HOFFEDITZ et al v. AM GENERAL, LLC et al
Plaintiff: GERALD L. HOFFEDITZ and JUDTIH L. HOFFEDITZ
Defendant: DANA CORPORATION, JOHN DOE CORPORATION(S) (1-50), GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION, SETCO AUTOMOTIVE, N.A., INCORPORATED, CHRYSLER LLC, PNEUMO-ABEX LLC, AM GENERAL, LLC, JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS 51-75, HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INCORPORATED, BORG-WARNER MORSE TEC, CUMMINS, INCORPORATED, DETROIT DIESEL CORPORATION, NATIONAL AUTOMOTIVE PARTS ASSOCIATION (NAPA), STANDARD MOTOR PRODUCTS INCORPORATED, FORD MOTOR COMP[ANY and ARVIN-MERITOR, INCORPORATED
Case Number: 2:2018cv15623
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Mark Falk
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Filing 182 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to AMBER R. LONG (mps)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER OF DISMISSAL; that the Clerk's Office is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 11/15/2018. (ld, )
November 2, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Mark Falk. (ak, )
November 2, 2018 Filing 180 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:09-cv-70103. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 30, 2018 Filing 179 Copy of Order from the JPML that the stay of the Panel's Conditional Remand Order is LIFTED insofar as it relates to this action: Hoffeditz, et al NJ 2:09-00257. This action is remanded to the District of New Jersey. (See docket no. 9020 in 01-md-875).(kp, ) (kp, )
October 23, 2018 Filing 178 Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Motion to Vacate Conditional Remand Order by JUDTIH L. HOFFEDITZ. (LONG, AMBER) Modified on 10/30/2018 (tjd).
September 17, 2018 Filing 177 NOTICE by ARVIN-MERITOR, INCORPORATED Notice of Opposition to September 10, 2018 Conditional Remand Order with Certificate of Service (HARRIS, BRANDY)
September 14, 2018 Filing 176 NOTICE of Appearance by BRANDY L HARRIS on behalf of ARVIN-MERITOR, INCORPORATED with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(HARRIS, BRANDY)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER THAT THE PUNITIVE DAMAGE CLAIM PREVIOUSLY SEVERED 8/12/2011 BE REMANDED TO THE DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY FOR RESOLUTION. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AM GENERAL'S MOTION TO DISMISS IS DENIED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/31/2018.8/31/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
August 14, 2018 Filing 174 NOTICE of Appearance by AMBER R. LONG on behalf of JUDTIH L. HOFFEDITZ (LONG, AMBER)
August 8, 2018 Filing 173 MOTION to Dismiss Severed Punitive Damages Claims Against AM General LLC re #169 Report Of,, Plaintiff re punitive damages claim as to other Defendants only, filed by AM GENERAL, LLC.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DESIPIO, ADAM)
August 8, 2018 Filing 172 Response in Opposition re #169 Report Of,, Plaintiff re Punitive Damages Claims by FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pl. Answers to Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit B (Part 1) - Pl. Jan. 7, 2009 Dep. Tr., #3 Exhibit B (Part 2) - Pl. Jan. 7, 2009 Dep. Tr., #4 Exhibit C (Part 1) - Pl. Jan. 8, 2009 Dep. Tr., #5 Exhibit C (Part 2) - Pl. Jan. 8, 2009 Dep. Tr., #6 Exhibit D - Pl. Jan. 9, 2009 Dep. Tr., #7 Exhibit E - Pl. March 17, 2009 Dep. Tr., #8 Exhibit F - Complaint, #9 Exhibit G - Finley Report, #10 Exhibit H - Fed. Reg. Excerpt, #11 Certificate of Service) (CAFFREY, SHARON)
August 8, 2018 Filing 171 Response in Opposition To Plaintiff's Report Regarding Punitive Damages Claims by CUMMINS, INCORPORATED. (BLOCK, MICHAEL)
July 12, 2018 Filing 170 Report Of Plaintiff Re punitive damages claim by JUDTIH L. HOFFEDITZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit X, #2 Exhibit Y, #3 Exhibit Z, #4 Exhibit AA, #5 Exhibit BB, #6 Exhibit CC)(LONG, AMBER)
July 11, 2018 Filing 169 Report Of Plaintiff Re punitive damages claim by JUDTIH L. HOFFEDITZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W)(LONG, AMBER)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER THAT A RULE IS ISSUED FOR PLAINTIFFS TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE SEVERED PUNITIVE DAMAGES CLAIMS IN REMANDED LAND-BASED MDL-875 CASES SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED AS HAVING BEEN SETTLED OR OTHERWISE TERMINATED AFTER REMAND OF THE COMPENSATORY CLAIMS. NO LATER THAN 7/11/2018, ANY PLAINTIFF WHO CONTENDS THAT HE OR SHE HAS A VIABLE PUNITIVE DAMAGE CLAIM THAT WAS SEVERED UPON REMAND OF HIS OR HER COMPENSATORY CLAIMS AND IS PENDING IN THIS COURT SHALL FILE A WRITTEN REPORT OUTLINING THE NATURE AND STATUS OF THE CLAIM. IN ANY SUCH CASES, DEFENDANTS MAY RESPOND NO LATER THAN 8/8/2018. THE COURT WILL THEN ADDRESS THOSE CLAIMS, IF ANY. ALL OTHER PUNITIVE DAMAGE CLAIMS IN REMANDED LAND-BASED CASES, FOR WHICH THE PLAINTIFFS DO NOT FILE REPORTS, WILL BE DISMISSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 5/2/2018. 5/7/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (SEE PAPER # 9016 IN 01-MD-875) (ems)
September 1, 2011 Certified copy of Remand Order along with copy of ED-PA docket mailed to the NJ-D. (tjd)
August 24, 2011 Filing 167 Copy of Conditional Remand Order from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that all claims in the actions on this order except the severed damages claims be remanded to its respective tranferor courts: AL-N 2:10-21; CA-C 2:10-1081; NC-W 1:07-314; NJ-D 2:09-257; VA-E 4:09-3268. (See Paper # 8076 in 01-md-875). (tjd)
August 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER THAT THE JOINT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BASED ON THE LACK OF ADMISSIBLE EXPERT TESTIMONY AS TO CAUSATION (DOC. #58) IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE WITH LEAVE TO RE-FILE IN THE TRANSFEROR DISTRICT COURT.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/22/2011.8/24/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER THAT DEFT, FORD MOTOR COMPANY'S MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION (DOC. #158) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/18/2011.8/22/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
August 15, 2011 Filing 164 AMENDED ORDER THE COURT SUGGESTS THAT THE BELOW-LISTED CASES SHOULD BE REMANDED TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY FOR RESOLUTION OF ALL MATTERS PENDING WITHIN THIS CASE EXCEPT PUNITIVE DAMAGES.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/12/2011. 8/16/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
August 11, 2011 Filing 163 AMENDED ANSWER BY ARVINMERITOR, INC., AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND CROSSCLAIMS. by ARVIN-MERITOR, INCORPORATED.(jaa, )
August 11, 2011 Filing 162 THE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANTS ARVINMERITOR, INC., AND ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION; AND HAVING CONSIDERED ANY OPPOSITION AND/OR RESPONSE THERETO, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE CLERK SHALL ACCEPT THE AMENDED ANSWER ATTACHED AS EXHIBIT A TO THE MOTION, FOR FILING AND SHALL DEEM IT FILED AS OF THIS DATE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/10/11.8/12/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jaa, )
August 11, 2011 Filing 161 AMENDED ANSWER by CUMMINS, INCORPORATED, WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND CROSSCLAIMS.(jaa, )
August 11, 2011 Filing 160 THE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FILED BY CUMMINS, INC. AND HAVING ANY OPPOSITION AND/OR RESPONSE THERETO, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE CLERK SHALL ACCEPT CUMMINS, INC. AMENDED ANSWER, ATTACHED AS EXHIBIT A TO THE MOTION, FOR FILING AND SHALL DEEM IT FILED AS OF THIS DATE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/10/11.8/12/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jaa, ) Modified on 8/12/2011 (jaa, ).
