SESSIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CHARLES GREEN
Represented By: CHRISTINA PETERSEN GREER
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: KIRSTJEN NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?