MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING CO. (USA) INC. v. GREEN TRADE LOGISTICS INC. et al
Plaintiff: MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING CO. (USA) INC.
Defendant: GLOBAL AUTO LOGISTICS, GREEN TRADE LOGISTICS INC. and STEVEN SCHNEIDER
Case Number: 2:2018cv15317
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Joseph A Dickson
Referring Judge: Jose L Linares
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Filing 9 Transmittal Letter for remanded case to Hudson County Administration Building595 Newark AvenueJersey City, NJ 07306 State No: HUD-L-02961 18. Mailed certified copy of the Order remanding case. (JB, )
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OR REMAND, that the action is remanded to New Jersey Superior Court, Hudson County, and it is further Ordered that the action is Closed.. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 11/28/2018. (JB, )
November 19, 2018 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by STEVEN SCHNEIDER. (Attachments: #1 Certification Mullins)(MULLINS, EDWARD)
November 12, 2018 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING CO. (USA) INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(PRESS, BRYAN)
November 1, 2018 Filing 5 Certification on behalf of MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING CO. (USA) INC. Re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Index, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I)(PRESS, BRYAN)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE that the Plaintiff must respond to this Order to Show cause first, and the plaintiff must electronically file its response with this Court by11/13/2018, and it is further Ordered that the Defendant must electronically file his response with this Court on 11/19/2018. That the motion to dismiss that was originally filed in New Jersey State Court by the Defendant Steven Schneider is administratively terminated without prejudice and it is further Ordered that the Motion by the Defendant Steven Schneider to extend the time to answer the Complaint (ECF No. 2) is GRANTED IN PART, etc. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 10/31/2018. (JB, )
October 31, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #2 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Exhibit A filed by STEVEN SCHNEIDER submitted by STEVEN SCHNEIDER has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/15/2018. (JB, )
October 31, 2018 Filing 3 Letter from Steven Schneider re #2 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Exhibit A, Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,. (MULLINS, EDWARD)
October 29, 2018 SeT Deadlines as to #2 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Exhibit A. Motion set for 11/19/2018 before Chief Judge Jose L. Linares. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, )
October 26, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Jose L. Linares and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson. (jr)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Exhibit A by STEVEN SCHNEIDER. (MULLINS, EDWARD)
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by STEVEN SCHNEIDER from Superior Court of Hudson County, NJ, case number HUD-L-2961-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9124347), filed by STEVEN SCHNEIDER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(MULLINS, EDWARD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING CO. (USA) INC. v. GREEN TRADE LOGISTICS INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLOBAL AUTO LOGISTICS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREEN TRADE LOGISTICS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN SCHNEIDER
Represented By: EDWARD JAMES MULLINS, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING CO. (USA) INC.
Represented By: BRYAN D. PRESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?