August 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER THE COURT SUGGESTS THAT THE BELOW-LISTED CASES SHOULD BE REMANDED TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY FOR RESOLUTION OF ALL MATTERS PENDING WITHIN THIS CASE EXCEPT PUNITIVE DAMAGES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/10/11. 8/12/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jaa, )
August 11, 2011 Filing 158 MOTION for Clarification or Reconsideration In Part, and Certification for Interlocutory Appeal of the Courts July 29, 2011 Order denying Fords motion for summary judgment (Doc. 155) filed by FORD MOTOR COMPANY.Memorandum of Law and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(POLLACK, JEFFREY)
August 10, 2011 Filing 157 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re #156 Transcript - PDF, 8/10/2011 Entered and Copies Emailed. (tomg, )
August 10, 2011 Filing 156 TRANSCRIPT of HEARING held on 7/18/2011, before Judge ROBRENO. Court Reporter/Transcriber J. MATKOWSKI & S. HALL. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 8/29/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/7/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/7/2011. (tomg, )
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFT, FORD MOTOR COMPANY (DOC. #59) IS DENIED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/28/2011.7/29/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED(tomg, )
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFT, ARVIN-MERITOR, INC. (DOC. #60) IS DENIED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/28/2011.7/29/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFT, DANA COMPANIES, INC. (DOC. #56) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/28/2011.7/29/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFT, CUMMINS, INC. (DOC. #55) IS DENIED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/28/2011.7/29/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFT, DETROIT DIELSEL CORP. (DOC. #53) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/28/2011.7/29/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFT, AM GENERAL, LLC (DOC. #52) IS DENIED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/28/2011.7/29/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFT, STANDARD MOTOR PRODUCTS, INC. (DOC. #51) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/28/2011.7/29/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
July 22, 2011 Filing 148 NOTICE by GERALD L. HOFFEDITZ, JUDTIH L. HOFFEDITZ re #147 Notice (Other) in response to ArvinMeritor, Inc., request for oral argument (LAKIND, ARNOLD)
July 21, 2011 Filing 147 NOTICE by ARVIN-MERITOR, INCORPORATED of Defendants ArvinMeritor and Rockwell International Request for Oral Argument of Defendants Joint Motion for Summary Judgment (HSU, MARK)
July 15, 2011 Filing 146 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL P. KINKOPF on behalf of FORD MOTOR COMPANY with Certificate of Service(KINKOPF, MICHAEL)
July 14, 2011 Filing 145 Memorandum (Letter Updating case law in Plaintiffs' Opposition to Detroit Diesel's Motion for Summary Judgment) re #53 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GERALD L. HOFFEDITZ, JUDTIH L. HOFFEDITZ. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BLUMSTEIN, JEFFREY)
July 14, 2011 Filing 144 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY P. BLUMSTEIN on behalf of GERALD L. HOFFEDITZ, JUDTIH L. HOFFEDITZ (BLUMSTEIN, JEFFREY)
July 14, 2011 Filing 143 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT G. STEVENS, JR on behalf of GERALD L. HOFFEDITZ, JUDTIH L. HOFFEDITZ (STEVENS, ROBERT)
July 13, 2011 Filing 142 MOTION to Amend/Correct Answer filed by ARVIN-MERITOR, INCORPORATED, Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memo of Law, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(AMENDED ANSWER ATTACHED)(GARDINER, DONNA) Modified on 7/14/2011 (md).
July 11, 2011 Filing 141 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Answer filed by CUMMINS, INCORPORATED, Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit, #4 Certificate of Service)(AMENDED ANSWER ATTACHED)(BUBA, BARBARA) Modified on 7/12/2011 (md).
July 8, 2011 Filing 140 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in support of Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer filed by CUMMINS, INCORPORATED, Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(BUBA, BARBARA) (SEE PAPER #141) Modified on 7/11/2011 (md).
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER THAT THE PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED FINAL PRE-REMAND CONFERENCE AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING SET FOR 7/20/2011 IS RESCHEDULED FOR MONDAY, 7/18/2011 AT 10:00 A.M, IN COURTROOM 11A... SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/5/2011. 7/6/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
July 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND THE CASE TO THE SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY, MIDDLESEX COUNTY (DOC. #4) IS DENIED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/1/2011.7/5/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
June 28, 2011 Filing 137 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by AM GENERAL, LLC.Memorandum and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Law in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(RAPPAPORT, NANCY)
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER THAT A HEARING ON ALL OPPOSED SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS, LISTED IN EXHIBIT "A" ATTACHED, IS SCHEDULED FOR WEDNESDAY, 7/20/2011 AT 10:00 A.M., IN COURTROOM 11A, ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 6/15/2011. 6/17/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
June 16, 2011 Filing 135 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ARVIN-MERITOR, INCORPORATED re #134 Notice of Appearance (HSU, MARK)
June 16, 2011 Filing 134 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK K. HSU on behalf of ARVIN-MERITOR, INCORPORATED (HSU, MARK)
June 8, 2011 Filing 133 Defendant Ford Motor Company's ANSWER to Complaint together with Affirmative Defenses by FORD MOTOR COMPANY.(KINKOPF, MICHAEL)
June 8, 2011 Filing 132 NOTICE of Appearance by DONNA DUBETH GARDINER on behalf of ARVIN-MERITOR, INCORPORATED with Certifcate of Serice (Attachments: #1 Cert. of Service)(GARDINER, DONNA)
June 2, 2011 Filing 131 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ARVIN-MERITOR, INCORPORATED (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Appearance of John Canoni)(GARDINER, DONNA)
June 2, 2011 Filing 130 REPLY to Response to Motion re #58 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by AM GENERAL, LLC, ARVIN-MERITOR, INCORPORATED, CUMMINS, INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Donna duBeth Gardiner, #2 Appendix Certification of Service, #3 Exhibit Exhibits I-K, #4 Exhibit Exhibits L-Q)(GARDINER, DONNA)
May 20, 2011 Filing 129 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by DANA CORPORATION.Motion for Leave to File an Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint.(WEINER, STEVEN)
May 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER THAT DEFT, FORD MOTOR COMPANY'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED ANSWER (DOC. #125) IS GRANTED AS UNOPPOSED. DEFTS' MOTION TO STRIKE THE AFFIDAVIT OF LAURA WELCH, M.D. (DOC. #110) IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF'S CROSS-MOTION TO STRIKE THE AFFIDAVIT OF RONALD MORGAN, M.D. (DOC. #117) IS DENIED. ORAL ARGUMENT ON ALL PENDIND DAUBERT AND DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS WILL BE HELD ON 7/13/2011 AT 10:30 A.M., ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 5/12/2011.5/12/2011 FAXED AND/OR MAILED BY CHAMBERS.5/13/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(tomg, )
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS SHALL HAVE AN ADDITIONAL 20 DAYS, ON OR BEFORE 5/17/2011, TO FILE ANY OPPOSITION TO DEFT, FORD MOTOR COMPANY'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED ANSWER.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 5/5/2011. 5/9/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
April 28, 2011 Filing 126 REQUEST For Extension of Time to File Opposition to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint(Consented to by the Parties) by GERALD L. HOFFEDITZ, JUDTIH L. HOFFEDITZ. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LYTLE, ROBERT) Modified on 4/29/2011 (md).
