HE v. CHINA ZENIX AUTO INTERNATIONAL LIMITED et al
Plaintiff: ZHENGYU HE
Defendant: MARTIN CHEUNG, JIANHUI LAI and CHINA ZENIX AUTO INTERNATIONAL LIMITED
Case Number: 2:2018cv15530
Filed: October 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Joseph A Dickson
Referring Judge: Jose L Linares
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION and Order Extending the Response Deadline for China Zenix Auto International Limited Pending Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel by CHINA ZENIX AUTO INTERNATIONAL LIMITED. (PARKER, DANA)
December 25, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #6 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by CHINA ZENIX AUTO INTERNATIONAL LIMITED has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 01/10/2019. (sms)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to China Zenix Auto International Limited.. (PARKER, DANA)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by DANA B. PARKER on behalf of CHINA ZENIX AUTO INTERNATIONAL LIMITED (PARKER, DANA)
November 1, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MARTIN CHEUNG, CHINA ZENIX AUTO INTERNATIONAL LIMITED, JIANHUI LAI. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ek)
November 1, 2018 Chief Judge Jose L. Linares and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson added. (eu, )
October 31, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ZHENGYU HE. (ROSEN, LAURENCE)
October 31, 2018 Filing 2 Request for Summons to be Issued by ZHENGYU HE as to MARTIN CHEUNG, CHINA ZENIX AUTO INTERNATIONAL LIMITED, JIANHUI LAI. (ROSEN, LAURENCE)
October 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9138365) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ZHENGYU HE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 PSLRA Certification)(ROSEN, LAURENCE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HE v. CHINA ZENIX AUTO INTERNATIONAL LIMITED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZHENGYU HE
Represented By: LAURENCE M. ROSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTIN CHEUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JIANHUI LAI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHINA ZENIX AUTO INTERNATIONAL LIMITED
Represented By: DANA B. PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?