Marinaccio v. EAST HANOVER POLICE DEPARTMENT et al
Plaintiff: Paul Marinaccio
Defendant: Robert Chiazzo, Matthew Cerrato, EAST HANOVER POLICE DEPARTMENT, Daniel McClure, Zamojowski, John Doe, Ted Pribulla, Keith Gunther, Donnard Justin, EAST HANOVER TOWNSHIP, Michael Liotta, Della Piazza, Paula Massaro, ROBERT JORDAN, Jack Ambrose, Hawiszak, Brian Stevens, Christopher Cannizo, Captain Jack Ambrose, Policeman Donnard Justin, Policeman Ted Pribulla, Policeman Keith Gunther, Police Chief Christopher Cannizo, Policeman Della Piazza, Policeman Robert Chiazzo, Policeman Matthew Cerrato, Policeman ROBERT JORDAN, Policeman Daniel McClure, Policeman Zamojowski, Policeman Michael Liotta, Policeman Brian Stevens and Policeman Hawiszczak
Case Number: 2:2018cv15443
Filed: October 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Filing 10 Letter from Paul Marinaccio dated 12/20/2018. (sm)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: A Telephone Status Conference is set for 3/14/2019 4:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre, Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call. Fact Discovery is to remain open through 4/30/2019, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 12/18/2018. (sm)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that plaintiff shall submit to the Court the basis for his objection to the proposed Discovery Confidentiality Order no later than 12/31/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 12/18/2018. (sm)
December 17, 2018 Filing 9 Letters from Paul Marinaccio. (sm)
December 14, 2018 Filing 6 Letter from Matthew R. Petracca. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(PETRACCA, MATTHEW)
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 Plaintiff's Discovery Plan dated 12/11/2018. (sm)
December 5, 2018 Filing 4 Joint Discovery Plan by Jack Ambrose, Christopher Cannizo, Matthew Cerrato, Robert Chiazzo, EAST HANOVER POLICE DEPARTMENT, EAST HANOVER TOWNSHIP, Keith Gunther, Hawiszczak, ROBERT JORDAN, Donnard Justin, Michael Liotta, Paula Massaro, Daniel McClure, Della Piazza, Ted Pribulla, Brian Stevens, Zamojowski.(PETRACCA, MATTHEW)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that the parties shall each submit a proposed discovery schedule in the form of the attached on or before December 6, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 11/5/2018. (ld, )
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Jack Ambrose, Christopher Cannizo, Matthew Cerrato, Robert Chiazzo, EAST HANOVER POLICE DEPARTMENT, EAST HANOVER TOWNSHIP, Keith Gunther, Hawiszczak, ROBERT JORDAN, Donnard Justin, Michael Liotta, Paula Massaro, Daniel McClure, Della Piazza, Ted Pribulla, Brian Stevens, Zamojowski.(PETRACCA, MATTHEW)
October 30, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Matthew Cerrato, Robert Chiazzo, Michael Liotta, EAST HANOVER POLICE DEPARTMENT, Brian Stevens, ROBERT JORDAN, Keith Gunther, Jack Ambrose, EAST HANOVER TOWNSHIP, Daniel McClure, Hawiszak, Donnard Justin, Zamojowski, Ted Pribulla, Paula Massaro, Della Piazza, Christopher Cannizo from Superior Court of New Jersey, Morris County, case number MRS-L-1873-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9134028), filed by Matthew Cerrato, Robert Chiazzo, Michael Liotta, EAST HANOVER POLICE DEPARTMENT, Brian Stevens, ROBERT JORDAN, Keith Gunther, Jack Ambrose, EAST HANOVER TOWNSHIP, Daniel McClure, Hawiszak, Donnard Justin, Zamojowski, Ted Pribulla, Paula Massaro, Della Piazza, Christopher Cannizo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Supplement Notice of Filing, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(PETRACCA, MATTHEW)
October 30, 2018 Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre added. (eu, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marinaccio v. EAST HANOVER POLICE DEPARTMENT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Chiazzo
Represented By: MATTHEW RYAN PETRACCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Cerrato
Represented By: MATTHEW RYAN PETRACCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EAST HANOVER POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By: MATTHEW RYAN PETRACCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel McClure
Represented By: MATTHEW RYAN PETRACCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zamojowski
Represented By: MATTHEW RYAN PETRACCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Pribulla
Represented By: MATTHEW RYAN PETRACCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Gunther
Represented By: MATTHEW RYAN PETRACCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donnard Justin
Represented By: MATTHEW RYAN PETRACCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EAST HANOVER TOWNSHIP
Represented By: MATTHEW RYAN PETRACCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Liotta
Represented By: MATTHEW RYAN PETRACCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Della Piazza
Represented By: MATTHEW RYAN PETRACCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Massaro
Represented By: MATTHEW RYAN PETRACCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT JORDAN
Represented By: MATTHEW RYAN PETRACCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Ambrose
Represented By: MATTHEW RYAN PETRACCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawiszak
Represented By: MATTHEW RYAN PETRACCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Stevens
Represented By: MATTHEW RYAN PETRACCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Cannizo
Represented By: MATTHEW RYAN PETRACCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Jack Ambrose
Represented By: MATTHEW RYAN PETRACCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Policeman Donnard Justin
Represented By: MATTHEW RYAN PETRACCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Policeman Ted Pribulla
Represented By: MATTHEW RYAN PETRACCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Policeman Keith Gunther
Represented By: MATTHEW RYAN PETRACCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Chief Christopher Cannizo
Represented By: MATTHEW RYAN PETRACCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Policeman Della Piazza
Represented By: MATTHEW RYAN PETRACCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Policeman Robert Chiazzo
Represented By: MATTHEW RYAN PETRACCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Policeman Matthew Cerrato
Represented By: MATTHEW RYAN PETRACCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Policeman ROBERT JORDAN
Represented By: MATTHEW RYAN PETRACCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Policeman Daniel McClure
Represented By: MATTHEW RYAN PETRACCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Policeman Zamojowski
Represented By: MATTHEW RYAN PETRACCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Policeman Michael Liotta
Represented By: MATTHEW RYAN PETRACCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Policeman Brian Stevens
Represented By: MATTHEW RYAN PETRACCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Policeman Hawiszczak
Represented By: MATTHEW RYAN PETRACCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Marinaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?