April 20, 2011 Filing 125 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by FORD MOTOR COMPANY.Memorandum of Law, Brief, Certificate of Service.(KINKOPF, MICHAEL)
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER THAT THE DEFTS, GENUINE PARTS COMPANY, ON ITS BEHALF AND ON BEHALF OF NATIONAL AUTOMOTIVE PARTS ASSOCIATION, QUAKER CITY MOTOR PARTS COMPANY, INC., ARE HEREBY DISCONTINUED WITH PREJUDICE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 3/10/2011. 3/11/2011 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
February 22, 2011 Filing 123 STIPULATION of Dismissal by NATIONAL AUTOMOTIVE PARTS ASSOCIATION (NAPA). (FELLMAN, SUSAN) (COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 2/23/2011 (md).
November 1, 2010 Filing 122 REPLY to Response to Motion re #110 First MOTION to Strike Affidavit of Laura Welch, M.D. filed by ARVIN-MERITOR, INCORPORATED, CUMMINS, INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Counsel's Declaration, #2 Certificate of Service)(GARDINER, DONNA)
October 25, 2010 Filing 121 REPLY to Response to Motion re #110 First MOTION to Strike Affidavit of Laura Welch, M.D. reply brief and declaration of counsel filed by ARVIN-MERITOR, INCORPORATED, CUMMINS, INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of counsel, #2 Affidavit of service)(GARDINER, DONNA)
October 25, 2010 Filing 120 RESPONSE in Opposition re #111 First MOTION to Compel Deposition of James Strauchen, M.D., or in the alternative to preclude his testimony Reply brief and declaration filed by ARVIN-MERITOR, INCORPORATED, CUMMINS, INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of counsel, #2 Affidavit of service)(GARDINER, DONNA)
October 19, 2010 Filing 119 STIPULATION by and between all parties that Defendants AM General, LLC, Cummins, Inc., and ArvinMeritor, Inc./Rockwell International will be permitted to conduct a limited deposition on the issue of causation of Jacqueline Moline, M.D., Defendants will consent to extend the time for the Plaintiff to file an Opposition to the Motion to Compel the deposition of James Strauchen, M.D., or in the alternative, to preclude his testimony, up to 30 days from the current due date and Defendants will consent to extend the time for the Plaintiff to file an Opposition to the Motion to Strike the Affidavit of Laura Welch, M.D., up to 30 days from its current due date by GERALD L. HOFFEDITZ, JUDTIH L. HOFFEDITZ. (FALDA, NATHANIEL) (COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 10/20/2010 (md).
October 19, 2010 Filing 118 NOTICE of Appearance by NATHANIEL N FALDA on behalf of GERALD L. HOFFEDITZ, JUDTIH L. HOFFEDITZ with Certificate of Service(FALDA, NATHANIEL)
October 18, 2010 Filing 117 RESPONSE in Opposition re #110 First MOTION to Strike Affidavit of Laura Welch, M.D. filed by GERALD L. HOFFEDITZ, JUDTIH L. HOFFEDITZ. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support, #2 Cross-Motion To Strike Affidavit of Ronald Morgan, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(LAKIND, ARNOLD)
October 18, 2010 Filing 116 RESPONSE in Opposition re #111 First MOTION to Compel Deposition of James Strauchen, M.D., or in the alternative to preclude his testimony filed by GERALD L. HOFFEDITZ, JUDTIH L. HOFFEDITZ. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Service)(LYTLE, ROBERT)
October 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER THAT RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS ARVINMERITOR AND ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF JAMES STRAUCHEN, M.D. AND MOTION TO STRIKE THE AFFIDAVIT OF LAURA WELCH, M.D. MUST BE FILED BY 10/18/2010; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 10/7/2010. 10/7/2010 FAXED AND/OR MAILED BY CHAMBERS. 10/7/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(tomg, )
October 4, 2010 Filing 114 Request for Oral Argument on all pending motions by GERALD L. HOFFEDITZ, JUDTIH L. HOFFEDITZ. (LAKIND, ARNOLD)
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER THAT THE HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/5/2010 (DOC. NO. 112) WAS ENTERED IN ERROR,ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 9/27/2010. 9/29/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kk, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 112 AMENDED ORDER THAT HEARINGS ON ALL PENDING MOTIONS, INCLUDING SUMMARY JUDGMENT, WILL BE HELD ON 10/5/2010 AT 10:00AM IN COURTROOM 11A. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THIS CONFERENCE CONSTITUTES THE FINAL PREMAND CONFERENCE IN EACH OF THESE CASES...ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 9/23/2010. 9/28/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kp, )
September 24, 2010 Filing 111 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Motion to Compel Deposition of James Strauchen, M.D., or in the alternative to preclude his testimony filed by ARVIN-MERITOR, INCORPORATED, Declaration of Counsel, and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Affidavit Certificate of Service, #4 Text of Proposed Order Order, #5 Affidavit Declaration, #6 Supplement Notice of Motion)(GARDINER, DONNA) Modified on 9/27/2010 (md).
September 24, 2010 Filing 110 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Motion to Strike Affidavit of Laura Welch, M.D. filed by ARVIN-MERITOR, INCORPORATED, Declaration of Counsel, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Affidavit Certificate of Service, #7 Supplement Notice of Motion, #8 Text of Proposed Order Order)(GARDINER, DONNA) Modified on 9/27/2010 (md).
