INTACT INSURANCE CO. et al v. DUTCHLAND REFRIGERATED TRANSPORT, INC. et al
Plaintiff: INTACT INSURANCE CO. and XPEDITR INC.
Defendant: ARTISAN MARKETING, LLC, DUTCHLAND REFRIGERATED TRANSPORT, INC. and SCL COLD CHAIN, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv15612
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: James B Clark
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANT SCL COLD CHAIN, LLC'S TIME TO ANSWER by SCL COLD CHAIN, LLC. (PARMAR, NARINDER)
December 28, 2018 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #11 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by DUTCHLAND REFRIGERATED TRANSPORT, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/2/2019. (mfr)
December 21, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM D. BIERMAN on behalf of DUTCHLAND REFRIGERATED TRANSPORT, INC. (BIERMAN, WILLIAM)
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Dutchland Refrigerated Transport, Inc... (MARTIN, THOMAS)
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS C. MARTIN on behalf of DUTCHLAND REFRIGERATED TRANSPORT, INC. (MARTIN, THOMAS)
December 21, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney . Motion set for 1/22/2019 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by INTACT INSURANCE CO., XPEDITR INC.. (KUHNER, SPENCER)
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN T. LILLIS, JR on behalf of INTACT INSURANCE CO., XPEDITR INC. (LILLIS, JOHN)
December 18, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document submitted by SCL COLD CHAIN, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/2/2019. (sm)
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to SCL COLD CHAIN, LLC.. (PARMAR, NARINDER)
December 7, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by NARINDER S. PARMAR on behalf of SCL COLD CHAIN, LLC (PARMAR, NARINDER)
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by GEORGE W. WRIGHT on behalf of SCL COLD CHAIN, LLC (WRIGHT, GEORGE)
November 2, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr)
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ARTISAN MARKETING, LLC, DUTCHLAND REFRIGERATED TRANSPORT, INC., SCL COLD CHAIN, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr)
November 2, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (jr)
November 2, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by XPEDITR INC.. (KUHNER, SPENCER)
November 2, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by INTACT INSURANCE CO. identifying INTACT FINANCIAL CORPORATION as Corporate Parent.. (KUHNER, SPENCER)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ARTISAN MARKETING, LLC, DUTCHLAND REFRIGERATED TRANSPORT, INC., SCL COLD CHAIN, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9144155) with JURY DEMAND, filed by INTACT INSURANCE CO., XPEDITR INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Artisan Marketing, LLC, #3 Summons Dutchland Refrigerated Transport, Inc., #4 Summons SCL Cold Chain, LLC)(KUHNER, SPENCER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INTACT INSURANCE CO. et al v. DUTCHLAND REFRIGERATED TRANSPORT, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARTISAN MARKETING, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUTCHLAND REFRIGERATED TRANSPORT, INC.
Represented By: THOMAS C. MARTIN
Represented By: WILLIAM D. BIERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCL COLD CHAIN, LLC
Represented By: NARINDER S. PARMAR
Represented By: GEORGE W. WRIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTACT INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: SPENCER H. KUHNER
Represented By: JOHN T. LILLIS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XPEDITR INC.
Represented By: SPENCER H. KUHNER
Represented By: JOHN T. LILLIS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?