September 10, 2010 Filing 109 RESPONSE in Opposition re #58 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GERALD L. HOFFEDITZ, JUDTIH L. HOFFEDITZ. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Arnold C. Lakind, #2 Tabs 1-3 to Lakind Declaration, #3 Tab 4, part 1 to Lakind Declaration, #4 Tab 4, part 2 to Lakind Declaration, #5 Tab 4, part 3 to Lakind Declaration, #6 Tab 4, part 4 to Lakind Declaration, #7 Tab 5 to Lakind Declaration, #8 Tabs 6-8 to Lakind Declaration, #9 Tab 9 to Lakind Declaration, #10 Tabs 10-11 to Lakind Declaration, #11 Tabs 12-15 to Lakind Declaration, #12 Tabs 16-19 to Lakind Declaration, #13 Tab 20 to Lakind Declaration, #14 Tab 21, part 1 to Lakind Declaration, #15 Tab 21, part 2 to Lakind Declaration, #16 Tabs 22-25 to Lakind Declaration, #17 Tab 26, part 1 to Lakind Declaration, #18 Tab 26, part 2 to Lakind Declaration, #19 Tabs 27-29 to Lakind Declaration, #20 Tabs 30-31 to Lakind Declaration, #21 Tab 32, part 1 to Lakind Declaration, #22 Tab 32, part 2 to Lakind Declaration, #23 Tab 32, part 3 to Lakind Declaration, #24 Tab 32, part 4 to Lakind Declaration, #25 Tab 32, part 5 to Lakind Declaration, #26 Tab 33, part 1 to Lakind Declaration, #27 Tab 33, part 2 to Lakind Declaration, #28 Tab 34, part 1 to Lakind Declaration, #29 Tab 34, part 2 to Lakind Declaration, #30 Tab 35 to Lakind Declaration, #31 Tab 36 to Lakind Declaration, #32 Tab 37 to Lakind Declaration, #33 Tab 38 to Lakind Declaration, #34 Tab 39 to Lakind Declaration, #35 Tab 40 to Lakind Declaration, #36 Tab 41 to Lakind Declaration, #37 Tabs 42-43 to Lakind Declaration, #38 Tab 44, part 1 to Lakind Declaration, #39 Tab 44, part 2 to Lakind Declaration, #40 Tab 44, part 3 to Lakind Declaration, #41 Tab 45 to Lakind Declaration, #42 Tab 46 to Lakind Declaration, #43 Tabs 47 - 49 to Lakind Declaration, #44 Tabs 50-51 to Lakind Declaration, #45 Tabs 52-54 to Lakind Declaration, #46 Tab 55-59 to Lakind Declaration, #47 Tabs 60-61 to Lakind Declaration, #48 Tabs 62-64 to Lakind Declaration, #49 Tab 65, part 1 to Lakind Declaration, #50 Tab 65, part 2 to Lakind Declaration, #51 Tab 65, part 3 to Lakind Declaration, #52 Affidavit of Dr. Laura Welch, #53 Exhibit 1-2 to Welch Affidavit, #54 Exhibit 3-4 to Welch Affidavit, #55 Affidavit Dr. Jacqueline Moline, #56 Certificate of Service)(LAKIND, ARNOLD)
September 9, 2010 Filing 108 REPLY to Response to Motion re #55 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CUMMINS, INCORPORATED. (BLOCK, MICHAEL)
September 9, 2010 Filing 107 RESPONSE in Opposition re #52 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief in Support of Motion with Exhibits, Proposed Order and Certificate of Service Defendant AM General LLC's Supplemental Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Summary Judgment filed by AM GENERAL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit C)(RAPPAPORT, NANCY)
September 9, 2010 Filing 106 REPLY to Response to Motion re #60 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ARVIN-MERITOR, INCORPORATED. (GARDINER, DONNA)
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER THAT HEARINGS ON ALL PENDING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN THE CASES LISTED IN EXHIBIT "A", ATTACHED, WILL BE HELD ON TUESDAY, OCTOBER 5TH, 2010 AT 10:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 11A, JAMES A.. BYRNE UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PENNSYLVANIA, 19106. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT ANY PREVIOULSY SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCES IN THESE CASES ARE RESCHEDULED FOR TUESDAY OCTOBER 5TH AT 10:00 A.M. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 9/2/2010. 9/3/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(stwe, ) Modified on 9/3/2010 (stwe, ).
August 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER THAT THE 8/16/2010 ORDER GRANTING VARIOUS DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS UNOPPOSED IS AMENDED TO REMOVE DEFENDANT NAPA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. NO.67) FROM THE LIST OF "TERMINATED MOTIONS". SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/23/2010. 9/1/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kk, )
August 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT, LISTED IN EXHIBIT "A", ATTACHED, ARE GRANTED; AND THAT EACH DEFENDANT LISTED IN EXHIBIT "A", ATTACHED, SHALL BE MARKED TERMINATED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/16/2010. 8/28/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. (aeg, )
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE ORDER STRIKING COL. (r) STODDART'S AFFIDAVIT (DOC. #82) IS DENIED. THE MOTIONS TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS' CROSS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOC. #80,81,83) ARE GRANTED. THE CLERK IS DIRECTED TO MARK THE FOLLOWING CROSS-MOTIONS "STRICKEN FROM RECORD); ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 8/26/2010.8/26/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(tomg, )
August 23, 2010 Filing 101 Rule 26 (a) Disclosure on behalf of DANA CORPORATION. (WEINER, STEVEN) Modified on 8/25/2010 (fh)
August 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, LISTED IN EXHIBIT "A", ATTACHED, ARE GRANTED. EACH DEFENDANT LISTED IN EXHIBIT "A", ATTACHED, SHALL BE MARKED TERMINATED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/16/2010.8/23/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
August 16, 2010 Filing 99 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL: Telephone Conference held on 8/11/2010 (afm, )
August 13, 2010 Filing 97 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL: Telephone Conference held on 8/12/2010 (tomg, )
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER THAT THE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS ARVINMERITOR AND ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THEIR OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S CROSS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS EXTENDED 14 DAYS AFTER DECISION ON THE PENDING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND ITS PENDING MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S CROSS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 8/13/2010. 8/13/2010 FAXED AND/OR MAILED BY CHAMBERS. 8/13/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(tomg, )
August 12, 2010 Filing 95 RESPONSE in Support re #59 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Defendant, Ford Motor Company, filed by FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AA, #2 Certificate of Service)(WEILL, ELIZABETH)
August 12, 2010 Filing 94 REPLY to Response to Motion re #51 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by STANDARD MOTOR PRODUCTS, INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Reply Brief in Further Support of Defendant Standard Motor Products, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment)(O'LEARY, RICHARD)
August 12, 2010 Filing 93 REPLY to Response to Motion re #52 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief in Support of Motion with Exhibits, Proposed Order and Certificate of Service Defendant AM General, LLC's Brief in Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Summary Judgment filed by AM GENERAL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit a, #2 Exhibit b)(RAPPAPORT, NANCY)
August 12, 2010 Filing 92 RESPONSE in Support re #53 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DETROIT DIESEL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(FINCH, EDWARD)
August 12, 2010 Filing 91 REPLY to Response to Motion re #55 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CUMMINS, INCORPORATED. (BLOCK, MICHAEL)
August 12, 2010 Filing 90 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL: Telephone Conference held on 8/11/2010 (tomg, )
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER THAT THE COURT WILL NOT PERMIT THE FILING OF REPLY BRIEFS IN SUPPORT OF THE PENDING MOTIONS FOR RECONSIDERATION AND TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS' CROSS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. THE DEADLINE FOR SUBMITTING A REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THE SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION BASED ON GOVERNMENT CONTRACTOR AND SOPHISTICATED INTERMEDIARY DEFENSES IS EXTENDED 14 DAYS AFTER DECISION ON THE PENDING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 8/10/2010. 8/10/2010 FAXED AND/OR MAILED BY CHAMBERS. 8/12/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(tomg, )
August 10, 2010 Filing 88 REPLY to Response to Motion re #56 First MOTION for Summary Judgment on behalf of Dana Corporation filed by DANA CORPORATION. (WEINER, STEVEN)
August 6, 2010 Filing 87 RESPONSE in Opposition re #82 MOTION for Reconsideration re #79 Order on Motion to Compel, MOTION for Reconsideration re #79 Order on Motion to Compel, filed by GERALD L. HOFFEDITZ, JUDTIH L. HOFFEDITZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C of Brief, #2 Declaration of Nathaniel Falda, #3 Exhibit A to F of Falda Declaration, #4 Exhibit G to K of Falda Declaration, #5 Exhibit L to R of Falda Declaration, #6 Certificate of Service)(LYTLE, ROBERT)
August 5, 2010 Filing 86 RESPONSE to Motion re #81 MOTION to Strike #73 Response in Opposition to Motion, #83 MOTION to Strike #77 Response in Opposition to Motion, Defendant Cummins, Inc.'s Motion Join Defendant AM General's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment MOTION to Strike #77 Response in Opposition to Motion, Defendant Cummins, Inc.'s Motion Join Defendant AM General's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment, #80 MOTION to Strike #73 Response in Opposition to Motion,, Defendant AM General, LLC's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment with Memorandum in Suppport MOTION to Strike #73 Response in Opposition to Motion,, Defendant AM General, LLC's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment with Memorandum in Suppport Amended Certificate of Service filed by GERALD L. HOFFEDITZ, JUDTIH L. HOFFEDITZ. (LYTLE, ROBERT) (AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED IN ERROR AS A RESPONSE) Modified on 8/9/2010 (md).
August 4, 2010 Filing 85 RESPONSE to Motion re #81 MOTION to Strike #73 Response in Opposition to Motion,,, #83 MOTION to Strike #77 Response in Opposition to Motion, Defendant Cummins, Inc.'s Motion Join Defendant AM General's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment MOTION to Strike #77 Response in Opposition to Motion, Defendant Cummins, Inc.'s Motion Join Defendant AM General's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment, #80 MOTION to Strike #73 Response in Opposition to Motion,, Defendant AM General, LLC's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment with Memorandum in Suppport MOTION to Strike #73 Response in Opposition to Motion,, Defendant AM General, LLC's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment with Memorandum in Suppport filed by GERALD L. HOFFEDITZ, JUDTIH L. HOFFEDITZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to D, part 1, #2 Exhibit D, part 2, #3 Exhibit D, Part 3 through F, #4 Certificate of Service)(LYTLE, ROBERT)
August 4, 2010 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by ARNOLD C. LAKIND on behalf of GERALD L. HOFFEDITZ, JUDTIH L. HOFFEDITZ (LAKIND, ARNOLD)
July 26, 2010 Filing 83 MOTION to Strike #77 Response in Opposition to Motion, Defendant Cummins, Inc.'s Motion Join Defendant AM General's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment filed by CUMMINS, INCORPORATED.Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion, #2 Form of Order, #3 Cert of Service)(BLOCK, MICHAEL)
July 23, 2010 Filing 82 MOTION for Reconsideration re #79 Order on Motion to Compel, filed by ARVIN-MERITOR, INCORPORATED.memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion, #2 Rubin Declaration, #3 Gardiner Declaration with Exhibits A-M, #4 Exhibits N-X, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certification of Service)(GARDINER, DONNA)
July 22, 2010 Filing 81 MOTION to Strike #73 Response in Opposition to Motion,, filed by ARVIN-MERITOR, INCORPORATED.memorandum. (Attachments: #1 notice of motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Cert of service)(GARDINER, DONNA)
July 21, 2010 Filing 80 MOTION to Strike #73 Response in Opposition to Motion,, Defendant AM General, LLC's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment with Memorandum in Suppport filed by AM GENERAL, LLC.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(RAPPAPORT, NANCY)
July 16, 2010 Filing 98 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL: Telephone Conference held on 7/14/2010 (afm, )
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS (DOC.#63) IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 7/15/2010.7/15/2010 FAXED AND/OR MAILED BY CHAMBERS7/19/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(tomg, )
July 14, 2010 Filing 78 RESPONSE in Opposition re #52 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief in Support of Motion with Exhibits, Proposed Order and Certificate of Service (Revised Documents) filed by GERALD L. HOFFEDITZ, JUDTIH L. HOFFEDITZ. (Attachments: #1 Revised Brief in Opp to AM General Motion, #2 Exhibit Revised Exhibit 3, Pt. 1 to Falda Declaration)(LYTLE, ROBERT)
July 12, 2010 Filing 77 RESPONSE in Opposition re #55 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GERALD L. HOFFEDITZ, JUDTIH L. HOFFEDITZ. (Attachments: #1 Cross Motion,(STRICKEN PER THIS COURT'S ORDER #102), (2) Declaration and Exhibit 1 and 2, #3 Exhibit 3, part 1 of 2, #4 Exhibit 3, part 2 of 2, #5 Exhibit 4-5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7-10, #8 Exhibit 11, #9 Text of Proposed Order, #10 Certificate of Service)(LYTLE, ROBERT) Modified on 8/26/2010 (tomg, ).
July 12, 2010 Filing 76 RESPONSE in Opposition re #59 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GERALD L. HOFFEDITZ, JUDTIH L. HOFFEDITZ. (Attachments: #1 Declaration and Exhibits 1 and 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4-6, #4 Exhibit 7-9, #5 Exhibit 10-14, #6 Exhibit 15-16, #7 Exhibit 17-18, #8 Exhibit 19, #9 Exhibit 20-24, #10 Certificate of Service)(LYTLE, ROBERT)
July 12, 2010 Filing 75 RESPONSE in Opposition re #60 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GERALD L. HOFFEDITZ, JUDTIH L. HOFFEDITZ. (Attachments: #1 Cross Motion,(STRICKEN PER THIS COURT'S ORDER #102), #2 Declaration with Exhibits 1 & 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4-6, #5 Exhibit 7-9, #6 Exhibit 10, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Certificate of Service)(LYTLE, ROBERT) Modified on 8/26/2010 (tomg, ).
July 12, 2010 Filing 74 RESPONSE in Opposition re #56 First MOTION for Summary Judgment on behalf of Dana Corporation filed by GERALD L. HOFFEDITZ, JUDTIH L. HOFFEDITZ. (Attachments: #1 Declaration with Exhibits 1 & 2, #2 Exhibit 3. pt. 1, #3 Exhibit 3, pt. 2, #4 Exhibit 4-6, #5 Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit 8-10, #7 Exhibit 11-13, #8 Exhibit 14-16, #9 Exhibit 17, #10 Certificate of Service)(LYTLE, ROBERT)
July 12, 2010 Filing 73 RESPONSE in Opposition re #52 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief in Support of Motion with Exhibits, Proposed Order and Certificate of Service filed by GERALD L. HOFFEDITZ, JUDTIH L. HOFFEDITZ. (Attachments: #1 Cross Motion (STRICKEN PER THIS COURT'S ORDER #102), #2 Declaration & Exhibits 1 & 2, #3 Exhibit 3, Pt. 1, #4 Exhibit 3 Pt, 2, #5 Exhibit 4-6, #6 Exhibit 7-9, #7 Exhibit 10-11, #8 Exhibit 12, #9 Exhibit 13-15, #10 Exhibit 16, pt. 1, #11 Exhibit 16, pt. 2, #12 Exhibit 17, #13 Text of Proposed Order, #14 Cert. of Service)(LYTLE, ROBERT) Modified on 8/26/2010 (tomg, ).
July 12, 2010 Filing 72 RESPONSE in Opposition re #53 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GERALD L. HOFFEDITZ, JUDTIH L. HOFFEDITZ. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit and exhibit 1 & 2, #2 Exhibit 3, pt. 1, #3 Exhibit 3, pt. 2, #4 Exhibit 4-5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7-9, #7 Cert. of Service)(LYTLE, ROBERT)
July 12, 2010 Filing 71 RESPONSE in Opposition re #63 MOTION to Compel Depositions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(f) MOTION to Compel Depositions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(f) AM General's LLC's Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel the Deposition of Robert W. Morgan, M.D. Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.56(F) filed by AM GENERAL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(RAPPAPORT, NANCY)
July 12, 2010 Filing 70 RESPONSE to Motion re #51 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GERALD L. HOFFEDITZ, JUDTIH L. HOFFEDITZ. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nathaniel Falda, Esq., #2 Exhibit 3 to 6 of the Declaration of Nathaniel Falda, Esq., #3 Certificate of Service)(LYTLE, ROBERT)
July 12, 2010 Filing 69 RESPONSE in Opposition re #63 MOTION to Compel Depositions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(f) MOTION to Compel Depositions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(f) filed by ARVIN-MERITOR, INCORPORATED, CUMMINS, INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Appendix, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(GARDINER, DONNA)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER THAT ALL RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS MUST BE FILED BY 7/12/2010. ORAL ARGUMENT ON THE MOTION WILL BE HEARD DURING A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE CALL ON 7/14/2010 AT 3:30 P.M., ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 7/6/2010. 7/6/2010 FAXED AND/OR MAILED BY CHAMBERS. 7/8/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(tomg, )
June 28, 2010 Filing 67 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by NATIONAL AUTOMOTIVE PARTS ASSOCIATION (NAPA).Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Statement of Material Facts in Support of Defendant National Automotive Parts Association's Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Supplement Brief in Support of Suppor of Summary Judgment Motion on Behalf of National Automotive Parts Association, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #4 Affidavit Certification of Filing and Service, #5 Affidavit Certificate of Counsel, #6 Exhibit Exhibits A-B, #7 Exhibit Exhibits C-F)(FELLMAN, SUSAN)
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER THAT THE DEADLINE FOR THE FILING OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS HEREBY EXTENDED THIRTY DAYS TO 8/12/2010.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 6/24/2010. 6/24/2010 FAXED AND/OR MAILED BY CHAMBERS. 6/25/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(tomg, )
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER THAT THE REQUEST TO FILE A MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BEYOND THE DEADLINE IS GRANTED AS UNOPPOSED. DEFENDANT NATIONAL AUTOMOTIVE PARTS ASSOCIATION MAY FILE ITS SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION BY 6/30/2010.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 6/24/2010. 6/24/2010 FAXED AND/OR MAILED BY CHAMBERS. 6/25/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(tomg, )
June 22, 2010 Filing 64 Declaration re #63 MOTION to Compel Depositions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(f) MOTION to Compel Depositions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(f) by GERALD L. HOFFEDITZ, JUDTIH L. HOFFEDITZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 10-17)(LYTLE, ROBERT)
June 22, 2010 Filing 63 MOTION to Compel Depositions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(f) filed by GERALD L. HOFFEDITZ, JUDTIH L. HOFFEDITZ.Brief, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Brief in Support of Motion to Compel, #4 Affirmation of Nathaniel Falda)(LYTLE, ROBERT)
June 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER THAT THE DEADLINE FOR THE FILING OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANTS, ARVINMERITOR, INC. AND ROCKEWELL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION; AM GENERAL, LLC; AND CUMMINS, INC., IS HEREBY EXTENDED TO 8/12/2010; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 6/17/2010. 6/17/2010 FAXED AND/OR MAILED BY CHAMBERS 6/18/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(tomg, )
June 11, 2010 Filing 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by PNEUMO-ABEX, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification (Exhibits filed in hard-copy), #2 Statement of Material Facts, #3 Brief in Support, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(tomg, )
June 10, 2010 Filing 60 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ARVIN-MERITOR, INCORPORATED.Brief. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Material Facts, #2 Brief, #3 Gardiner Declaration with Exhibits A-G, #4 Ketcham Declaration, #5 Stoddart Declaration(STRICKEN FROM RECORD, PER THIS COURT'S ORDER PAPER #79), #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certification of Service)(GARDINER, DONNA) Modified on 7/19/2010 (tomg, ).
June 10, 2010 Filing 59 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FORD MOTOR COMPANY.Motion, Statement of Material Facts. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum of Law, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B - Part 1, #6 Exhibit B - Part 2, #7 Exhibit B - Part 3, #8 Exhibit B - Part 4, #9 Exhibit C - Part 1, #10 Exhibit C - Part 2, #11 Exhibit C - Part 3, #12 Exhibit D - Part 1, #13 Exhibit D - Part 2, #14 Exhibit E, #15 Exhibit F)(WEILL, ELIZABETH)
June 10, 2010 Filing 58 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by AM GENERAL, LLC, ARVIN-MERITOR, INCORPORATED, CUMMINS, INCORPORATED.Notice of Motion. (Attachments: #1 Rule 56.1 Statement of Facts, #2 Brief, #3 Affidavit Gardiner Declaration with Exhibits, #4 Affidavit Affidavit of Dr. Morgan, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of service)(GARDINER, DONNA)
June 10, 2010 Filing 57 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by BORG-WARNER MORSE TEC.Brief, Statement of Material Facts, Certification of Counsel, Certification of Service. Proposed Form of Order. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Statement of Material Facts in Support of Defendant BorgWarner Morse Tec's Summary Judgment Motion, #2 Supplement Brief in Support of Defendant BorgWarner Morse Tec's Summary Judgment Motion, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order in Support of Defendant BorgWarner Morse Tec's Summary Judgment Motion, #4 Affidavit Certification of Counsel attaching Exhibits A-G in 3 separate attachments in support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Defendant BorgWarner, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A of Certification of Counsel in Support of Defendant BorgWarner's Motion for Summary Judgment, #6 Exhibit Exhibits B, C, and D of Certification of Counsel in Support of Defendant BorgWarner's Motion for Summary Judgment, #7 Exhibit Exhibits E, F, and G of Certification of Counsel in Support of Defendant BorgWarner's Motion for Summary Judgment, #8 Affidavit Certification of Service)(SATZ, STEVEN)
June 10, 2010 Filing 56 First MOTION for Summary Judgment on behalf of Dana Corporation filed by DANA CORPORATION.Memorandum, Brief, Affidavit, Declaration, Certificate of Counsel or Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Memorandum of Law, #2 Appendix Statement of Material Facts, #3 Affidavit Certification of Counsel, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C-1, #7 Exhibit C-2, #8 Exhibit C-3, #9 Exhibit C-4, #10 Exhibit D, #11 Exhibit E, #12 Exhibit F, #13 Text of Proposed Order Order, #14 Appendix Certification of Service)(WEINER, STEVEN)
June 10, 2010 Filing 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CUMMINS, INCORPORATED.Brief, Certificate of Counsel, Certificate of Service.(BLOCK, MICHAEL)
June 10, 2010 Filing 54 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by SETCO AUTOMOTIVE, N.A., INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(ADE, BRIAN)
June 10, 2010 Filing 53 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DETROIT DIESEL CORPORATION.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Memorandum of Law, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit H, #13 Exhibit I)(FINCH, EDWARD)
June 10, 2010 Filing 52 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief in Support of Motion with Exhibits, Proposed Order and Certificate of Service filed by AM GENERAL, LLC.Brief in Support of Motion and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J)(RAPPAPORT, NANCY)
June 9, 2010 Filing 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by STANDARD MOTOR PRODUCTS, INCORPORATED.Affidavit, Memorandum, Order, Certificaton of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F)(O'LEARY, RICHARD)
June 9, 2010 Filing 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Setco Automotive, N.A., Inc. filed by SETCO AUTOMOTIVE, N.A., INCORPORATED.Motion for Summary Judgment, Statement of Material Facts, Certification of Counsel, Brief, Declaration of Filing and Proposed Order. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Declaration of Service, #4 Statement of Material Facts, #5 Brief, #6 Certification of Anita Cohen, #7 Exhibits to Certification)(ADE, BRIAN)
June 2, 2010 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD T. FINCH on behalf of DETROIT DIESEL CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(FINCH, EDWARD)
May 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR COURT AID TO RESOLVE OUTSTANDING FACT-BASED DISCOVERY DISPUTES IS DENIED AS UNTIMELY; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 5/21/2010. 5/21/2010 FAXED AND/OR MAILED BY CHAMBERS. 5/27/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(tomg, )
May 17, 2010 Filing 47 Disclosure with with Certificate of Service by AM GENERAL, LLC.(RAPPAPORT, NANCY)
May 17, 2010 Filing 46 NOTICE of Change of Address by ELIZABETH A. WEILL(WEILL, ELIZABETH)
May 17, 2010 Filing 45 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel, ELIZABETH A. WEILL, ESQUIRE for the appearance of EDWARD T. FINCH, ESQUIRE on behalf of defendant, FORD MOTOR COMPANY with Certificate of Service(tomg, )
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER THAT THE UNOPPOSED REQUEST TO EXTEND THE DEADLINE FOR THESE DEFENDANTS TO SERVE EXPERT REPORTS IS GRANTED; ALL REMAINING DEADLINES AS SET FORTH IN MY 10/2/2009 SCHEDULING ORDER REMAINED UNCHANGED; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 4/12/2010. 4/12/2010 FAXED AND/OR MAILED BY CHAMBERS 4/13/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(tomg, )
March 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF GEORGE E. PURDY, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 3/24/2010. 3/24/2010 FAXED AND/OR MAILED BY CHAMBERS. 3/29/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
March 26, 2010 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by DONNA DUBETH GARDINER on behalf of ARVIN-MERITOR, INCORPORATED with Certificate of Service(GARDINER, DONNA)
February 9, 2010 Filing 41 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL: Telephone Conference held on 2/8/2010 (tomg, )
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER THAT THE DEADLINE FOR COMPLETING ALL FACT-BASED DISCOVERY IS EXTENDED TO 4/6/2010; ON 8/12/2010 AT 2:00 P.M., ALL REMAINING PARTIES ARE TO PLACE A CONFERENCE CALL TO CHAMBERS; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 2/8/2010. 2/8/2010 FAXED TO CHAMBERS 2/12/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
December 9, 2009 Filing 39 NOTICE by AM GENERAL, LLC Certificate of Service (RETHORE, KEVIN)
November 16, 2009 Filing 38 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel on behalf of Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY (tomg, )
October 20, 2009 Filing 37 STATUS REPORT by BORG-WARNER MORSE TEC. (tomg, )
October 13, 2009 Filing 36 STATUS REPORT Position Paper by ARVIN-MERITOR, INCORPORATED. (SINCLAIR, CRISTINA)
October 13, 2009 Filing 35 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by ARVIN-MERITOR, INCORPORATED.(SINCLAIR, CRISTINA)
October 13, 2009 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by CRISTINA ZAMPETTI SINCLAIR on behalf of ARVIN-MERITOR, INCORPORATED with Certificate of Service(SINCLAIR, CRISTINA)
October 13, 2009 Filing 33 STATUS REPORT Settlement Position Paper by DETROIT DIESEL CORPORATION. (CEDRONE, GERARD)
October 13, 2009 Filing 32 STATUS REPORT (Ford Motor Company Position Paper) by FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (WEILL, ELIZABETH)
October 13, 2009 Filing 31 STATUS REPORT Position Paper, Amended Admin Order No. 12 by NATIONAL AUTOMOTIVE PARTS ASSOCIATION (NAPA). (FELLMAN, SUSAN)
October 13, 2009 Filing 30 STATUS REPORT Position Papers by GERALD L. HOFFEDITZ. (ZINNS, SHARON)
October 13, 2009 Filing 29 STATUS REPORT Position Paper Presented by AM GENERAL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(RAPPAPORT, NANCY)
October 13, 2009 Filing 28 Report Of Brian R. Ade, Esq. by SETCO AUTOMOTIVE, N.A., INCORPORATED. (ADE, BRIAN)
October 12, 2009 Filing 27 STATUS REPORT Position Paper by DANA CORPORATION. (WEINER, STEVEN)
October 6, 2009 Filing 26 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by NATIONAL AUTOMOTIVE PARTS ASSOCIATION (NAPA).(FELLMAN, SUSAN)
October 6, 2009 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN B. FELLMAN on behalf of NATIONAL AUTOMOTIVE PARTS ASSOCIATION (NAPA) with Certificate of Service(FELLMAN, SUSAN)
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER THAT ALL PARTIES IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASES ARE EXCUSED FROM THE HEARING SCHEDULED ON 10/20/2009. THESE CASES HAVE BEEN REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 9/30/2009. 10/5/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER THAT ALL FACT DISCOVERY IS TO BE COMPLETED BY 2/5/2010; ON 2/8/2010 AT 12:00 P.M., ALL REMAINING PARTIES ARE TO PLACE A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE CALL TO CHAMBERS; MOTIONS MUST BE FILED BY 6/10/2010; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 10/2/2009. 10/2/2009 FAXED BY CHAMBERS. 10/5/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(tomg, )
October 2, 2009 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL: Settlement Conference held on 9/30/2009. (tomg, )
September 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER THAT A STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE IN HE LISTED CASES WILL BE HELD ON TUESDAY, OCTOBER 20TH, 2009 AT 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 11A BEFORE HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, IF ANY OF THE CASES SHOULD BE TRANSFERRED FROM THE CIVIL SUSPENSE FILE, THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL TRANSFER SAID CASES TO THE ACTIVE DOCKET FOR FINAL DESPOSITION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 9/21/09. 9/30/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (bc, )
September 10, 2009 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL: Telephone Conference held on 9/2/09 (lisad, )
August 31, 2009 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GERALD L. HOFFEDITZ Certificate of Notification (ZINNS, SHARON)
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT/CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 9/30/09 AT 3:00 P.M. IN COURTROOM 7, ROBERT N.C. NIX BUILDING, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 8/24/09. 8/28/09 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. 8/24/09 COPIES FAXED BY CHAMBERS. (lisad, )
August 27, 2009 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by GERALD L. HOFFEDITZ, JUDTIH L. HOFFEDITZ. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LYTLE, ROBERT)
August 26, 2009 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by STANDARD MOTOR PRODUCTS, INCORPORATED.(O'LEARY, RICHARD)
August 26, 2009 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by STANDARD MOTOR PRODUCTS, INCORPORATED.(O'LEARY, RICHARD)
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER THAT C.A. 09-70103, 09-70104 ARE REFERRED TO THE HONORABLE MAGISTRATE JUDGE FAITH ANGELL FOR DISCOVERY COMPLETION AND MEDIATION/SETTLEMENT NEGOTIATION AND/OR CONFERENCES; ALL PRIOR SCHEDULING ORDERS SHALL BE RESCINDED AND THE PARTIES SHALL AWAIT FURTHER ORDERS FROM THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE; PLFF'S COUNSEL SHALL SEND NOTICE OF THIS REFERRAL ORDER TO ALL REMAINING DEFENDANTS WITHIN TEN DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER AND SHALL FORWARD TO THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE A LIST OF ALL VIABLE DEFENDANTS REMAINING IN EACH CASE, ETC.; ALL PARTIES SHALL COMPLY WITH THE REQUIREMENTS OF SECTION 9, ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 12; PLAINTIFFS MUST HAVE MADE SUBMISSIONS IN ACCORDANCE WITH ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 12 AND ALL VIABLE PARTIES MUST HAVE MADE PAYMENT TO THE CLERK OF THE COURT AS REQUIRED UNDER ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 14, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/20/09; 8/21/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (SEE PAPER # 6596 IN 01-MD-875).(ah)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS ARE GRANTED LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY TO DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. THIS REPLY MUST BE FILED BY 8/27/09. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/17/09. 8/18/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(lisad, )
August 10, 2009 Filing 12 Letter to Judge Robreno to Request Opportunity to file a REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by GERALD L. HOFFEDITZ. (ZINNS, SHARON) Modified on 8/11/2009 (ac, ).
August 4, 2009 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by NANCY SHANE RAPPAPORT on behalf of AM GENERAL, LLC with Certificate of Service(RAPPAPORT, NANCY)
August 4, 2009 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH KERNEN on behalf of AM GENERAL, LLC with Certificate of Service(KERNEN, JOSEPH)
August 3, 2009 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by AM GENERAL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K)(RETHORE, KEVIN)
August 3, 2009 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by KEVIN W. RETHORE on behalf of AM GENERAL, LLC with Certificate of Service(RETHORE, KEVIN)
July 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS WILL HAVE UNTIL 8/3/09 TO FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND TO STATE COURT (DOC. NO. 4). SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 7/23/09. 7/23/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. (lisad, )
July 20, 2009 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by CUMMINS, INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Response in Opposition, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #6 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(BUBA, BARBARA)
July 14, 2009 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by SHARON J. ZINNS on behalf of GERALD L. HOFFEDITZ with Certificate of Service(ZINNS, SHARON)
July 10, 2009 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by GERALD L. HOFFEDITZ, JUDTIH L. HOFFEDITZ.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Brief, #4 Exhibit A to F of Brief, #5 Exhibit G to M of Brief)(LYTLE, ROBERT)
June 12, 2009 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL (sml, )
June 12, 2009 Filing 2 AMENDED ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 11 THAT THE MODIFICATIONS TO THE EXISTING PROCEDURES FOR THE PROCESSING OF CASES, DOCKETS, PLEADINGS AND ORDERS IN MDL 875 CASES ARE ADOPTED AS OUTLINED IN THIS ORDER, ETC. ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (sml, )
June 12, 2009 Filing 1 TRANSFER ORDER NO. 451 THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS ORDERED TO INITIATE THE PROCEDURES FOR THE TRANSFER OF MDL 875 CASES FROM THE U.S.D.C. DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TERMS OF THIS COURT'S ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 11. ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED. (sml, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOFFEDITZ et al v. AM GENERAL, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANA CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE CORPORATION(S) (1-50)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SETCO AUTOMOTIVE, N.A., INCORPORATED
Represented By: BRIAN R ADE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRYSLER LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNEUMO-ABEX LLC
Represented By: MARK D. DEBROWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AM GENERAL, LLC
Represented By: JAMES J GROSS
Represented By: JOSEPH KERNEN
Represented By: KEVIN W. RETHORE
Represented By: ADAM A. DESIPIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS 51-75
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BORG-WARNER MORSE TEC
Represented By: ALAN IRA DUNST
Represented By: STEVEN FREDERIK SATZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CUMMINS, INCORPORATED
Represented By: MARY S. COOK
Represented By: DONNA DUBETH GARDINER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DETROIT DIESEL CORPORATION
Represented By: EDWARD T. FINCH
Represented By: GERARD CEDRONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL AUTOMOTIVE PARTS ASSOCIATION (NAPA)
Represented By: SUSAN B. FELLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STANDARD MOTOR PRODUCTS INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMP[ANY
Represented By: JEFFREY S. POLLACK
Represented By: MICHAEL P. KINKOPF
Represented By: SHARON L. CAFFREY
Represented By: ELIZABETH A. WEILL
Represented By: EDWARD T. FINCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARVIN-MERITOR, INCORPORATED
Represented By: JOSEPH P. LASALA
Represented By: BRANDY L. HARRIS
Represented By: CRISTINA ZAMPETTI SINCLAIR
Represented By: DONNA DUBETH GARDINER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GERALD L. HOFFEDITZ
Represented By: ARNOLD C. LAKIND
Represented By: JEFFREY P. BLUMSTEIN
Represented By: NATHANIEL N. FALDA
Represented By: ROBERT G. STEVENS, JR.
Represented By: ROBERT E. LYTLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDTIH L. HOFFEDITZ
Represented By: ARNOLD C. LAKIND
Represented By: JEFFREY P. BLUMSTEIN
Represented By: NATHANIEL N. FALDA
Represented By: ROBERT G. STEVENS, JR.
Represented By: ROBERT E. LYTLE
Represented By: AMBER R. LONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?